Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePickard v. Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2006cv00185
Date Filed2006-01-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHon. Charles R. Breyer
PlaintiffWilliam Leonard Pickard
DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [132]
Opinion/Order [136]
Opinion/Order [139]
Opinion/Order [149]
Opinion/Order [151]
Opinion/Order [158]
Opinion/Order [160]
Opinion/Order [169]
Opinion/Order [179]
Opinion/Order [183]
Opinion/Order [210]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal magistrate judge in California has once again rejected the DEA's Vaughn index concerning confidential informant Gordon Todd Skinner, whose identity as an informant had already been publicly disclosed. The case involves ongoing eight-year litigation by William Pickard to force the agency to disclose information about Skinner's role in a drug operation that led to Pickard's conviction. The Ninth Circuit previously ruled that Skinner's identity had been revealed in court proceedings and could not be protected. Since that decision, the parties have continued to argue over the extent of disclosure. Relying on Wiener v. FBI, 943 F.2d 972 (9th Cir. 1991), the magistrate judge found the DEA continued to describe withheld records too broadly and required it to provide more detail. The magistrate judge noted the DEA described a "Report of Investigation" as containing "information provided by a source." But after reviewing the document, the magistrate judge pointed out that "the section actually describes information involving the moving of an LSD laboratory, money the DEA reportedly seized, and efforts by different individuals to exchange money from one currency to another. The government could have revealed this information in the Vaughn Index, without violating the privacy interests of any third parties or DEA agents." Telling the agency to supplement its index, the magistrate judge observed that "put simply, by using boilerplate language throughout the declaration�"both to describe the contents of the document and to describe what exemptions apply�"the government failed to sufficiently describe the information in the documents, and provide a 'particularized explanation' of how disclosure would damage the interest protected by the claimed exemption."
Issues: Litigation - Vaughn index
Opinion/Order [219]
Opinion/Order [221]
Opinion/Order [222]
Opinion/Order [224]
Opinion/Order [227]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal magistrate judge in California has tentatively found that identifying information about DEA informant Gordon Skinner should be disclosed to William Pickard because Skinner was publicly identified as a confidential informant at Pickard's trial. The magistrate judge's recommendation brings the decade-old case closer to resolution. The Ninth Circuit previously ruled that because Skinner was identified at Pickard's trial the agency could not refuse to confirm his identity. The government has continued to lose in regard to various aspects of the case in both the Ninth and Tenth Circuits. Finding that the government had provided no better explanation for why information about Skinner should be withheld, the magistrate judge noted that "because the government has failed to do anything to bolster the arguments Judge Breyer rejected at summary judgment, this Court's tentative ruling is to release documents in the three categories of materials [currently being considered by the court]: Skinner's name, information Skinner has voluntarily disclosed to the public, including information released in the federal court proceedings in Kansas, and Skinner's NADDIS number."
Issues: Public domain
Opinion/Order [232]
Opinion/Order [243]
Opinion/Order [251]
Opinion/Order [252]
Opinion/Order [254]
Opinion/Order [255]
Opinion/Order [259]
Opinion/Order [268]
FOIA Project Annotation: Sometimes even the most impressive victories for plaintiffs in FOIA cases turn out at the end of the litigation to be considerably less than they originally appeared to be. Often one apparently insurmountable obstacle is overcome, only to be replaced by another impenetrable claim further down the road. Such is the case in a decade-old suit against the Justice Department brought by William Pickard, who was convicted of manufacturing LSD. Pickard's suit first came to national attention in 2011 when the Ninth Circuit ruled that the government could not issue a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records for Gordon Skinner, a confidential source who had testified at Pickard's trial. The Ninth Circuit found that because Skinner had been publicly identified as a confidential source, his identity could not be protected by a Glomar response. The case continued to go through several district court decisions in Kansas and California. Magistrate Judge Nathaniel Cousins of the Northern District of California recommended that Judge Charles Breyer rule in favor of Pickard's request for access to Skinner's name, his DEA NADDIS informant number, and any information Skinner provided during his public testimony because the agency had not shown the information was protected by Exemption 7(D) (confidential sources). However, although Pickard appeared to be poised to get everything he could probably have hoped for, Breyer rejected Cousins' recommendation, finding instead that all the information�"including Skinner's name�"was protected under Exemption 7(D). Breyer first reviewed exactly what the Ninth Circuit had said in Pickard v. Dept of Justice, 653 F.3d 782 (9th Cir. 2011). He agreed that the Ninth Circuit had rejected the agency's use of a Glomar response, but explained that the Ninth Circuit's ruling relied on Wolf v. CIA, 473 F.3d 370 (D.C. Cir. 2007), for the proposition that "official acknowledgment relates only to the existence or nonexistence of records, and that the government was to either disclose any officially acknowledged records or establish that the contents are exempt and that exemptions have not been waived." He pointed out that the Ninth Circuit had also cited Benavides v. DEA, 968 F.2d 1243 (D.C. Cir. 1992), the first appellate decision to interpret the subsection (c) exclusions contained in the 1986 amendments, as recognizing that "Congress intended to permit the DEA to withhold documents under 7(C) and 7(D), even if the agency must, under subsection (c)(2) acknowledge their existence." Pickard argued that the cited language in the Ninth Circuit's decision was either dicta or the result of a drafting error. Finding Pickard's argument implausible, Breyer observed that the Ninth Circuit "explained that, having officially confirmed Skinner as an informant, the government was to produce a Vaughn index, 'raise whatever other exemptions may be appropriate, and let the district court determine whether the contents, as distinguished from the existence, of the officially confirmed records may be protected from disclosure under the DEA's claimed exemptions.' The government is therefore correct that the ruling in this case defeats the argument that official confirmation of Skinner as a confidential informant merits the disclosure of all the information Pickard seeks." Breyer next noted that under Davis v. Dept of Justice, 968 F.2d 1276 (D.C. Cir. 1992), the plaintiff bore the burden of showing that the exact information requested was already in the public domain. He indicated that Pickard had failed to make that showing and proceeded to examine the applicability of Exemption 7(D). The government argued that Exemption 7(D) could not be waived, while Pickard contended that the government's confirmation of Skinner as a confidential informant waived the exemption. Breyer agreed with the government, but indicated that because there was no relevant Ninth Circuit precedent on 7(D) he would rely instead on Irons v. FBI, 880 F.2d 1446 (1st Cir. 1989), the leading appellate decision on waiver of Exemption 7(D). The plaintiff in Irons argued that the FBI waived its ability to protect any information provided by a confidential source once that source had testified in public. Rejecting that argument, the First Circuit ruled that public testimony of a confidential source did not waive the FBI's ability to claim Exemption 7(D) for information provided by the confidential source. Breyer emphasized that Irons did not stand for Pickard's contention that Exemption 7(D) did not apply to the identity of the source or public information disclosed by the source's public testimony. He added that Davis provided further confirmation that plaintiffs like Pickard were required to do far more to defeat a legitimate government exemption. Indeed, the facts in Davis bore some similarity to those in Pickard's case. Davis involved an argument that audiotapes of testimony during the BRILAB trial should be disclosed because they were in the public domain. But the D.C. Circuit found that Davis, rather than the government, bore the burden of showing that information had been publicly disclosed. Breyer indicated that "Davis therefore shows the D.C. Circuit recognizing the application of the official acknowledgement doctrine in to Exemption 7(D)." Breyer expressed concerns that "Pickard's request, which would require the government to compile a subset of the in camera documents in a form that is presently unavailable to the public, is problematic under Dept of Justice v. Reporters Committee." Breyer observed that "because it does not know which portions of which of the documents in the in camera materials are 'information Skinner has publicly disclosed,' the Court cannot independently verify whether all such information is covered by Exemption 7(D). However, because the government represented to the Court at the motion hearing that all of the 'information Skinner has publicly disclosed' is covered by Exemption 7(D), the Court's in camera review of the broader set of responsive materials gives it no reason to doubt this characterization, and�"though he contends that the government/Skinner has waived Exemption 7(D)�"Pickard has not disputed that the relevant materials 'could reasonably be expected to disclose the identity of a confidential source' or constitute 'information furnished by a confidential source.'" The agency also claimed Skinner's NADDIS informant number was protected by Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). Pickard argued that the technique was generally known to the public, while the government argued that "the DEA uses a particular method to assign NADDIS numbers and that the more NADDIS numbers get out, the more people will be able to discern that methodology." Noting that a number of courts had found NADDIS numbers protected, Breyer concluded that "disclosing Skinner's NADDIS number would reveal techniques and procedures that are not generally known to the public."
Issues: Exemption 7(E) - Investigative methods or techniques, Exemption 7(D) - Confidential sources, Public domain
Opinion/Order [273]
Opinion/Order [278]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in California has refused William Pickard's request that it amend its decision finding that the name, informant number, and the information publicly disclosed at trial by a confidential informant is protected under Exemption 7(D) (confidential sources) and allow Pickard to challenge other aspects of the withheld records as well. Pickard argued the court had improperly shifted the burden of proof to the plaintiff to show that there were still unsettled issues. But Judge Charles Breyer noted that "the Court sent the whole case to [a magistrate judge], and Pickard asked the judge to adjudicate just three categories of materials. Had Pickard failed entirely to appear before [the judge], the case would have been dismissed without an order requiring the government to disclose the materials to Pickard. That, too, would not have been burden shifting, but a reflection of the fact that it is a plaintiff's burden to litigate his case." Breyer observed that "while Pickard might not have explicitly, or even intentionally, withdrawn his request for the remaining materials, the Court continues to conclude that Pickard withdrew his request when he pursued the litigation strategy that he did."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Moot
Opinion/Order [367]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2006-01-111COMPLAINT against Department of Justice. Filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Transmittal, # 3 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2006)
2006-01-112CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 30 days. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2006)
2006-01-31Filing fee: $ 255.00, receipt number 3381074. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/02/2006)
2006-01-313Letter dated 1/25/06 from Melissa Pickard re filing fee paid and request for summons form to be sent to petitioner. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Receipt for filing fee, # 2 Envelope, # 3 Summons, # 4 Transmittal re summons) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2006)
2006-01-314AMENDED COMPLAINT against Department of Justice. Filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/02/2006)
2006-02-035Letter dated 1/29/06 from William L. Pickard requesting blank subpoena forms. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/08/2006)
2006-02-10Sent subpoena forms to plaintiff per request. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/10/2006)
2006-02-13Summons Issued as to Department of Justice. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2006) (Entered: 02/14/2006)
2006-02-246MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/24/2006)
2006-03-177SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Leonard Pickard. Department of Justice served on 3/3/2006, answer due 5/2/2006. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/20/2006)
2006-03-218NOTICE OF MOTION AND SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Appendix) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/22/2006)
2006-03-289MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/28/2006)
2006-03-2810SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/28/2006)
2006-04-0611ANSWER to Complaint byDepartment of Justice. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/10/2006)
2006-04-2112MOTION for order to meet and confer filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/21/2006)
2006-05-2513Reply Memorandum to defendant's answer to complaint filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/25/2006)
2006-06-0214ORDER; Order denying 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel, denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel, denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel, denying 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Judge Charles R. Breyer (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2006) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
2006-07-10301Received Notice of motion and motion for leave to file oversize pleading by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/10/2006)
2006-07-1715NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for leave to submit additional interrogatories filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/17/2006)
2006-07-2016ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 15 Motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2006) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
2006-07-2417MOTION for order permitting plaintiff to obtain affidavits from an incarcerated individual filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/24/2006)
2006-07-2418Notice of Amended REQUEST for production and a Vaughn Index pursuant to the Court's Order of 6/2/06 by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/4/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/24/2006)
2006-08-07302Received Notice of motion and motion for order permitting plaintiff to obtain affidavits from Pasquale Surace and Proposed Order by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/07/2006)
2006-08-1019NOTICE of Service of plaintiff's request for admission from defendant (Sets 1-5) by William Leonard Pickard (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/16/2006)
2006-08-2120Letter from Plaintiff to Clerk dated 8/14/06 re notice of service of plaintiff's request for admissions from defendant (set 1-5). (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2006)
2006-08-2121Letter from Plaintiff to Clerk dated 8/17/06 re notice of motion and motion for order permitting plaintiff to obtain affidavits from Pasquale Surace. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2006)
2006-08-2522ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 17 Motion (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2006) (Entered: 08/25/2006)
2006-08-2823MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF: REQUEST FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY AND OBJECTION TO PREMATURE DISCOVERY filed by Department of Justice. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/28/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # 1 Proposed Order) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/29/2006)
2006-08-28[Proposed] Order re 23 MOTION to Stay OF DISCOVERY by Department of Justice. (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/28/2006) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
2006-08-3124NOTITCE OF MOTION, MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in support of motion for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Justice. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2006)
2006-08-3125Declaration of Leila I. Wassom filed byDepartment of Justice. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/05/2006)
2006-09-2026ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 23 Motion to Stay Discovery. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/21/2006)
2006-09-2527Response to defendant's motion to stay discovery 23 filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/26/2006)
2006-09-2828MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/29/2006)
2006-09-2829Subpoena returned filed by plaintiff William L. Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/29/2006)
2006-09-2930REQUEST for reconsideration re 26 Order on Motion to Stay by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/29/2006)
2006-10-1031Letter dated 9/30/06 from William L. Pickard re enclosed documents. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2006)
2006-10-1032MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/10/2006)
2006-10-10303Received Document from Oklahoma Superior Court re plaintiff's discovery request. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/16/2006)
2006-10-1633Letter dated 10/12/06 from William L. Pickard re plaintiff's opposition. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/16/2006)
2006-10-1834RESPONSE AND MEMORANDUM of points and authorities in Opposition re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Related document(s) 24 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/18/2006)
2006-11-0335Letter dated 11/3/06 from William Leonard Pickard re plaintiff's opposition. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/07/2006)
2006-11-0636MOTION to Strike 34 Memorandum in Opposition or, in the alternative, enlargement of time to file reply and opposition to plaintiff's motion to stay filed by Department of Justice. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # 1 Proposed Order) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/07/2006)
2006-11-06Received Order re 36 MOTION to Strike 34 Memorandum in Opposition or, in the alternative enlargement of time by Department of Justice. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
2006-11-0737ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 36 Motion to Strike or, in the alternative enlargement of time until 11/22/06 to file a reply to plaintiff's opposition, denying 32 Motion to Stay. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/09/2006)
2006-11-1738Letter dated 11/14/06 from William Leonard Pickard re plaintiff's opposition (#34). (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/20/2006)
2006-11-2239SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM of points and authorities concerning exemptions filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2006)
2006-11-2240NOTICE of intent to respond to defendant's reply and REQUEST for enlargement of time by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/2/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2006)
2006-11-2241Reply Memorandum re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byDepartment of Justice. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2006)
2006-11-2242Declaration of William C. Little, Jr. filed byDepartment of Justice. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/22/2006)
2006-11-2743SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Related document(s) 24 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2006)
2006-11-2744NOTICE re proof of timely service of opposition and exhibit of Gordon Todd Skinner's letters filed in the District of Nevada by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2006)
2006-11-2745Declaration of William C. Little, Jr. filed byDepartment of Justice. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/27/2006)
2006-12-2246Letter dated 12/15/06 from William L. Pickard requesting statement. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/22/2006)
2006-12-2247SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT re 39 Second Supplemental Memorandum filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Related document(s) 39 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2006) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2018: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/22/2006)
2007-01-0548Letter dated 12/21/06 from William L. Pickard requesting copy of complaint in C-06-6850 CRB. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/05/2007)
2007-01-0849REQUEST for stay of proceedings by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2007)
2007-01-0850DECLARATION of William Leonard Pickard in Opposition to 45 Declaration of William C. Little filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Related document(s) 45 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2007)
2007-01-0851NOTICE of Related Cases C-06-6850 CRB by William Leonard Pickard (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2007)
2007-01-0852Letter dated 12/31/06 from William Leonard Pickard re 49 , 50 , and 51 . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/08/2007)
2007-01-1053Letter dated 1/7/06 from William Leonard Pickard re enclosed filing. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2007)
2007-01-1054NOTICE of decision in Valdez v. DOJ by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/10/2007)
2007-01-1255Letter dated 1/9/07 from William Leonard Pickard re enclosed request. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2007)
2007-01-1256REQUEST for enlargement of time by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2007)
2007-01-1657Letter dated 1/6/07 from William Leonard Pickard re enclosed supplemental exhibit. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2007)
2007-01-1658SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT to Second Supplemental Memorandum re Skinner filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/16/2007)
2007-01-1959Letter dated 1/12/07 from William Leonard Pickard re enclosed request. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/19/2007)
2007-01-1960REQUEST for a Vaughn Index by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/19/2007)
2007-01-2661NOTICE re lockdown by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/26/2007)
2007-03-3062ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 24 Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2007) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
2007-05-1163ORDER RE ELECTRONIC FILING IN CASES WITH UNREPRESENTED PARTIES: Case designated for electronic filing. Effective immediately all represented parties will e-file their submissions to the court. Represented parties will be required to serve paper copies by mail on unrepresented parties. Unrepresented litigants will continue to file and serve all submissions to the court in paper form unless prior leave is obtained from the assigned judge. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn Walker dated 5/11/07. Copy mailed to counsel of record. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2007) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
2007-05-2964NOTICE of Third FOIA Request to defendant DEA by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2007)
2007-05-2965NOTICE of Notarized Authorization to DOJ from Gordon Todd Skinner to release records to a third party by William Leonard Pickard (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2007)
2007-05-2966NOTICE of pending discovery by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/29/2007)
2007-05-3067Declaration First Supplemental Declaration Of William C. Little, Jr. filed byDepartment of Justice. (Dowling, Katherine) (Filed on 5/30/2007) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
2007-05-3068MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Supplemental Brief In Support Of Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Department of Justice. (Dowling, Katherine) (Filed on 5/30/2007) (Entered: 05/30/2007)
2007-05-3069CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 67 , 68 by Department of Justice (Dowling, Katherine) (Filed on 5/30/2007) Modified on 5/31/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/30/2007)
2007-06-2270MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Supplemental Brief In Support Of Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/25/2007)
2007-06-2271MOTION for clarification of Order of 3/30/07 filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/25/2007)
2007-07-0372Declaration of William Leonard Pickard re authenticity of exhibits filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/05/2007)
2007-07-1273ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Supplemental Brief In Support Of Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment ; denying 71 Motion for Clarification of Court's Order Responses due by 7/27/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2007) (Entered: 07/12/2007)
2007-07-1674NOTICE of Additional Official Confirmation of Gordon Todd Skinner's Informant Status by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2007)
2007-07-1675Declaration of William L. Pickard in response to 67 Declaration of William C. Little Jr. filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Related document(s) 67 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/16/2007)
2007-08-0176NOTICE of filing of opposition by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/01/2007)
2007-08-0677NOTICE of lockdown by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/06/2007)
2007-08-1678Reply Memorandum re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Supplemental Brief In Support Of Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment filed byDepartment of Justice. (Dowling, Katherine) (Filed on 8/16/2007) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
2007-08-2079Second NOTICE by William Leonard Pickard re 76 Notice of filing of Plaintiff's Opposition (Other) (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2007)
2007-08-2080Third NOTICE by William Leonard Pickard re 76 Notice of Filing of Plaintiff's Opposition (Other) (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2007)
2007-08-2381Memorandum in Opposition re 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Supplemental Brief In Support Of Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by William Leonard Pickard. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2019: # 1 Part 2, # 2 Part 3, # 3 Part 4, # 4 Envelope 1, # 5 Envelope 2) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/24/2007)
2007-08-2782ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyeyr on 8/27/07. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2007) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
2007-09-1183Reply Memorandum Defendant's Reply Brief In Support Of 68 Motion For Summary Judgment filed byDepartment of Justice. (Dowling, Katherine) (Filed on 9/11/2007) Modified on 9/13/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/11/2007)
2007-09-1284CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 83 Reply Brief by Department of Justice (Dowling, Katherine) (Filed on 9/12/2007) Modified on 9/13/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/12/2007)
2007-09-1985Letter dated 9/16/07 from William L. Pickard re enclosed motion for stay of proceedings. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2007)
2007-09-1986MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2007) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/19/2007)
2007-09-2887MOTION to Amend Complaint filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2007)
2007-09-2888SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBITS re 86 MOTION to Stay filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Related document(s) 86 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2007)
2007-09-2889Letter dated 9/16/07 from William L. Pickard re enclosed certificate of service(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/28/2007)
2007-10-1190Sur-reply re 83 defendant's reply filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2007)
2007-10-2291NOTICE of bad faith by defendant DEA by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/23/2007)
2007-10-2292SUPPLEMENT by William Leonard Pickard re 90 Sur-reply.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/23/2007)
2007-10-2993SUPPLEMENT by William Leonard Pickard re 91 Notice of bad faith. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/29/2007)
2007-11-0594NOTICE by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/05/2007)
2007-11-0795NOTICE of Notarized Authorization to DOJ from Gordon Todd Skinner by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/07/2007)
2007-11-2696NOTICE of Gordon Todd Skinner in CR 05-0594 VRW by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/26/2007)
2007-11-2697SUPPLEMENT by William Leonard Pickard re 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/26/2007)
2007-12-1098Declaration of William C. Little, Jr. in Support of 45 Declaration in Support, 67 Declaration in Support (Supplemental) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Related document(s) 45 , 67 ) (Dowling, Katherine) (Filed on 12/10/2007) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
2007-12-1099CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Justice re 98 Declaration in Support (Dowling, Katherine) (Filed on 12/10/2007) (Entered: 12/10/2007)
2007-12-12100NOTICE of Change of Address : Federal Correctional Institution, POB 5700, Adellanto, CA 92301 by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2007)
2007-12-14101NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Neill Tai Tseng (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 12/14/2007) (Entered: 12/14/2007)
2007-12-26102DECLARATION of William Pickard in Opposition to 98 Declaration of William C. Little filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Related document(s) 98 ) (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2007)
2007-12-28103Second Supplemental Declaration of William Leonard Pickard filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2007) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/28/2007)
2008-01-09104MOTION to Withdraw and Resubmit Interrogatories filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/09/2008)
2008-01-14105Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2019: # 1 Envelope) (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/15/2008)
2008-01-30106Letter dated 1/18/08 from William Leonard Pickard re enclosed motion to withdraw. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2008) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
2008-01-30107MOTION to Withdraw 86 MOTION to Stay filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2008) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
2008-02-11108ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 87 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
2008-02-11109CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Department of Justice against William Leonard Pickard (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2008) (Entered: 02/13/2008)
2008-02-14110NOTICE of Change of Address : USP Tucson, P.O. Box 24550, Tucson, AZ 85734 by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
2008-02-22111Mail sent to William Leonard Pickard returned as undeliverable re 109 Clerk's Judgment, 108 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2008) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
2008-02-26*** Disregard above entry 111 . Documents re-sent to plaintiff at new address : USP Tucson, P.O. Box 24550, Tucson, AZ 85734. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/26/2008)
2008-03-03112NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 108 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment and Request for fee waiver by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2008) (Entered: 03/04/2008)
2008-03-05113Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 112 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2008: # 1 Appeal Form) (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/05/2008)
2008-03-05114Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/5/2008: # 1 Docket sheet) (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/05/2008)
2008-03-05115Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re 112 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2008) (Entered: 03/05/2008)
2008-03-12116USCA Case Number 08-15504 USCA for 112 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
2008-03-12117USCA Scheduling Order as to 112 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
2008-03-21118ORDER of USCA re filing fee as to 112 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2008) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
2008-08-14119ORDER of USCA: Appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. Accordingly, within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall complete and file with this court the enclosed authorization form, which directs the prison officials at appellant's institution to assess, collect, and forward to the court the $455.00 fiing and docketing fees for this appeal on a monthly basis whenever funds exist in appellant's trust fund account; as to 112 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard (aaa, Court Staff) (Filed on 8/14/2008) (Entered: 08/14/2008)
2008-10-16120ORDER of USCA as to 112 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. Appellant William Leonard Pickard has been granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis in this appeal and has completed and filed the required authorization form. Appellant is not responsible for payment when the funds in appellant's prison trust account total less than $10. Appellant's opening brief due 11/12/08 ; answering brief due 2/12/08.(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
2010-02-09121Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 112 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
2010-02-16122Receipt for Appeal Record re 112 Notice of Appeal. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010) (Entered: 02/16/2010)
2010-03-02123ORDER of USCA as to 112 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. The Clerk shall enter an order appointing pro bono counsel to represent appellant for purposes of this appeal only. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
2011-02-07124MOTION to Relate Case (Administrative Motion) filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 2/7/2011) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
2011-02-07125Declaration of Neill T. Tseng in Support of 124 MOTION to Relate Case (Administrative Motion) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Related document(s) 124 ) (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 2/7/2011) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
2011-02-07126CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Department of Justice re 124 MOTION to Relate Case (Administrative Motion) , 125 Declaration in Support of Def's Motion. (Amended POS) (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 2/7/2011) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
2011-02-11127ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 124 Motion to Relate Case. CASES ARE NOT RELATED (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011) (Entered: 02/11/2011)
2011-10-04128*** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** USCA OPINION as to 112 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. The decision of the district court is REVERSED and REMANDED. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011) Modified on 10/4/2011 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/04/2011)
2011-10-04129USCA OPINION as to 112 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. The decision of the district court is REVERSED and REMANDED. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
2011-10-04130MANDATE of USCA as to 112 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
2011-10-04131CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re 130 . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
2011-11-08132ORDER REQUESTING SEPARATE CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENTS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/3/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
2011-12-16133CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 12/16/2011) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
2012-01-03134Letter from William L. Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
2012-01-03135CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012) (Entered: 01/04/2012)
2012-01-06136ORDER setting briefing schedule. Second Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/30/2012. Responses due by 4/30/2012. Replies due by 5/15/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/4/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012) (Entered: 01/06/2012)
2012-01-11137NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Thomas Rumold (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 1/11/2012) (Entered: 01/11/2012)
2012-02-29138STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 2/29/2012) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
2012-03-02139ORDER granting 138 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE Motions due by 3/30/2012. Responses due by 4/30/2012. Replies due by 5/30/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/1/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
2012-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Cross Motion SJ due by 4/30/2012. Responses due by 5/30/2012. Replies due by 6/15/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
2012-03-30140Third MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 4/13/2012. Replies due by 4/20/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William C. Little, Jr.)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
2012-03-30141Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to 140 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reason: Correcting an error) filed byDepartment of Justice. Responses due by 4/30/2012. Replies due by 5/30/2012. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
2012-03-30142Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William C. Little, Jr.,, # 2 Declaration of Neill T. Tseng, # 3 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANTS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, # 4 Proposed Order RE VAUGHN INDEX FILED UNDER SEAL)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
2012-03-30143STIPULATION RE SERVICE OF DOCUMENT SOUGHT TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL filed by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 3/30/2012) (Entered: 03/30/2012)
2012-04-02144Appendix TO 140 DEFENDANTS THIRD MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byDepartment of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 4/2/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/02/2012)
2012-04-02145Proposed Order re 140 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 4/2/2012) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
2012-04-03146RESPONSE (re 142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) and Opposition to Defendant's Administrative Motion to Seal filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 4/3/2012) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
2012-04-23147STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 4/23/2012) (Entered: 04/23/2012)
2012-04-26148ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
2012-04-26149ORDER re 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by William Leonard Pickard. Hearing set for 7/13/2012 is vacated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/25/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
2012-04-30150STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment Hearing Date filed by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 4/30/2012) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
2012-05-02151ORDER re SJ hearing date re 150 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment Hearing Date filed by Department of Justice. Reset Deadlines as to 140 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing reset for 8/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/1/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012) (Entered: 05/02/2012)
2012-05-25152Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to 140 Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Leonard Pickard. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 6/8/2012. Replies due by 6/15/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2012) Modified on 5/29/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/25/2012)
2012-05-25153Declaration of Mark Rumold in Support of 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Related document(s) 152 ) (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2012) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
2012-05-25154Declaration of William Pickard in Support of 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 152 ) (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 5/25/2012) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
2012-05-30155Appeal Record Returned from USCA. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
2012-06-08156NOTICE by William Leonard Pickard re 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment (Notice of Errata) (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 6/8/2012) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
2012-06-19157STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 6/19/2012) (Entered: 06/19/2012)
2012-06-20158ORDER re 157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Department of Justice.Reset Deadlines as to 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/13/2012. Replies due by 7/30/2012. Cross-Motions for SJ Hearing reset for 8/31/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/20/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012) (Entered: 06/20/2012)
2012-07-11159STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 7/11/2012) (Entered: 07/11/2012)
2012-07-13160ORDER re briefing schedule re 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Department of Justice. Reset Deadlines as to 140 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment , 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment . Defendant's Reply brief and Responses due by 7/23/2012. Replies due by 8/20/2012. Motion Hearing reset for 9/28/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/12/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012) (Entered: 07/13/2012)
2012-07-23161REPLY (re 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment , 140 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Little)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 7/23/2012) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
2012-08-20162REPLY (re 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 8/20/2012) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
2012-08-20163Exhibit List Submitted In Support Of 152 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment by William Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 8/20/2012) Modified on 8/21/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/20/2012)
2012-08-21164NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark Thomas Rumold (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 8/21/2012) (Entered: 08/21/2012)
2012-09-28165Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2012 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 9/28/2012) re 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Leonard Pickard, 140 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Justice, ***Motions terminated: 152 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Third Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Leonard Pickard, 140 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Justice.. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2012) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
2012-10-03166Appendix 2 (VAUGHN INDEX) TO 140 DEFENDANT'S THIRD MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byDepartment of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 10/3/2012) Modified on 10/4/2012 (mcl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/03/2012)
2012-10-09167Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-28-12, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
2013-06-13168STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Case Management Conference filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 6/13/2013) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
2013-06-19169ORDER granting 168 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Case Management Conference filed by William Leonard Pickard. Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2013 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/17/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
2013-07-03170*** ERRONEOUS ENTRY. SEE 171 *** >/b> JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 7/3/2013) Modified on 7/8/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/03/2013)
2013-07-04171JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 170 filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 7/4/2013) (Entered: 07/04/2013)
2013-07-11172CLERKS NOTICE vacating the case management conference currently set for 7/12/2013 (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
2013-08-05173MOTION TO Lift Stay of Discovery re 26 Order on Motion to Stay filed by William Leonard Pickard. Responses due by 8/19/2013. Replies due by 8/26/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Rumold, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 8/5/2013) Modified on 8/6/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/05/2013)
2013-08-19174RESPONSE (re 173 MOTION Lift Stay of Discovery re 26 Order on Motion to Stay ) Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery filed byDepartment of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 8/19/2013) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
2013-08-19175Declaration of Neill T. Tseng in Support of 174 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byDepartment of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 174 ) (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 8/19/2013) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
2013-08-19176Proposed Order re 174 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 8/19/2013) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
2013-08-26177REPLY (re 173 MOTION Lift Stay of Discovery re 26 Order on Motion to Stay ) filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 8/26/2013) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
2013-08-30178ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/30/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
2013-09-03CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
2013-09-13179ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 173 Motion To Lift Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013) (Entered: 09/13/2013)
2013-10-08180MOTION to Stay filed by Department of Justice. Responses due by 10/22/2013. Replies due by 10/29/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Tseng, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 10/8/2013) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
2013-10-11181ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 180 Motion to Stay until the shutdown of the federal government has ended and relevant appropriations have been restored. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
2013-10-28182STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER on Summary Judgment Briefing filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 10/28/2013) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
2013-11-01183ORDER granting 182 STIPULATION on Summary Judgment Briefing filed by William Leonard Pickard. Motions due by 1/7/2014. Responses due by 1/21/2014; Cross Motions due by 1/21/2014. Opposition/Replies due by 2/11/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/31/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2013) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
2014-01-07184MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 1/21/2014. Replies due by 1/28/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Little, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
2014-01-07185Correction of Opposition/Response or Reply Deadlines pertaining to 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reason: Correcting an error) filed byDepartment of Justice. Responses due by 1/21/2014. Replies due by 2/11/2014. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 1/7/2014) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
2014-01-14186STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Modification of Briefing Schedule filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 1/14/2014) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
2014-01-17187ORDER granting 186 STIPULATION Requesting Modification of Briefing Schedule filed by William Leonard Pickard. Reset Deadlines as to 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Responses due by 1/28/2014. Replies due by 2/18/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Cross Motions due by 1/28/2014. Response dlue 2/18/2014. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
2014-01-28188Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to 184 Defendant's Fourth Motion for Summary Judgment filed by William Leonard Pickard. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 2/18/2014. Replies due by 3/4/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Mark Rumold)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 1/28/2014) Modified on 1/29/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/28/2014)
2014-02-18189REPLY (re 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 2/18/2014) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
2014-02-19190ERRATA re 189 Reply to Opposition/Response by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 2/19/2014) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
2014-03-04191REPLY (re 188 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Fourth Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
2014-03-04192Declaration of Dennis McDougal in Support of 191 Reply to Opposition/Response filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Related document(s) 191 ) (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2014) (Entered: 03/04/2014)
2014-03-10193OBJECTIONS to PLAINTIFFS REPLY EVIDENCE by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 3/10/2014) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
2014-03-18194STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 3/18/2014) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
2014-03-24195Statement DEFENDANT'S STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 3/24/2014) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
2014-03-31196CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Reset Hearing as to 188 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendant's Fourth Motion for Summary Judgment , 184 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (text entry only, no document associated with this entry). (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
2014-04-07197Statement of Recent Decision by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 4/7/2014) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
2014-05-07198ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 184 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 188 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2014) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
2014-05-08CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2014) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
2014-06-03199STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO SUBMIT VAUGHN INDEX AND DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW filed by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 6/3/2014) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
2014-06-04200ORDER by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins granting 199 Stipulation (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014) (Entered: 06/04/2014)
2014-06-18201MOTION for Clarification of an order Def's Administrative Motion for Clarification of May 7, 2014 order filed by Department of Justice. Responses due by 7/2/2014. Replies due by 7/9/2014. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 6/18/2014) Modified on 6/19/2014 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/18/2014)
2014-06-19202ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 201 MOTION Clarification of an order Def's Administrative Motion for Clarification of May 7, 2014 order filed by Department of Justice to Magistrate Judge Nathanael Counsins. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/19/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
2014-06-19203NOTICE by Department of Justice re 201 MOTION Clarification of an order Def's Administrative Motion for Clarification of May 7, 2014 order DEFENDANTS NOTICE REGARDING DOC.#201 (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 6/19/2014) (Entered: 06/19/2014)
2014-06-20204RESPONSE (re 201 MOTION Clarification of an order Def's Administrative Motion for Clarification of May 7, 2014 order ) filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 6/20/2014) (Entered: 06/20/2014)
2014-06-23205CLERKS NOTICE SETTING HEARING on Defendant's Motion for Clarification of May 7, 2014 Order 201 for 6/25/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
2014-06-26206Minute Entry: Hearing held on June 25, 2014 before Judge Nathanael Cousins re Defendant's Motion for Clarification 201 . Defendant must submit documents for in camera review to Judge Cousins chambers by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, June 27. (FTR: 2:45pm - 2:49pm.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2014) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
2014-06-27207Declaration of WILLIAM C. LITTLE JR. SIXTH SUPPLEMENTAL filed byDepartment of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration PART 2)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
2014-06-27208EXHIBITS re 207 Declaration in Support ex. A to sixth supp. decl. of William C. Little, Jr. filed byDepartment of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A PART 2, # 2 Exhibit A PART 3)(Related document(s) 207 ) (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 6/27/2014) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
2015-02-12209NOTICE by William Leonard Pickard Local Rule 7-13 Notice (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 2/12/2015) (Entered: 02/12/2015)
2015-02-19210ORDER ON SUFFICIENCY OF VAUGHN INDEX Re: Dkt. Nos. 207 208 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/19/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2015) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
2015-03-03211Letter to Magistrate Judge Cousins . (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 3/3/2015) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
2015-03-04212Letter from Plaintiff to Magistrate Judge Cousins . (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 3/4/2015) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
2015-03-16213STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO SUBMIT REVISED VAUGHN INDEX filed by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 3/16/2015) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
2015-03-16214Order granting 213 Stipulation entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
2015-03-26215STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO SUBMIT REVISED VAUGHN INDEX filed by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 3/26/2015) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
2015-03-27216ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO SUBMIT REVISED VAUGHN INDEX 215 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
2015-04-09217Declaration of William C. Little, Jr Eighth Supplemental Declaration of William C. Little, Jr; exhibit A (Second updated Vaughn Index) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1 of 3, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2 of 3, # 3 Exhibit A Part 3 of 3)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 4/9/2015) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-22218Declaration of William C. Little Ninth Supplemental Declaration filed byDepartment of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 4/22/2015) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
2015-07-20219ORDER FINDING VAUGHN INDEX SUFFICIENT Re: Dkt. No. 217 Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/20/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
2015-08-03220MOTION for Reconsideration re 219 Order of Magistrate Judge filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 8/3/2015) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
2015-08-04221ORDER RE: VAUGHN INDEXED DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. The DEA may retrieve the documents and must make arrangements with the Courtroom Deputy Lili Harrell at 408.535.5343. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/4/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2015) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
2015-08-27222ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer DENYING 220 Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
2015-11-16223Letter from Mark Rumold . (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 11/16/2015) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
2015-11-16224ORDER IN RESPONSE TO LETTER FROM PICKARD'S COUNSEL NOVEMBER 16, 2015. Re: Dkt. No. 223 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/16/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
2015-11-23225RESPONSE to re 223 Letter DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO ECF NO. 223 by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 11/23/2015) (Entered: 11/23/2015)
2015-11-30226RESPONSE to re 225 Response ( Non Motion ) to ECF 223 Letter by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 11/30/2015) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-12-24227TENTATIVE RULING ORDERING RELEASE OF DOCUMENTS FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW. Re: Dkt. No. 198 . Telephonic case management conference set for 1/20/2016 11:00 AM in San Jose. Both parties to file status reports by 1/13/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/24/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2015) (Entered: 12/24/2015)
2015-12-28228MOTION For Extension of Time Defendant's Administrative Motion For Extension of Time filed by Department of Justice. Responses due by 1/11/2016. Replies due by 1/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Neill T. Tseng, # 2 Proposed Order)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 12/28/2015) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
2015-12-28229Order granting 228 Motion extending hearing and briefing schedule entered by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
2016-01-08230ERRATA by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 1/8/2016) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-01-11Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 2/10/2016. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2016 11:00 AM with Magistrate Judge Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2016) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
2016-01-29231STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time; [Proposed] Order filed by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 1/29/2016) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-02-01232ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING STIPLATION TO EXTEND TIME 231 . Status Report due by 3/2/2016. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2016 11:00 AM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2016) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
2016-02-18233RESPONSE to re 227 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, by Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William C. Little, Jr.)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 2/18/2016) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-24234MOTION for Leave to File Response filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 2/24/2016) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
2016-02-24235ORDER GRANTING Motion for Leave to File Response 134 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2016) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
2016-03-02236JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 3/2/2016) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-09237RESPONSE to re 227 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, 233 Response ( Non Motion ) by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 3/9/2016) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
2016-03-16238Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 3/16/2016: Defendant's further brief due 4/6/2016; Court to issue order upon completion of briefing. Plaintiff's Attorney: Mark Rumold. Defendant's Attorney: Neil Tseng. (FTR Time: 11:19am - 11:28am.) This is a text only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/16/2016) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-04-06239Brief re 233 Response ( Non Motion ) Defendant's Reply Re Tentative Ruling Ordering Release of Documents Following in Camera Review filed byDepartment of Justice. (Related document(s) 233 ) (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 4/6/2016) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-12240MOTION for Leave to File Response filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 4/12/2016) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-12241ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE RESPONSE 240 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-26242RESPONSE to re 239 Brief RE Tentative Ruling Ordering Release of Documents Following in Camera Review by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 4/26/2016) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
2016-05-02243ORDER TO RELEASE DOCUMENTS FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW. Re: Dkt. No. 227 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/2/2016. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-16244MOTION Defendant's Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed by Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 5/31/2016. Replies due by 6/7/2016. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-16245Proposed Order re 244 MOTION Defendant's Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 5/16/2016) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-31246RESPONSE (re 244 MOTION Defendant's Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge ) filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 5/31/2016) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-07247REPLY (re 244 MOTION Defendant's Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge ) Defendants Reply in Support of Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed byDepartment of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 6/7/2016) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-17248MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Brief filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Reply in Opposition to Motion for De Novo Determination, # 2 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 6/17/2016) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-06-17249Opposition to 248 MOTION for Leave to File Responsive Brief filed byDepartment of Justice. (Related document(s) 248 ) (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 6/17/2016) Modified on 6/20/2016 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-06-22250ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 248 Motion for Leave to File responsive brief. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
2016-06-23251ORDER RE: DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. The DEA is ordered to retrieve the documents from Chambers on the 4th Floor, 280 S. First Street, San Jose, by 12:00 PM on 6/24/2016. Pickup may be coordinated with the Courtroom Deputy at 408.535.5343. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/23/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-28252ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL INFORMATION FROM GOVERNMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/28/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-30253RESPONSE to re 252 Order Defendant's Response to Order Requesting Additional Information From Government by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 6/30/2016) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-06254ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR MORE INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/6/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
2016-07-29255ORDER TERMINATING MOTION, VACATING HEARING, DIRECTING FILING OF NEW BRIEFS, AND SETTING NEW HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/29/2016. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-01Set/ Deadlines: Defendant's Motion for due by 8/12/2016, not to exceed 25 pages. Responses due by 8/26/2016 not to exceed 25 pages. Replies due by 9/2/2016, not to exceed 15 pages. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-03256MOTION for Leave to File Reply and Reschedule Hearing filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 8/3/2016) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
2016-08-04257Defendant's Opposition to 256 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Reply and Nonopposisiton to Plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule Hearing filed byDepartment of Justice. (Related document(s) 256 ) (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 8/4/2016) Modified on 8/5/2016 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-04258Proposed Order DENYING 256 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO RESCHEDULE HEARING by Department of Justice. (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 8/4/2016) Modified on 8/5/2016 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-08259ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 256 Motion for Leave to File a Reply and to Reschedule Hearing. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-12260Second MOTION Defendant's Second Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge Defendant's Second Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed by Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 8/26/2016. Replies due by 9/2/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Seecond Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 8/12/2016) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-24261NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Ellen London (London, Ellen) (Filed on 8/24/2016) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-24262STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 8/24/2016) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-31263ORDER granting 262 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Briefing Schedule filed by William Leonard Pickard. Reset Deadlines as to 260 Second MOTION Defendant's Second Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge. Responses due by 9/23/2016. Replies due by 10/7/2016. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/30/2016. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-23264RESPONSE (re 260 Second MOTION Defendant's Second Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge Defendant's Second Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge ) filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Rumold, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 9/23/2016) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-10-07265REPLY (re 260 Second MOTION Defendant's Second Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge Defendant's Second Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge ) filed byDepartment of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 10/7/2016) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-21266CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. Reset Hearing as to 260 Second MOTION Defendant's Second Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge Defendant's Second Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge . Motion Hearing reset for 11/4/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) , (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-11-04267Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2016 re 260 Second MOTION Defendant's Second Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge. Matter taken under submission. Total Time in Court 31 Minutes. Court Reporter: Leo Mankiewicz. Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Rumold. Defendant Attorney: Ellen London. This is a text only Minute Entry. There is no pdf image associated with this entry. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2016) Modified on 11/4/2016 (afmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-15268ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 260 Second Motion for De Novo Review and Holding that Government May Withhold Materials. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-17269Letter from Ellen London . (London, Ellen) (Filed on 11/17/2016) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-17270STATUS REPORT by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 11/17/2016) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2017-01-23271ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to set further Case Management Conference filed by William Leonard Pickard. Responses due by 1/27/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 1/23/2017) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-27272OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 271 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to set further Case Management Conference ) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(London, Ellen) (Filed on 1/27/2017) (Entered: 01/27/2017)
2017-02-13273ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 271 Administrative Motion to Set a Further Case Management Conference. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-02-13274JUDGMENT for defendant and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/13/2017. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017) Modified on 2/14/2017 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-03-10275MOTION for Reconsideration re 274 Judgment, 273 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 3/10/2017) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
2017-03-24276OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 275 MOTION for Reconsideration re 274 Judgment, 273 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 ) filed byDepartment of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(London, Ellen) (Filed on 3/24/2017) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
2017-03-31277REPLY (re 275 MOTION for Reconsideration re 274 Judgment, 273 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 ) filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 3/31/2017) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-31278ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 275 Motion for Reconsideration. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-05-08279NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by William Leonard Pickard. Appeal of Judgment 274 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11375042 paid.) (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2017) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-11280USCA Case Number 17-15945 for 279 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 05/11/2017)
2017-05-26281Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 11/04/16 before Judge CRB, re 279 Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 7/7/2017. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2017) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-26282TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/4/16 before Hon. Charles R. Breyer by William Leonard Pickard, for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 5/26/2017) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-12283Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/04/2016, before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com.. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 282 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/3/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2017. (Related documents(s) 282 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 6/12/2017) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-09-12284Certified and Transmitted Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re 279 Notice of Appeal. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
2017-09-18285Receipt for Appeal Record re 279 Notice of Appeal. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2018-01-31286ORDER of USCA as to 279 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2018) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-23287ORDER of USCA as to 279 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-02-23288USCA Amended Memorandum as to 279 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. The decision of the district court is affirmed in part, vacated in part and remanded. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2018) (Entered: 02/23/2018)
2018-03-13289MANDATE of USCA as to 279 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. The judgment of this Court, entered 12/13/17 amended 2/22/18, takes effect this date. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-13290CLERK'S Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel re 289 . (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
2018-03-16291CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Status Report due by 4/20/2018. Status Conference set for 4/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-03-19292Appeal Record Returned from USCA.(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2018) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-17293STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Case filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 4/17/2018) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
2018-04-18294STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY CASE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 293 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2018) (Entered: 04/18/2018)
2018-05-31295ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court : the petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 5/23/18 and placed on the docket as No. 17-1602. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-08-23296MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ; [PROPOSED] Order filed by William Leonard Pickard. Responses due by 9/6/2018. Replies due by 9/13/2018. (Rumold, Mark) (Filed on 8/23/2018) Modified on 8/23/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2018)
2018-08-27297ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 296 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) (Entered: 08/27/2018)
2018-09-11298ORDER of USCA as to 279 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-10-03299ORDER of U.S. Supreme Court as to 279 Notice of Appeal filed by William Leonard Pickard. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-26300ORDER LIFTING STAY AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/26/2018. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2018: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-26Set/Reset Hearing re 300 Order Lifting Stay Status Conference set for 11/30/2018 08:30 AM before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-28304STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Request to Continue Case Management Conference; [Proposed] Order filed by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 11/28/2018) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-29305ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 304 Stipulation. A Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2019. Status Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-12-03306Letter from William Leonard Pickard notifying the court that plaintiff has retained counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-26307STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Case filed by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 12/26/2018) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-07308STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY CASE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 307 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2019: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-23309NOTICE by United States Department of Justice (London, Ellen) (Filed on 1/23/2019) (Entered: 01/23/2019)
2019-02-13310STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Set New Deadlines filed by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 2/13/2019) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-13311STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET NEW DEADLINES by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 310 Stipulation. Status Report due by 3/8/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-03-08312STATUS REPORT and [Proposed] Order by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 3/8/2019) (Entered: 03/08/2019)
2019-03-13313ORDER - Re 312 Status Report filed by United States Department of Justice. A Stipulation or Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2019. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/13/2019. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-04-26314STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 4/26/2019) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-29315CLERK'S NOTICE: Status Report due by 6/28/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2019) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-06-28316STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 6/28/2019) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-11317ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE STIPULATION OR FURTHER STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/11/2019. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2019) (Entered: 07/11/2019)
2019-07-24318First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Timothy Litzenburg ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13547984.) filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Cert. of Good Standing)(Litzenburg, Timothy) (Filed on 7/24/2019) (Entered: 07/24/2019)
2019-07-29319STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 317 Order Joint Status Report filed by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 7/29/2019) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-07-29320ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Timothy Litzenburg by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 318 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019) (Entered: 07/29/2019)
2019-08-01321ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting 319 Stipulation. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-28322JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 8/28/2019) Modified on 8/29/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-10-07323JOINT STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 10/7/2019) Modified on 10/8/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-11324ORDER signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/11/2019. The case is stayed until December 31, 2019. A Joint Status Report due by January 8, 2020. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2020-01-08325STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 1/8/2020) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-21326NOTICE by William Leonard Pickard (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 2 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2020) (Entered: 01/22/2020)
2020-01-23327ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO SE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/23/2020. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2020) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/23/2020: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-02-21328MOTION re Status Conference filed by William Leonard Pickard. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2020) (Entered: 02/24/2020)
2020-02-27329ORDER REFERRING MATTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/27/2020. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-27330NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Neill Tai Tseng (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-27331REPLY (re 328 MOTION for Extension of Time to File) - Defendant's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion re Status Conference filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-02-27332CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Telephonic Case Management Conference for 4/22/2020, at 10:00 AM before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Parties are to confer with each other, but allowed to file separate statements, by 4/15/2020. The Courtroom Deputy will coordinate logistics with the parties in advance of the conference. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2020) (Entered: 02/27/2020)
2020-04-15333CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Defendant's Separate Case Management Statement filed by United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-15334ORDER REGARDING Case Management Statement. Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2020 is continued to 5/20/2020, at 10:00 AM by telephone only. Parties may join by calling 888.684.8852 and entering passcode 1557087. Pickard must file a case management statement by 5/13/2020. Defendant is ordered to serve this Order of Mr. Pickard within 7 days. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/15/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2020) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-16335CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Department of Justice re 334 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 4/16/2020) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-05-14338Statement re Status Conference by William Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope, # 2 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2020) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
2020-05-15336ORDER REGARDING Case Management Statement. Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2020, is reset for 6/17/2020, at 10:00 AM by telephonic participation only. Parties may join by calling 888.684.8852 and entering passcode 1557087. Pickard must file a statement by 6/10/2020. Defendant is ordered to serve this Order of Mr. Pickard within 7 days. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/15/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-05-18337CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Department of Justice re 336 Order,, Set Deadlines/Hearings, (Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 5/18/2020) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-06-17339Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Case Management Conference held on 6/17/2020. Government to produce documents as stated by 7/17; Plaintiff may file a motion challenging sufficiency of government response by 8/17; Opposition due by 8/31; reply due by 9/11. Hearing by telephone set for 9/23/2020,at 01:00 PM before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Plaintiff: Willliam Pickard. For Defendant: Neil Tseng. FTR Time: AT&T Conference (10:15am - 10:40am). Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/17/2020) (Entered: 06/17/2020)
2020-08-17340MOTION Extension of time to recieve and review the records released by plaintiff filed by William Leonard Pickard. Responses due by 8/31/2020. Replies due by 9/8/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2020) (Entered: 08/19/2020)
2020-08-20341Statement of Non-Opposition Defendants Statement of Non-opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 8/20/2020) (Entered: 08/20/2020)
2020-08-21342ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME. Plaintiff's new deadline to file a motion challenging sufficiency of the government's document production is 9/21/2020. Defendant's opposition is due by 10/5/2020. Plaintiff's reply is due by 10/12/2020. The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on the motion on 10/21/2020, at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)
2020-09-21343MOTION Extension of time to recieve and review records filed by William Leonard Pickard. Responses due by 10/19/2020. Replies due by 11/2/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2020) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-24344Statement of Non-Opposition Defendant's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (Dkt. No. 343) filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Tseng, Neill) (Filed on 9/24/2020) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-24345ORDER GRANTING 343 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME. Plaintiff's new deadline to file a motion challenging sufficiency of the government's document production is 10/26/2020. Defendant's opposition is due by 11/2/2020. Plaintiff's reply is due by 11/9/2020. The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on the motion on 11/18/2020, at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-24346Second Motion for Extension of Time by William Leonard Pickard (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 2 Envelope)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-25347ORDER DENYING 346 Second Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/25/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-10-09348NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Valerie Elizabeth Smith (Smith, Valerie) (Filed on 10/9/2020) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-26349Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Pickard, William) (Filed on 10/26/2020) (Entered: 10/26/2020)
2020-10-27350ORDER GRANTING 349 MOTION TO EXTEND TIME. Plaintiff's new deadline to file a motion challenging sufficiency of the government's document production is 11/30/2020. Defendant's opposition is due by 12/7/2020. Plaintiff's reply is due by 12/14/2020. The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on the motion on 12/23/2020, at 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2020) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-11-30351Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Pickard, William) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-30Electronic filing error . Document filed with incorrect case number. [err401]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 351 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by William Leonard Pickard (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-30352ORDER EXTENDING TIME. The Court ORDERS a thirty-day extension of time for Pickard to file his motion challenging the sufficiency of the government's document production. Pickard's new deadline to file the motion is 12/30/2020. Defendant's opposition is due by 1/13/2021. Plaintiff's reply is due by 1/20/2021. The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on the motion on 1/27/2021, at 11:00 AM. The hearing previously set for 12/23/2021, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/30/2020. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2020) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-30353Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Pickard, William) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2020-12-31354ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME. Re: ECF 353 . Pickard's new deadline to file the motion is 1/29/2021. Defendant's opposition is due by 2/12/2021. Plaintiff's reply is due by 2/19/2021. The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on the motion on 2/24/2021, at 11:00 AM. The hearing previously set for 1/27/2021, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2020) (Entered: 12/31/2020)
2021-02-01355Sixth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Document filed by William Leonard Pickard. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer of Documents from USP Tucson)(Pickard, William) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-01356ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME. RE: ECF 355 . Future motions for extensions are disfavored. Pickard's new deadline to file the motion is 4/1/2021. Defendant's opposition is due by 4/15/2021. Plaintiff's reply is due by 4/22/2021. The Court will hold a telephonic hearing on the motion on 5/5/2021, at 11:00 AM. The hearing previously set for 2/24/2021, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2021). (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-04-01357First MOTION production of document filed by William Leonard Pickard. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2021 11:00 AM in Do Not Use Telephone Conference Only before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 4/15/2021. Replies due by 4/22/2021. (Pickard, William) (Filed on 4/1/2021) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-15358OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 357 First MOTION production of document ) filed byUnited States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Angela D. Hertel, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Smith, Valerie) (Filed on 4/15/2021) (Entered: 04/15/2021)
2021-04-22359REPLY (re 357 First MOTION production of document ) filed byWilliam Leonard Pickard. (Pickard, William) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
2021-05-05360Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re: 357 Plaintiff's Motion for Production of Documents held on 5/5/2021 by AT&T Conference. Parties to confer further by 5/19. Pickard to file supplemental brief by 5/21. No reply required. Further Hearing set for 5/26/2021, at 11:00 AM by telephone. Plaintiff: William Pickard. Attorney for Defendant: Valerie Smith. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Time in Court: 21 minutes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2021) (Entered: 05/05/2021)
2021-05-19361STATUS REPORT Response to Court Order by William Leonard Pickard. (Pickard, William) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
2021-05-20Electronic filing error . Incorrect case number listed. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file with correct year for case number. Re: 361 Status Re port filed by William Leonard Pickard (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021) (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-05-26362Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Further Hearing re 357 Motion for Production of Documents held on 5/26/2021. Plaintiff by 6/1 to identify bates number of document referenced at hearing regarding authenticity. Parties are requested to each provide an update by 6/23/2021; Further Hearing set for 6/30/2021, at 11:30 AM. Plaintiff: William Pickard. Attorney for Defendant: Valerie Smith. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Time in Court: 12 minutes). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/26/2021) (Entered: 05/26/2021)
2021-06-01363RESPONSE to Court Order re Risk Assessment by William Leonard Pickard. (Pickard, William) (Filed on 6/1/2021) (Entered: 06/01/2021)
2021-06-02Electronic filing error . Incorrect case number listed. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 363 Response ( Non Mot ion ) filed by William Leonard Pickard (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2021) (Entered: 06/02/2021)
2021-06-23364STATUS REPORT by Defendant by United States Department of Justice. (Smith, Valerie) (Filed on 6/23/2021) (Entered: 06/23/2021)
2021-06-29365CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Further Hearing Re: 357 Motion for Production of Documents. Telephonic hearing set for 6/30/2021, is continued to 7/28/2021, at 11:00 AM, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Dial in: 888.684.8852. Access code: 1557087. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2021) (Entered: 06/29/2021)
2021-07-28366Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Further Hearing re Motion for Production of Documents held on 7/28/2021. Court to issue ruling. Plaintiff: William Pickard. Attorney for Defendant: Valerie Smith AT&T Conference Recording: 11:05 AM - 11:13 am. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2021) (Entered: 07/28/2021)
2021-08-19367ORDER, Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge N Cousins denying 357 Motion to Compel Production of Documents, with Recommendation to Dismiss Case. (Cousins, Nathanael) (Filed on 8/19/2021) <hr><center>Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)</center> (Entered: 08/19/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar