Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBrewington v. Federal Bureau of Prisons
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityAlexandria
Case Number1:2007cv00621
Date Filed2007-06-25
Date Closed2007-07-09
JudgeDistrict Judge Gerald Bruce Lee
PlaintiffHerman Brewington
DefendantFederal Bureau Of Prisons
Documents
Docket
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2007-06-251MOTION To Seek Judicial Review in Accordance with 5 U.S.C. 552(A)(4)(B) by Herman Brewington. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(bhav, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2007 (bhav, ). (Entered: 06/26/2007)
2007-07-092ORDERED that this action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Columbia; that pltf direct all future pleadings in this case to the Clerk's Office for the USDC for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Gerald Bruce Lee on 7/9/07. (bhav, ) (Entered: 07/10/2007)
2007-07-163Letter from USDC District of Columbia receipt of transferred case (bhav, ) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
2007-08-084Letter from Herman Brewington to the court. (bhav, ) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
2007-08-095Letter from Pro se law clerk in response to letter filed 8/8/07 (bhav, ) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff