Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePreserve Our Islands v. United States Army Corps of Engineers
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2006cv01793
Date Filed2006-12-15
Date Closed2007-05-18
JudgeJudge John C Coughenour
PlaintiffPreserve Our Islands
DefendantUnited States Army Corps of Engineers
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2006-12-151COMPLAINT against defendant United States Army Corps of Engineers (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # SEA6015) , filed by Preserve Our Islands. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MKB) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
2006-12-202CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Preserve Our Islands re 1 Complaint. (CL, ) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
2007-01-233ANSWER to Complaint by United States Army Corps of Engineers.(Winn, Peter) (Entered: 01/23/2007)
2007-01-244MINUTE ENTRY setting status conference: The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. The nature of the case, 2. The status of matters which are presently set before the Court, e.g., hearings, motions, etc., 3. The status of discovery and a time schedule for its completion, 4. A statement of any legal issues about which motions are contemplated and a possible briefing schedule, 5. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial, 6. Whether the case is jury or non-jury, 7. The date by which the case will be ready for trial, and 8. Settlement probabilities. Counsel for all parties are required to appear at the conference. If counsel office is outside of Seattle, arrangements can be made for telephonic participation in the conference. If counsel wish to make such arrangements, they should contact Julie Mahnke, Deputy Clerk at 206-370-8805. COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 4/10/2007 at 09:00 AM before John C Coughenour. (JM, ) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
2007-01-245ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge John C Coughenour. (JM, ) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
2007-01-316Stipulated MOTION ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Defendant United States Army Corps of Engineers. Noting Date 1/31/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Winn, Peter) (Entered: 01/31/2007)
2007-02-027ORDER by Judge John C Coughenour. (CL, )The Court 6 GRANTS Stipulated MOTION ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by United States Army Corps of Engineers. (CL, ) Modified on 2/5/2007 (CL, ). (Entered: 02/05/2007)
2007-03-229STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by parties. (Winn, Peter) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
2007-03-2710STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, by Judge John C Coughenour. Dft's ddl to file Motion for Summary Judgment set for 3/30/07. Response ddl 4/27/07, reply ddl 5/11/07. Preserve Our Islands reply ddl 5/25/07. Both the Corps' Motion for Summary Judgment and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Preserve Our Islands shall be noted onthe Court's motion calendar for Friday, May 25, 2007.(CL, ) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
2007-03-3011MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: # 1 Romano Declaration# 2 Hynes Declaration# 3 Proposed Order)Noting Date 5/25/2007.(Winn, Peter) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
2007-04-2012STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Suspending Briefing Pending Final Settlement by parties. (Mann, David) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
2007-05-0113STIPULATION AND ORDER Suspending Briefing Schedule Pending Final Settlement, by Judge John C Coughenour. (CL, ) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
2007-05-1514STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL by parties. (Winn, Peter) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
2007-05-1815STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge John C Coughenour. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice, and parties in this case shall be responsible for their own attorney's fees and costs.(CL, ) (Entered: 05/18/2007)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar