Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTempest v. National Energy Technology Laboratory et al
DistrictDistrict of Wyoming
CityCheyenne
Case Number2:2014cv00171
Date Filed2014-08-22
Date Closed2015-02-06
JudgeHonorable Nancy D Freudenthal
PlaintiffRone B Tempest
Case DescriptionRone Tempest, a reporter for WyoFile.com, submitted a FOIA request to the National Energy Technology Laboratory for records related to the 2012 suspension of 2009 and 2010 federal stimulus grants made to the North American Power Group by NETL. The agency denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Tempest appealed and the agency upheld its original decision. Tempest then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 7(A) - Interference with ongoing investigation

DefendantNational Energy Technology Laboratory
DefendantUnited States Department of Energy
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-08-221COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF (no summons issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY20083.), filed by Rone B Tempest. (Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge mailed to Plaintiff on August 22, 2014.) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Envelope) (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
2014-09-223SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rone B Tempest. National Energy Technology Laboratory served on 9/11/2014, answer due on 11/15/2014; United States Department of Energy served on 9/15/2014, answer due on 11/15/2014. (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 09/22/2014)
2014-10-104NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas Vassallo on behalf of National Energy Technology Laboratory, United States Department of Energy (Vassallo, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
2014-10-105ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Energy, National Energy Technology Laboratory. (Vassallo, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
2014-10-306MOTION for an expedited Status Conference filed by Plaintiff Rone B Tempest. (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
2014-11-127ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting 6 Motion for Hearing - Dispositive. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/14 at 3:30 p.m. before Chief Judge Freudenthal (Chambers). Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff on this date via certified U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal) Text modified on 11/13/2014. (Court Staff, sal) USPS confirmation on 11/18/2014 that mail was delivered at 12:28 p.m. on 11/15/14. (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
2014-11-12Set Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/24/2014 03:30 PM in Judge Freudenthal Chambers (Room No. 2242) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
2014-11-178JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN re 7 Order on Motion for Hearing - Dispositive, by National Energy Technology Laboratory, United States Department of Energy. (Vassallo, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
2014-11-259INITIAL PRETRIAL ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Motions filing deadline 1/16/2015. Motion response deadline 1/30/2015. Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 2/27/2015 03:00 PM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff on this date via U.S. mail and certified U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal) USPS notification on 12/17/14 that this certified mailing was delivered 12/8/14 at 4:23 p.m. (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
2014-12-1210Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Department of Energy, National Energy Technology Laboratory. (Vassallo, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
2014-12-2411UNOPPOSED MOTION for Reconsideration of Briefing Schedule, filed by Plaintiff Rone B Tempest. (Court Staff, szr) (Entered: 12/24/2014)
2014-12-2912ORDER by the Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal granting 11 Motion for Reconsideration of briefing schedule. Dates set forth herein. Copy of Order mailed to Plaintiff on this date via U.S. mail.(Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2014-12-29Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions filing deadline 1/30/2015. Plaintiff shall file his response brief and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 2/17/15. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 3/2/15. Dispositive Motions Hearing RESET for 3/13/2015 09:00 AM in Cheyenne Courtroom No. 1 (Room No. 2132) before Honorable Nancy D Freudenthal. (Court Staff, sal) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2015-02-0213STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by National Energy Technology Laboratory, United States Department of Energypursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (Vassallo, Nicholas) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-0214ORDER Granting 13 Stipulaton of Dismissal with Prejudice by the Honorable Nancy D. Freudenthal. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to pay their own costs. (Court Staff, szr) Plaintiff served via US Mail on 2/2/2015 (Court Staff, szr). (Entered: 02/02/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff