Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMORRIS OKUN, INC. v. S & B PRODUCE, INC. et al
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityNewark
Case Number2:2014cv03689
Date Filed2014-06-09
Date Closed2014-09-15
JudgeJudge Stanley R. Chesler
PlaintiffMORRIS OKUN, INC.
Case DescriptionNo complaint filed on docket
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantS & B PRODUCE, INC.
trading as PRODUCE KING
DefendantDOMINICK MARTELLA, JR.
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-06-091COMPLAINT against DOMINICK MARTELLA, JR, S & B PRODUCE, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 5739972), filed by MORRIS OKUN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ld, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
2014-06-092Corporate Disclosure Statement by DOMINICK MARTELLA, JR, S & B PRODUCE, INC. identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (ld, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
2014-06-113SUMMONS ISSUED as to DOMINICK MARTELLA, JR, S & B PRODUCE, INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *LEROY DUNBAR* (ld, ) (Entered: 06/11/2014)
2014-06-194CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MORRIS OKUN, INC. re 1 Complaint, 3 Summons Issued (FASSETT, DAVID) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
2014-08-125Request for Default by MORRIS OKUN, INC. against Defendants S&B Produce, Inc., t/a Produce King and Dominick Martella, Jr.. (FASSETT, DAVID) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
2014-08-136MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants by MORRIS OKUN, INC.. Responses due by 9/2/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Louis W. Diess, III, # 2 Certification of David W. Fassett, # 3 Brief, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(FASSETT, DAVID) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
2014-08-15Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to S&B PRODUCE, INC. t/a PRODUCE KING and DOMINICK MARTELLA, JR. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (nr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
2014-08-15Set Deadlines as to 6 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants . Motion set for 9/15/2014 before Judge Stanley R. Chesler. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, ) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
2014-09-157ORDER granting 6 Motion for Default Judgment in the sum of $21,033.35 in favor of Morris Okun, Inc. and against S&B Produce, Inc., t/a Produce King and Dominick Martella Jr. ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 9/15/2014. (nr, ) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff