Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleATTKISSON v. US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv01348
Date Filed2014-08-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffSHARYL ATTKISSON
Case DescriptionJournalist Sharyl Attkisson submitted four requests to the Center for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning healthcare.gov. The agency acknowledged receipt of her request, but failed to provide tracking numbers for each request. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Attkisson filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-08-081COMPLAINT against US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3804217) filed by SHARYL ATTKISSON. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Department of Health and Human Services, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
2014-08-082CIVIL COVER SHEET by SHARYL ATTKISSON re 1 Complaint, filed by SHARYL ATTKISSON. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SHARYL ATTKISSON.(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
2014-08-08Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md, ) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
2014-08-133SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons 2nd, # 2 Summons 3rd, # 3 Notice Of Consent, # 4 Consent Form) (md, ) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
2014-08-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/18/2014. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/17/2014.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/18/2014., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/18/2014 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
2014-09-115NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
2014-09-126MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Partial Consent Motion) by US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
2014-09-17MINUTE ORDER: Granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by October 17, 2014. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/17/14. (DJS) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
2014-09-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/17/2014, (tj ) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
2014-10-177ANSWER to Complaint by US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
2014-11-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than November 25, 2014. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/3/14. (DJS) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
2014-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 11/25/2014 and Status Report due by 11/25/2014. (tj ) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
2014-11-258STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
2014-11-26MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Status Report filed by parties 8 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report and jointly proposed schedule not later than January 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/26/14. (DJS) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
2014-11-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and Proposed Schedule due by 1/9/2015. (sm) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
2015-01-099STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by US DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
2015-01-14MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Status Report filed by the parties 9 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report and jointly proposed schedule not later than February 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/14/15. (DJS) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
2015-01-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/20/2015. (sm) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
2015-02-2010STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
2015-02-21MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Status Report filed by parties 10 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report and jointly proposed schedule not later than April 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/21/14. (DJS) (Entered: 02/21/2015)
2015-02-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report and jointly proposed schedule due by 4/21/2015. (sm) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-04-2111STATUS REPORT (Joint) by SHARYL ATTKISSON. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
2015-04-23MINUTE ORDER: A scheduling conference is hereby set for May 7, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 2 to consider the dispute between the parties regarding how to proceed with this case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/23/15. (DJS) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-04-23Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2015 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-04-28MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference previously set for 5/7/2015 is hereby rescheduled for 5/14/15 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom #2. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/28/15. (DJS) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
2015-04-28Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
2015-05-14Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Scheduling Conference held on 5/14/2015. Status Report due by 6/24/2015. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith.) (zsm) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
2015-05-14MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint status report concerning the processing of Plaintiff's FOIA requests by June 24, 2015. The Court will hold a status conference on July 10, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/14/15. (lctsc3) (Entered: 05/14/2015)
2015-05-15Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/10/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-06-2412STATUS REPORT (Joint) by SHARYL ATTKISSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-07-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 7/10/2015. Status Report due by 8/24/2015. Status Conference set for 9/3/2015 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (zsm) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-07-1313TRANSCRIPT OF 7/10/15 STATUS HEARING before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan held on July 10, 2015. Page Numbers: 1-16. Date of Issuance: 7/13/15. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne; telephone number: 202-354-3186. Court Reporter email address: Bryan_Wayne@dcd.uscourts.gov. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/11/2015.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-08-2414STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Report) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
2015-09-0115NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Michelle Meriweather on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
2015-09-0116Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
2015-09-01MINUTE ORDER: Granting 16 Motion to Continue. The Status Conference previously set for 9/3/15 is hereby rescheduled for 9/15/15 at 10:15 a.m. in Courtroom 2. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/1/15. (DJS) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
2015-09-01Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/15/2015 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
2015-09-15MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a joint status report concerning the processing of Plaintiff's FOIA requests not later than 11/16/2015. The Court will hold a status conference on 12/4/2015 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/15/2015. (lctsc3) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 11/16/2015. Status Conference set for 12/4/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsm) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-09-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 9/15/2015. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (dot) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-11-1617Joint STATUS REPORT by SHARYL ATTKISSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
2015-12-0218NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Attorney Robin Michelle Meriweather terminated. (Meriweather, Robin) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-03NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 12/4/2015 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Please note the change in time. (zsm) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
2015-12-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 12/4/2015. Defendant's Declaration due by 1/8/2016. Status Conference set for 1/21/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (Court Reporter Barbara DeVico.) (zsm) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
2015-12-04MINUTE ORDER: Not later than 1/8/2016, Defendant shall file a declaration detailing its production procedure and describing, in concrete factual detail, any issues preventing an increased rate of production. The declaration shall also include a proposed production schedule. A status conference is set for 1/21/2016 at 11:00 am. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/4/2015. (lctsc3) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
2016-01-0719NOTICE of Filing of Declaration by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re Order, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Hugh Gilmore)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-01-21Minute Entry for Status Conference held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/21/16 : Counsel encouraged to continue their cooperation. Further Status Conference set for 4/25/16 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (Court Reporter: Bryan Wayne) (kk) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-21MINUTE ORDER setting a Status Conference in this matter for April 25, 2016 at 10:00am in Courtroom 2. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/21/2016. (lctsc3) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-03-01NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 5/3/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Please note the change in date. (zsm) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
2016-03-02MINUTE ORDER: Not later than noon on 5/2/16 the parties shall file a joint status report along with a proposed order for moving forward with this case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/2/16. (DJS) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/2/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-05-0220Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-03Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 5/3/2016. Parties advised the Court of the status of production.Status Conference set for 8/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne.) (zsm) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
2016-05-17NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference set for 8/1/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. Please note the change in time.(zsm) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-08-01Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Status Conference held on 8/1/2016. Status Report due by 11/4/2016. Status Conference set for 2/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (nbn) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-03MINUTE ORDER: In addition to the Status Report due on 11/4/16, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report, along with a proposed order on 1/30/2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/3/16. (DJS) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-11-0321Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2017-01-05MINUTE ORDER: the hearing set for February 1, 2017 at 10:00 AM is hereby rescheduled for February 9, 2017 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/5/2017. (lctsc3) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
2017-01-3022Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-09Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 2/9/2017 before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Joint Status Report due by 5/2/2017. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb) Modified on 2/10/2017 (tb). (Entered: 02/10/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff