Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION v. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv01407
Date Filed2014-08-18
Date Closed2018-06-12
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION
Case DescriptionCause of Action submitted FOIA requests to multiple cabinet agencies for records concerning any referrals to the White House by agencies pursuant to a 2009 memo from former White House General Counsel Greg Craig requiring agencies to consult the White House when records involved "White House equities." When none of the agencies had yet responded months after the request was received, Cause of Action filed suit against all the agencies that had received the request.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantINTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
TERMINATED: 03/27/2017
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Opinion/Order [73]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-08-181COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3811779) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 1-30, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Internal Revenue Service, # 4 Summons Office of Management and Budget, # 5 Summons Department of Defense, # 6 Summons Department of Energy, # 7 Summons Department of Health and Human Services, # 8 Summons Department of Homeland Security, # 9 Summons Department of Housing and Urban Development, # 10 Summons Department of Justice, # 11 Summons Department of State, # 12 Summons Department of Transportation, # 13 Summons Department of Treasury, # 14 Summons Department of Veteran Affairs, # 15 Summons US Attorney General, # 16 Summons Civil Process Clerk US Attorney's Office)(Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
2014-08-182CIVIL COVER SHEET by CAUSE OF ACTION re 1 Complaint,,, filed by CAUSE OF ACTION. Related document: 1 Complaint,,, filed by CAUSE OF ACTION.(Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
2014-08-183LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CAUSE OF ACTION (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
2014-08-18Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (kb) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
2014-08-184SUMMONS (14) Issued Electronically as to INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(kb) Modified on 8/18/2014 (kb). (Entered: 08/18/2014)
2014-09-035NOTICE of Appearance by Kieran Gavin Gostin on behalf of INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Gostin, Kieran) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
2014-09-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE served on 8/22/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 8/26/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE served on 8/21/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-059RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 8/21/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-0510RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 8/21/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-0511RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 8/25/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-0512RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 8/21/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-0513RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/22/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-0514RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 8/22/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-0515RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION served on 9/2/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-0516RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY served on 8/22/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-0517RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS served on 8/22/2014 (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-0518RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/22/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/21/2014. (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-0519RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/2/2014. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/2/2014. (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
2014-09-1220Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Time to Answer Complaint)(Gostin, Kieran) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
2014-09-12MINUTE ORDER granting 20 defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendants are directed to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by no later than November 3, 2014. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 12, 2014. (lcegs4) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
2014-09-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/3/2014. (mac) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
2014-11-0321ANSWER to Complaint by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS.(Gostin, Kieran) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
2014-11-0422ORDER FOR MEET AND CONFER REPORT. Attorney Meet and Confer Conference due by 11/26/2014. Meet & Confer Statement due by 12/10/2014. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/4/14. (mac) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
2014-12-1023JOINT STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Blutstein, Allan) Modified on 12/11/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 12/10/2014)
2014-12-29MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed 23 the joint status report filed by the parties. The parties are directed to file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than February 17, 2015. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 29, 2014. (lcegs4) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2014-12-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/17/2015 (tcr) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
2015-01-3024NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Nathaniel Schopf on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION (Schopf, Joshua) (Main Document 24 replaced on 2/2/2015) (znmw, ). (Entered: 01/30/2015)
2015-02-0525NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CAUSE OF ACTION. Attorney Allan Blutstein terminated. (Blutstein, Allan) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
2015-02-1726STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Gostin, Kieran) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
2015-02-19MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed 26 the joint status report filed by the parties. The parties are directed to file a joint status report, including a recommendation for further proceedings, by no later than April 17, 2015. In the event that counsel are unable to agree on a joint recommendation, each party shall file an individual recommendation by that time. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 19, 2015. (lcegs4) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
2015-02-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/17/2015. (mac) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
2015-04-1727STATUS REPORT Joint by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Schopf, Joshua) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
2015-04-2028NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Zachary Epstein on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION (Epstein, Daniel) (Main Document 28 replaced on 4/20/2015) (jf, ). (Entered: 04/20/2015)
2015-05-28MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file, by no later than June 8, 2015, a joint status report updating the respective positions outlined in 27 their April 17, 2015 joint status report. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 28, 2015. (lcegs2) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
2015-05-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2015. (mac) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
2015-06-0829STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Schopf, Joshua) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
2015-06-09NOTICE OF ERROR re 29 Status Report; emailed to josh.schopf@causeofaction.org, cc'd 5 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. DO NOT REFILE- signing atty signature should match login/password (jf, ) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
2015-06-10MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed 29 the parties' joint status report, in which the parties represent that all agencies but the Department of State either have completed their document processing, or will do so by July 17, 2015. The defendants ask that the parties file an additional status report around that time, at which point the State Department will know how much longer its document processing will take. The plaintiff, by contrast, seeks final production by July 17, 2015 and requests a summary-judgment briefing schedule beginning in early September. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: First, OIP and DOTRES shall complete production and send plaintiff a final response by no later than July 17, 2015. Second, the Department of State and the plaintiff shall file a status report by no later than July 1, 2015, which shall indicate precisely when the Department of State expects to complete production and submit a final response to the plaintiff, and shall contain the parties' competing proposals for further proceedings in this case. These deadlines will not be extended. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 10, 2015. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
2015-06-10Set/Reset Deadlines: OIP and DOTRES Complete Production and Send Plaintiff A Final Response due by 7/17/2015. Department of State and The Plaintiff Status Report due by 7/1/2015. (mac) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
2015-07-0130STATUS REPORT (Fifth Joint) by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TREASURY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS. (Gostin, Kieran) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-03MINUTE ORDER. The Court has reviewed 30 the parties' joint status report, which reflects that all defendants in this case but the Department of State will complete production by no later than July 17, 2015. The Department of State asks for four more months to complete its production, in view of its significantly increased FOIA workload. The plaintiff asks that the Court order the Department of State to make a final production by the end of this month. The Court is sensitive to the increased FOIA activity the Department of State is facing, but four additional months is too long. Nor is plaintiff's proposal of only one additional month--which would make the State Department's response due only two weeks after some of its co-defendants who appear not to face the same increased FOIA workload--a reasonable proposal. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the Department of State make a final production to the plaintiffs in this case by no later than September 30, 2015. The Department of State shall make rolling productions to the plaintiff on July 31, 2015 and August 28, 2015. The parties shall meet and confer in an attempt to narrow the legal issues in dispute regarding the defendants' productions by no later than October 16, 2015. The defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment by no later than November 23, 2015. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to the defendants' motion for summary judgment, combined with any cross motion for summary judgment, by no later than December 21, 2015. The defendants shall file their opposition to plaintiff's cross motion, combined with their reply in support of their motion, by no later than January 4, 2016. The plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross motion by no later than January 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 3, 2015. (lcegs2) (Entered: 07/03/2015)
2015-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants Summary Judgment motion due by 11/23/2015. Plaintiff Opposition To Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Combined With Any Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 12/21/2015. Defendants Reply to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment, Combined With Their Reply In Support Of Their Motion due by 1/4/2016. Plaintiff Reply In Support Of Its Cross Motion due by 1/18/2016. (mac) (Entered: 07/06/2015)
2015-08-2031NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CAUSE OF ACTION. Attorney Prashant Kumar Khetan terminated. (Khetan, Prashant) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-09-0932NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Patrick Mulvey on behalf of CAUSE OF ACTION (Mulvey, Ryan) (Main Document 32 replaced on 9/9/2015) (jf). (Entered: 09/09/2015)
2015-09-2933NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Matthew Joseph Berns on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kieran G. Gostin (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
2015-09-2934MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Final Production by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
2015-09-3035RESPONSE re 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to Make Final Production Opposition filed by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Schopf, Joshua) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
2015-10-1636MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
2015-10-23MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 34 Motion for An Extension of Time, as follows: (1) Defendants' final production shall be made no later than November 27, 2015; (2) Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 8, 2016; (3) Plaintiff's opposition, combined with any cross motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 22, 2016; (4) Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's cross motion, combined with their reply in support of their motion shall be due no later than February 5, 2016; and (5) Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross motion shall be due no later than February 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 23, 2015. (lcegs4) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
2015-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment Motion due by 1/8/2016. Plaintiff's Opposition, Combined With Any Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 1/22/2016. Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross Motion, Combined With Reply In Support Of Their Motion due by 2/5/2016.Plaintiff' Reply In Support Of Its Cross Motion due by 2/19/2016. (mac) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
2015-11-2037MOTION to Modify Schedule by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 11/20/2015)
2015-11-2338RESPONSE re 37 MOTION to Modify Schedule Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Modify Schedule filed by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Schopf, Joshua) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
2015-12-06MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 37 Motion to Modify Schedule. Defendants shall file a status report no later than December 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 6, 2015. (lcegs4) (Entered: 12/06/2015)
2015-12-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/9/2015. (mac) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
2015-12-0939STATUS REPORT by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
2015-12-10MINUTE ORDER directing the Department of State to complete production no later than April 29, 2016. The Department of State shall file a status report on the last day of every month until production is complete. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 10, 2015. (lcegs4) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-3140STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
2016-01-3141STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 01/31/2016)
2016-01-3142Amended STATUS REPORT (Filing Date Corrected) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 01/31/2016)
2016-02-2943STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
2016-03-2244NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua Nathaniel Schopf (Schopf, Joshua) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-03-3145STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
2016-04-2946MOTION to Modify Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric F. Stein, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-04-2947RESPONSE re 46 MOTION to Modify Schedule filed by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-04-3048STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 04/30/2016)
2016-05-25MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Defendant Department of State's Motion to Modify the Schedule. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 25, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-06-0149STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-1550Joint STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schopf, Joshua) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-07-2251MOTION for Summary Judgment by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit 1 Declaration of A. M. Gulas, # 4 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Jennifer Black, # 5 Exhibit 3 Letter from Kieran Gostin to Josh Schopf, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-08-0152NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CAUSE OF ACTION. Attorney Daniel Zachary Epstein terminated. (Epstein, Daniel) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-1253Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by CAUSE OF ACTION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-1254ORDER granting 53 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 12, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment and Opposition To IRS's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 8/19/2016. IRS's Opposition To Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Reply in Support of its Motion due by 9/16/2016. Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion due by 9/30/2016. Parties Will Meet and Confer and submit a proposal for an additional briefing schedule due by 11/13/2016. State Will File Its Motion For Summary Judgment due by 12/2/2016. (mac) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-12Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 8/19/2016. Response to Cross Motion due by 9/16/2016. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/30/2016. IRS's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/19/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/16/2016. Draft Vaughn Index due by 10/24/2016. Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/13/2016. State's Summary Judgment motion due by 12/2/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-1955Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by CAUSE OF ACTION (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schopf, Joshua) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-1956Memorandum in opposition to re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Schopf, Joshua) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-09-0657STIPULATION of Dismissal by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Schopf, Joshua) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-0958Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 55 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and to Reset Deadlines by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-13MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' consent motion for an extension of time, as follows: IRSs combined opposition to Plaintiffs cross motion and reply in support of its motion shall be filed no later than October 14, 2016; Plaintiffs reply in support of its cross motion shall be filed no later than November 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on September 13, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-09-13Set/Reset Deadlines: IRS Combined Opposition To Plaintiffs' Cross Motion And Reply In Support Of Its Motion due by 10/14/2016. Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Its Cross Motion due by 11/4/2016. (mac) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-10-1459RESPONSE re 55 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of John H. Davis, # 3 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of Richard G. Goldman, # 4 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Charles B. Christopher, # 5 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Donald Squires, # 6 Exhibit 8 - Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer Black)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-1460REPLY to opposition to motion re 51 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-2461MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Draft Vaughn Index and for Order Resetting Deadlines by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-2562RESPONSE re 61 MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Draft Vaughn Index and for Order Resetting Deadlines filed by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-11-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 61 the Department of State's motion to extend the deadline to produce a draft Vaughn index and reset deadlines, and 62 the plaintiff's opposition thereto, the parties are directed to comply with the following schedule: State shall provide Plaintiff with a draft Vaughn index by no later than November 21, 2016. Both parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposal for additional briefing deadlines by no later than December 2, 2016. State shall file its motion for summary judgment by no later than January 9, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/1/2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 12/2/2016. State Motion For Summary Judgment due by 1/9/2017. (mac) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-0363REPLY to opposition to motion re 55 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-12-0264Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposal for Briefing Schedule by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-14VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 12/22/2016..... Upon consideration of 64 the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to comply with the following briefing schedule: the Department of State's motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than January 9, 2017. Cause of Action's cross motion for summary judgment and opposition to State's motion shall be filed no later than February 6, 2017. State's opposition to Cause of Action's cross-motion and reply in support of its motion shall be filed by no later than March 6, 2017. Cause of Action's reply in support of its cross-motion shall be filed no later than March 27, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/14/2016. (lcegs4) Modified on 12/23/2016 (tth). (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Department Of State's Motion For Summary Judgment due by 1/9/2017. Cause Of Action's Cross Motion For Summary Judgment And Opposition To State's Motion due by 2/6/2017. State's Opposition To Cause OF Action's Cross-Motion And Reply In Support Of Its Motion due by 3/6/2017. Cause Of Action's Reply In Support Of Its Cross-Motion due by 3/27/2017. (mac) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-2165Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule by Plaintiff and by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-22MINUTE ORDER granting 65 joint motion to modify the scheduling order. The December 14, 2016 scheduling order is hereby vacated. The Department of State shall provide plaintiff with a revised draft Vaughn Index no later than February 21, 2017. Plaintiff and the Department of State shall submit a joint status report and proposed briefing schedule by no later than February 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/22/2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Department of State's revised draft Vaughn Index due no later than 2/21/2017. Plaintiff and Department of State's Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule due no later than 2/28/2017. (tth) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2017-01-09MINUTE ORDER staying 51 IRS's motion for summary judgment and 55 plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment pending the completion of summary judgment briefing between plaintiff and the Department of State. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/9/2017. (lcegs4) (Entered: 01/09/2017)
2017-01-19MINUTE ORDER staying the case pending the completion of summary judgment briefing between plaintiff and the Department of State. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/19/2017. (lcegs4) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
2017-01-23Case Stayed (mac) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-02-2166Joint MOTION to Modify Schedule and Joint Status Report by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2167JOINT STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (See Docket Entry 66 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 02/22/2017)
2017-03-09MINUTE ORDER granting 66 joint motion to modify schedule. The Department of State shall provide Plaintiff with a revised draft Vaughn Index by no later than March 21, 2017. Plaintiff and the Department of State shall submit a joint status report and proposed briefing schedule, if necessary, by no later than March 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/9/2017. (lcegs4) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Department of State To Provide Plaintiff With A Revised Draft Vaughn Index due by 3/21/2017. Joint Status Report due by 3/28/2017. (mac) (Entered: 03/09/2017)
2017-03-2768STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Department of State by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-2769Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-06-1670NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Cause of Action v. IRS, No. 13-cv-0920-ABJ (D.D.C. May 25, 2017))(Berns, Matthew) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-1671RESPONSE re 70 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by CAUSE OF ACTION. (Mulvey, Ryan) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2018-02-1372NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Michael Leon Drezner on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Matthew J. Berns (Drezner, Michael) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-06-1273MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 12, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1274ORDER granting 51 defendant's motion for summary judgment and denying 55 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 12, 2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
2018-06-1275CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Internal Revenue Service against Cause Of Action Institute. (mac) (Entered: 06/12/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff