Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAlbanian Islamic Center et al v. Chertoff et al
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2006cv05626
Date Filed2006-10-17
Date Closed2007-03-29
JudgeHonorable Blanche M. Manning
PlaintiffAlbanian Islamic Center
PlaintiffArben Tahirovic
DefendantMichael Chertoff Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantRobert Divine Acting Director, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
DefendantRobert P. Wiemann Director Administrative Appeals Office
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2006-10-171COMPLAINT filed by Albanian Islamic Center, Arben Tahirovic (Exhibits). (td, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
2006-10-172CIVIL Cover Sheet. (td, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
2006-10-173ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Albanian Islamic Center, Arben Tahirovic by David Owen Lehman. (td, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
2006-10-175SUMMONS Issued as to Robert P. Wiemann, Michael Chertoff, Robert Divine, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (td, ) (Entered: 10/18/2006)
2006-11-086DESIGNATION of Sheila McNulty as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Robert P. Wiemann, Michael Chertoff, Robert Divine (McNulty, Sheila) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
2006-11-097MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing set for 11/16/2006 at 11:00 AM. Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
2006-11-168MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : Status hearing held on 11/16/2006. Status hearing set for 1/18/2007 at 11:00 AM. Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
2007-01-189MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning: Status hearing held and continued to 4/10/2007 at 11:00 a.m. This case is stayed pending the outcome of the 7th Circuit arguments in another identical case. Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 01/26/2007)
2007-03-2910MINUTE entry before Judge Blanche M. Manning : This case is hereby placed on the court's suspense docket. When the Seventh Circuit's mandate issues in the identical case, the parties shall file brief position papers addressing the effect of the Seventh Circuit case on this case. At that point, the court will move this case to its active docket and conduct appropriate further proceedings. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lcw, ) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
2010-08-2411MOTION by Defendants Robert Divine, Michael Chertoff, Robert P. Wiemann to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Agreed Motion (McNulty, Sheila) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
2010-08-2412NOTICE of Motion by Sheila McNulty for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction 11 before Honorable Blanche M. Manning on 8/31/2010 at 11:00 AM. (McNulty, Sheila) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
2010-08-3013MINUTE entry before Honorable Blanche M. Manning: Defendants' agreed motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction 11 is granted. The case is dismissed with prejudice. each party will bear their own costs and fees.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar