Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePRISON LEGAL NEWS v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv00683
Date Filed2014-04-23
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ellen S. Huvelle
PlaintiffPRISON LEGAL NEWS
Case DescriptionPrison Legal News submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Prisons for records concerning Federal Prison Industries' electronic recycling program, focusing on hazardous wastes and working conditions. Prison Legal News requested records in electronic format where available. Prison Legal News also requested a fee waiver and to be placed in the news media fee category. Four months later, BOP informed Prison Legal News that it would not search for records without a pre-payment of $1300 in search fees and $1400 in duplication costs. Prison Legal News filed an administrative appeal of BOP's denial of its fee waiver and failure to categorize it as news media. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Prison Legal New filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Fee Category - Media or Educational

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-04-231COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3693491) filed by PRISON LEGAL NEWS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2 - DOJ Acknowledgment Letter, # 3 Exhibit Ex 3 - DOJ Denial Letter, # 4 Exhibit Ex 4 - PLN's Admin Appeal, # 5 Exhibit Ex 5 - PLN Follow Up Letter, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons Federal Bureau of Prisons, # 8 Summons Department of Justice, # 9 Summons U.S. Attorneys Office for District of Columbia, # 10 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
2014-04-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PRISON LEGAL NEWS (Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
2014-04-23Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (kb) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
2014-04-233SUMMONS Issued (4) Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(kb) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
2014-05-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS served on 5/19/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt and Return Receipt)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-05-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/19/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt and Return Receipt)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-05-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/19/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/18/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt and Return Receipt)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-05-277RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/19/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt and Return Receipt)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-06-188NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
2014-06-189Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
2014-06-18MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' consent motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Upon consideration of the motion, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' consent motion for an extension of time is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including June 30, 2014, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 18, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 06/18/2014)
2014-06-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/30/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
2014-06-3010Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2014-06-30MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' second consent motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. pon consideration of Defendants' second consent motion and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' second consent motion for an extension of time is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including July 9, 2014, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 30, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 06/30/2014)
2014-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/9/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
2014-07-1111NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shannon L. Fagan on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS Substituting for attorney Judith Kidwell (Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
2014-07-1112Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 07/11/2014)
2014-07-13MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' third consent motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Upon consideration of Defendants' third consent motion and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' third consent motion for an extension of time is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including August 1, 2014, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 13, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 07/13/2014)
2014-07-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/1/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
2014-07-3013Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Fourth) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
2014-07-30MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Upon consideration of Defendants' fourth consent motion and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' fourth consent motion for an extension of time is GRANTED, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including September 2, 2014, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 30, 2014. (AG, ) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
2014-09-0214Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
2014-09-03MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' fifth consent motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Upon consideration of Defendants' fifth consent motion and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including September 16, 2014, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 3, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
2014-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/16/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 09/04/2014)
2014-09-1615Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint,, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/16/2014)
2014-09-17MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' sixth consent motion for an extension of time to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Upon consideration of the motion and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including September 17, 2014, to answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 17, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
2014-09-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/17/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
2014-09-1716Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS.(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
2014-09-18MINUTE ORDER: As the requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure are inapplicable to this FOIA case, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint proposed briefing schedule by September 25, 2014. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 18, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
2014-09-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/25/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
2014-09-2517Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by PRISON LEGAL NEWS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
2014-09-26MINUTE ORDER granting 17 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule: This matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion for an Extension of Two Business Days to File Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule. Upon consideration of the motion and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have until and including September 29, 2014, within which to file the joint briefing schedule as ordered by Minute Order dated September 18, 2014. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 26, 2014. (AG, ) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
2014-09-2918STIPULATION Joint Submission of Resolved Issues and Proposed Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
2014-09-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Briefing Schedule due by 9/29/2014. (zmm, ) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
2014-09-3019SCHEDULING ORDER. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 30, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-09-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Briefing regarding BOP's denial of PLN's request for public interest fee waiver and the applicability of duplication costs briefing schedule: Plaintiff's motion due 10/31/14; Response due 12/1/14; Reply due 12/15/14. Summary judgment motion due 6/1/16; Response and cross motion due 7/1/16; Reply and response to cross motion due 8/1/16; Reply in support of cross motion due 8/31/16.(zmm, ) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-10-2820Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by PRISON LEGAL NEWS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
2014-10-30MINUTE ORDER granting 20 plaintiff's Consent Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule: Upon consideration of plaintiff's Consent Motion to Modify BriefingSchedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that briefing regarding BOP's denial of PLN's request for a public interest fee waiver and the applicability of duplication costs shall proceed upon the following schedule: plaintiff's motion is due by 11/14/2014; defendants' response is due by 12/15/2014; plaintiff's reply is due by 1/7/2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 30, 2014. (AG) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
2014-10-3121NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. Attorney Shannon L. Fagan terminated. (Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
2014-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 11/14/2014. Response due by 12/15/2014 Reply due by 1/7/2015. (zmm, ) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
2014-11-1222NOTICE of Appearance by John Cuong Truong on behalf of All Defendants (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
2014-11-1223Consent MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by PRISON LEGAL NEWS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
2014-11-13MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Consent Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule: This matter is before the Court on the plaintiff's Second Consent Motion to Modify the Briefing Schedule. Upon consideration of the motion and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that briefing regarding BOP's denial of PLN's request for a public interest fee waiver and the applicability of duplication costs shall proceed upon the following schedule: Plaintiff's motion due 12/5/2014; Response due 1/14/2015; Reply due 1/28/2015. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 13, 2014. (AG, ) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
2014-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Briefing schedule regarding BOP's denial of PLN's request for a public interest fee waiver and the appicability of duplication costs: Plaintiff's motion due by 12/5/2014. Response due by 1/14/2015. Reply due by 1/28/2015. (zmm, ) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
2014-12-0424MOTION for Summary Judgment by PRISON LEGAL NEWS (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit Ex 1 - July 31 2012 FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit Ex 2 - Aug 21, 2012 DOJ acknowledgment and referral letter, # 4 Exhibit Ex 3 - Dec 4 2012 Denial of Public Interest Fee Waiver, # 5 Exhibit Ex 4 - Feb 1 2003 Appeal of Denial of Fee Waiver, # 6 Exhibit Ex 5 - Inquiry re Fee Waiver Appeal with enclosures, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Messineo, Carl) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
2015-01-1225Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 24) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
2015-01-13MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including February 17, 2015, to respond to 24 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 13, 2015. (AG) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-13Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Response due by 2/17/2015. (zmm, ) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-02-0926Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
2015-02-09MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including February 13, 2015, to produce its first installment of documents to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 9, 2015. (AG) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
2015-02-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant has up to and including 2/13/2015 to produce its first installment of documents to Plaintiff. (zmm, ) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
2015-02-1027Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
2015-02-11MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for an Extension of Time and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including March 10, 2015, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 11, 2015. (AG) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Response due by 3/10/2015. (zmm, ) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
2015-02-1228STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Wilson Moorer)(Truong, John) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
2015-03-0829Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 24) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/08/2015)
2015-03-09MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time be and is hereby GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including March 31, 2015, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 9, 2015. (AG) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-03-10Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Response due by 3/31/2015. (zmm, ) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-03-2830Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/28/2015)
2015-03-29MINUTE ORDER granting 30 defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 24 plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment: Upon consideration of Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including April 30, 2015, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 29, 2015. (AG, ) (Entered: 03/29/2015)
2015-03-30Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Response due by 4/30/2015. (zmm, ) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-04-2931Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
2015-04-30MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time be and is hereby GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall have up to and including June 1, 2015, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF TIME WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 30, 2015. (AG, ) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
2015-04-3032STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Truong, John) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
2015-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Response due by 6/1/2015. (zmm, ) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
2015-06-0133STIPULATION re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
2015-06-0234STIPULATION AND COURT ORDER. 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment terminated as moot. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 6/2/15. (gdf) Modified on 6/3/2015 (AG). (Entered: 06/02/2015)
2015-07-2335STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Wilson J. Moorer)(Truong, John) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
2015-08-2136STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit August 11, 2015 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit August 17, 2015 Declaration)(Truong, John) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-10-2437STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Wilson J. Moorer (Exhs A and B))(Truong, John) (Entered: 10/24/2015)
2016-01-2738STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Truong, John) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
2016-01-29MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint Status Report by April 29, 2016 informing the Court of whether all disputes relating to production of documents have been resolved. The Report may additionally propose a revised briefing schedule for summary judgment if the parties deem such a revision to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 29, 2016. (lcesh2) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2016. (zmm) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-04-2939Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Truong, John) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-05-0340SCHEDULING ORDER setting date for next status report and summary judgment briefing schedule. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 3, 2016. (AG) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
2016-06-3041Joint STATUS REPORT And Consent Motion To Modify Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-01MINUTE ORDER re 41 Joint Status Report and Consent Motion: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report and Defendant's Consent Motion to Modify the May 3, 2016 Scheduling Order and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the May 3, 2016 Scheduling Order is modified as follows: (1) a Joint Status Report is due by September 1, 2016; (2) Defendant's opening motion is due by November 1, 2016; (3) Plaintiff's opposition and cross motion is due by December 1, 2016; (4)Defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion is due by January 6, 2017; and (5) Plaintiff's Reply is due by January 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 1, 2016. (AG) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 11/1/2016; Response to Cross Motions due by 12/1/2016; Reply to Cross Motions due by 1/6/2017; Reply due by 1/27/2017; Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2016 (hs) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-09-0142Joint STATUS REPORT and Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Truong, John) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-0143Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (See Docket Entry 42 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-0444ORDER granting 43 Consent Motion to Modify July 1, 2016 Scheduling Order: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/1/2016; Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion due by 1/16/2017; Defendants' Response to Cross-Motion and Reply re Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/16/2017; Plaintiff's Reply re Cross Motion due by 3/1/2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 4, 2016. (AG) (Entered: 09/04/2016)
2016-11-2945Unopposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order (ECF No. 44) by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-11-29MINUTE ORDER granting 45 Unopposed Motion to Modify Scheduling Order: Upon consideration of Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Modify the September 4, 2016 Scheduling Order (ECF No. 44 ) and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the September 4, 2016 Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Defendants opening motion is due by February 7, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition and cross motion is due by March 7, 2017; Defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion is due by April 6, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply is due by April 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 29, 2016. (AG) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 3/7/2017. Response to Cross Motions due by 4/6/2017. Reply to Cross Motions due by 4/20/2017. Summary Judgment motions due by 2/7/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/7/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/6/2017. (gdf) (Entered: 12/01/2016)
2017-02-0346Consent MOTION to Modify November 29, 2016 Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-06MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the November 29, 2016 Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Defendant's opening motion is due by March 7, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition and cross motion is due by April 7, 2017; Defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion is due by May 5, 2017; and Plaintiffs Reply is due by May 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 6, 2017. (AG) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-03-0347Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-03MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the November 29, 2016 Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Defendant's opening motion is due by April 21, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition and cross motion is due by May 22, 2017; Defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion is due by June 22, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply is due by July 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 3, 2017. (AG) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 5/22/2017. Response to Cross Motions due by 6/22/2017. Reply to Cross Motions due by 7/6/2017. Motions due by 4/21/2017. Responses due by 5/22/2017 Replies due by 6/22/2017. (gdf) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-04-1848Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-18MINUTE ORDER granting 48 Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the November 29, 2016 Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Defendant's opening motion is due by June 5, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition and cross motion is due by July 13, 2017; Defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion is due by August 14, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply is due by September 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 18, 2017. (AG) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 7/13/2017. Response to Cross Motions due by 8/14/2017. Reply to Cross Motions due by 9/5/2017. Motions due by 6/5/2017. Responses due by 7/13/2017 Replies due by 8/14/2017. (gdf) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-06-0249Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
2017-06-06MINUTE ORDER granting 49 Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the April 18, 2017 Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Defendant's opening motion is due by July 11, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition and cross motion is due by August 11, 2017; Defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion is due by September 11, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply is due by September 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 6, 2017. (AG) (Entered: 06/06/2017)
2017-07-0950Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Truong, John) (Entered: 07/09/2017)
2017-07-09MINUTE ORDER granting 50 Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that existing Scheduling Order is modified as follows: Defendant's opening motion is due by August 11, 2017; Plaintiff's opposition and cross motion is due by September 11, 2017; Defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion is due by October 11, 2017; and Plaintiff's Reply is due by October 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 9, 2017. (AG) (Entered: 07/09/2017)
2017-07-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Opening Motion due by 8/11/2017. Plaintiff's Response/Cross Motion due by 9/11/2017 Defendant's Reply/Cross Motion due by 10/11/2017. Plaintiff's Reply due by 10/25/2017. (hs) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff