Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePINSON v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2012cv01872
Date Filed2012-11-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJEREMY PINSON
PlaintiffMICHAEL STINE
TERMINATED: 10/25/2013
PlaintiffCHRIS DENNISON
TERMINATED: 10/01/2013
PlaintiffGREG MURRAY
TERMINATED: 10/25/2013
PlaintiffMIKEAL GLENN STINE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
TERMINATED: 10/24/2013
DefendantCHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR.
DefendantBLAKE DAVIS
TERMINATED: 10/24/2013
DefendantJOHN DIGNAM
DefendantU.S. MARSHAL SERVICE
DefendantOFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantOFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantOFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION
DefendantOFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL
TERMINATED: 08/20/2014
DefendantOFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY
DefendantMIKEAL GLENN STINE
TERMINATED: 07/10/2014
DefendantJAMIL ABDULLAH AL-AMIN
TERMINATED: 07/10/2014
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [26]
Opinion/Order [90]
Opinion/Order [110]
Opinion/Order [112]
Opinion/Order [115]
Opinion/Order [117]
Opinion/Order [142]
Opinion/Order [163]
Opinion/Order [169]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Rudolph Contreras has ruled that the U.S. Marshals Service has shown that federal prisoner Jeremy Pinson failed to exhaust his administrative remedies in relation to his request for records concerning Jamil Abdullah Al-Amin, another prisoner, after Pinson was told the agency would not disclose the records without Al-Amin's consent. Pinson did not appeal the decision, but instead filed another request for Al-Amin's records, this time accompanied by a consent form signed by Al-Amin. The Marshals Service concluded that Al-Amin's signature was not authentic and denied the request. Dismissing the first request on exhaustion grounds, Contreras noted that "Mr. Pinson avers nothing suggesting that he disputes the DOJ's exhaustion argument." He added that "as a consequence, this Court finds that Mr. Pinson has effectively conceded that he failed to appeal the USMS's decision and thus failed to exhaust his administrative remedies regarding [his first request]." As to the second request, USMS contended Al-Amin's signature was not authentic. But Contreras pointed out that DOJ had made the same argument previously in connection to Pinson's request for Al-Amin's records from DOJ's National Security Division. At that time, Contreras had ordered DOJ to contact Al-Amin to confirm the authenticity of his signature. As a result of that investigation, Al-Amin confirmed that he had signed the certification of identity giving Pinson permission to access his records, including those from USMS. Contreras observed that "the DOJ's own submissions offer two contradictory versions of the facts. . . Accordingly, because the DOJ has submitted a declaration contradicting the evidence it relies on in its motion, summary judgment is not appropriate."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to Exhaust
Opinion/Order [186]
FOIA Project Annotation: Continuing to resolve prisoner Jeremy Pinson's multiple suits against the Justice Department, Judge Rudolph Contreras has ruled that Pinson's failure to oppose the Civil Division's claim that records responsive to one of his requests were protected under Exemption 5 (privileges) meant he had conceded that point. However, in dealing with another of Pinson's requests for records pertaining to suits complaining of conditions at the Florence, Colorado federal penitentiary, Contreras has found that the Civil Division failed to show that a search for records was unduly burdensome. The Civil Division argued that because its databases were not set up to conduct such a search it was unduly burdensome. Based on that claim alone, Contreras disagreed. He noted that "where an agency has provided a good faith estimate of the excessive amount of time required to complete a search that it feels is unreasonably burdensome, this Court has upheld the agency's refusal to conduct the requested search. But where an agency vaguely characterizes a search as 'costly' and notes that such a search would 'take many hours to complete,' this Court has rejected the agency's claim as inadequate in explaining why the search would be unreasonably burdensome." Applying this to the case at hand, Contreras observed that "the DOJ, however, offers no estimate of the time required to conduct Mr. Pinson's requested search, the cost of such a search, or the number of files that would have to be manually searched. Moreover, the DOJ fails to explain why a more limited search would be unfruitful or whether other parts of the Civil Division might have easier access to, at least, some of the requested information. The Court is unable to grant summary judgment to the government without knowing, at the very least, the number of Civil Division files the DOJ would have to search or the amount of time that would be required to locate documents responsive to Mr. Pinson's request."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to Exhaust, Choice of format - Burdensome
Opinion/Order [199]
Opinion/Order [200]
Opinion/Order [203]
FOIA Project Annotation: In yet another ruling in federal prisoner Jeremy Pinson's FOIA suit against the Justice Department, Judge Rudolph Contreras has appointed counsel to Pinson, but has denied his various sanction motions against DOJ. Because of restrictions on the ability of prisoners to retain documents, Pinson argued that counsel should be appointed to represent him and that, further, DOJ should be sanctioned because the Bureau of Prisons restricted his ability to receive documents. DOJ agreed that a counsel should be appointed to represent Pinson and suggested such a counsel "for the limited purpose of reviewing the FOIA responses and challenging any alleged deficiencies would be appropriate and in the interests of justice." DOJ noted that "counsel could also benefit Mr. Pinson by serving as custodian of any documents that the BOP will not allow him to possess while in prison." Contreras agreed, observing that "because Mr. Pinson is currently unable to view documents relevant to this litigation, and in light of the fact that a number of his FOIA claims have proven meritorious and survived Defendants' motions for partial summary judgment, appointment of counsel is appropriate and will serve the interests of justice." Contreras found that DOJ had done its best to work with Pinson in receiving motions and noted that "but this FOIA litigation is not the proper vehicle for Mr. Pinson to challenge BOP security policies."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction
Opinion/Order [228]
FOIA Project Annotation: In his continuing efforts to wade through the multiple issues remaining from a series of requests made by prisoner Jeremy Pinson, Judge Rudolph Contreras has ruled that the Criminal Division of the Department of Justice has adequately explained why Pinson's request for all settlement agreements stemming from litigation challenging conditions at the federal prison in Florence, Colorado is unduly burdensome. Pinson limited the agency to the statutory two hours of search time for his request. The agency said its case database was not configured for such a search and estimated that a search would take 44,886 hours at $1,256,808. Pinson argued the search could easily be narrowed by contacting the U.S. attorneys in Colorado who worked on such cases. This time, the Criminal Division estimated the time at 1,300 hours at a cost of $36,000. Contreras accepted the revised estimate as accurate. He noted that "although Mr. Pinson argues that contacting U.S. Attorneys could reduce the scope of the search, he has provided no authority to suggest that the Civil Division bears the burden under FOIA of soliciting information from other DOJ components in an effort to narrow an otherwise unduly burdensome search. Moreover, it is highly unlikely that even the type of search that Mr. Pinson suggests could be accomplished within the two-hour limit he imposed."
Issues: Choice of format - Burdensome, Fees, Search
Opinion/Order [246]
Opinion/Order [259]
Opinion/Order [268]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Rudolph Contreras has ruled OIP conducted adequate searches for three requests filed by prisoner Jeremy Pinson, but because the agency sent its response to one of the requests to an address different from that Pinson had provided the agency must remail the materials to the correct address. Pinson, who is currently litigating multiple requests he sent concerning the Bureau of Prisons, made a request to the Office of the Attorney General for correspondence or emails from the Office of the Attorney General intended for the Director of the Bureau of Prisons. Pinson told OIP that he did not want the agency to spend more than the allotted free two hours of search and 100 pages of duplication. The agency searched the Departmental Executive Secretariat's database under the name of Harley Lappin, who was then the Director of BOP, and found 72 pages, released 40 pages, and referred the remaining 32 pages to BOP. Pinson did not challenge any exemption claims. His second request was for records related to any AG involvement with three European Court of Human Rights cases. Again, he limited the search and duplication to avoid paying fees. The agency again searched the DES database for the names of the individuals involved in the three ECHR cases and also searched for any indication that the Attorney General had been in contact with the ECHR at the time of the cases. OIP found no records. Pinson's third request was for records concerning the selection of Charles Samuels, the current director of BOP, and Paul Laird, the regional director of BOP. That search produced 139 pages. OIP released 72 pages in full and 60 pages with redactions and withheld seven pages. Although Pinson's request had been sent from ADX Florence, OIP mailed the response to him at the Federal Detention Center in Houston after determining that he had been temporarily transferred there. Pinson challenged the redaction of the name of one individual who had recommended Samuels for his current position under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Contreras found the agency had conducted adequate searches for all three requests. Pinson challenged the agency's no records response to his request for contacts with the Attorney General pertaining to the three ECHR cases, arguing that there was evidence that the European court had contacted both the Department of Justice and the State Department. Rejecting the claim, Contreras noted that "but this assertion proves nothing. Plaintiff fails to provide the excerpts from the docket to which he refers so that the Court may assess how 'clear' its entries are. More importantly, even taking Plaintiff's assertion at face value only indicates that the Department of Justice may have contributed to the proceeding, not the Attorney General himself (or anyone on his immediate staff)." On Pinson's third request, Contreras noted that "based on the record presented, OIP should have sent the documents to the last location Plaintiff had indicated he was held, i.e., Florence. Alternatively, to the extent that OIP independently took it upon itself to determine that Plaintiff had moved to Houston when it sent the interim response, it should have made the same independent inquiry later on when it provided its final response and erroneously mailed the responsive documents to Houston." Contreras found that OIP had improperly redacted the name of an individual recommending Samuels. He pointed out that "the specific person who made the recommendation could potentially have made significant individual political contributions or have some other non-obvious personal or professional connection to the government decision makers at issue that is separate and apart from his or her employer. The revelation of such information would be of significant interest to the public because it would reflect on what the government is up to."
Issues: Adequacy - Search
Opinion/Order [276]
FOIA Project Annotation: In another opinion dealing with multiple requests from prisoner Jeremy Pinson to the Department of Justice, Judge Rudolph Contreras has ruled that the FBI properly responded to those requests sent to it. Hardly any of the requests to the FBI pertained to records about Pinson, although some of them asked for records about other individuals, many of whom provided Pinson with Privacy Act waivers. But the most common denominator in responding to Pinson's requests was the effect of the Bureau of Prison's strict limitations on prisoners' ability to have possession of documents. In a number of the requests in dispute, Pinson either claimed he had not received the documents personally or that he had no knowledge of whether attorneys he had designated as alternative recipients of records had received them. Overall, Contreras found that Pinson had failed to show that the FBI had not properly responded. In reference to one request, Contreras observed that "here, DOJ has provided a detailed declaration and provided documents, which include Mr. Pinson's requests and correspondence, as well as the FBI's dated responses to Mr. Pinson's letters. Mr. Pinson, in contrast, has not only failed to address the government's argument, but also failed to provide counter evidence that either [of his attorneys] did not receive these responses." Because most of the FBI's defenses against Pinson's claims hinged on whether he had exhausted his administrative remedies one issue that virtually never gets analyzed was the effect of the Office of Information Policy's decision to close a pending administrative appeal because the case was already in litigation. While the FBI argued Pinson had failed to exhaust his administrative remedies in relation to that appeal, Contreras indicated that "here, the OIP failed to make a determination within twenty days and instead closed the appeal on February 11, 2013, by which time 62 days had lapsed since the appeal was filed on December 11, 2012. Because the OIP failed to make a timely determination and Mr. Pinson included this request in [his complaint] filed on October 23, 2013, after OIP's closure of the appeal, Mr. Pinson is deemed to have constructively exhausted his administrative remedies." Contreras upheld all the agency's exemption claims, most of them under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Contreras expressed some sympathy with Pinson's argument that there were a number of potential public interests that could be balanced against the privacy interests of both government employees and third parties. Pinson argued the agency should disclose names of foreign government officials who were mentioned in some records. But Contreras indicated that "the public interest is in the disclosure of the foreign government's participation, not of the identifying information of each individual foreign official. As a result, while the public interest in disclosure of foreign government participation may be substantial, the public interest in the identifying information of law enforcement officials is minimal."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to Exhaust, Exemption 7(C) - Invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records
Opinion/Order [283]
Opinion/Order [291]
FOIA Project Annotation: In yet another opinion in his resolution of multiple FOIA requests submitted to the Department of Justice by prisoner Jeremy Pinson, Judge Rudolph Contreras has ruled that the Executive Office for U.S. Attorneys has still not shown that it conducted an adequate search for some of Pinson's requests, but that for others Contreras deemed the agency's explanation of its search sufficient. The descriptions of many of Pinson's requests to EOUSA sound like text-book fishing expeditions designed to waste the agency's time and resources. Almost all of them were for records of various named cases in districts across the country with no apparent connection to Pinson in any way. While the agency initially deflected some requests where third party defendants were named by claiming the agency could not disclose any information for privacy reasons, Pinson was successful in arguing that he was requesting only public record information in the cases. Contreras noted in reference to one such request that "the fact that the agency did produce some records indicates that the documents are not confined to third parties, despite the agency's initial claims to the contrary." For some requests the agency disclosed records, but for others the agency claimed it could find no records. Contreras declined to grant summary judgment to the agency on those requests, indicating that such responses failed to explain the manner in which the agency searched for responsive records. But for several requests Contreras was satisfied the agency had explained with sufficient detail how the search was conducted. For those requests he granted the agency's motion for summary judgment.
Issues: Search - Reasonableness of search
Opinion/Order [306]
Opinion/Order [309]
Opinion/Order [357]
Opinion/Order [360]
Opinion/Order [362]
Opinion/Order [364]
FOIA Project Annotation: In another of his opinions resolving multiple requests from inmate Jeremy Pinson to the Justice Department Judge Rudolph Contreras has ruled that the FBI has now shown that it conducted adequate searches for the majority of Pinson's requests to the agency that had not been resolved and that it properly withheld some records under Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records) and Exemption 7(D) (confidential sources). In response to several of Pinson's requests the FBI told him that responsive records were available online. Contreras found the FBI reference to online records was insufficient as to one request, but adequate as to the other. He noted that "although directing a requester to a public set of documents that would otherwise be responsive to the request is acceptable under FOIA, the FBI has done nothing more than assert, in conclusory terms, that the documents available on its vault are responsive. The FBI never explains whether there are other responsive documents not on the vault, how those documents were chosen, or whether the vault was up-to-date at the time of Pinson's request." As to the other online reference, Contreras indicated that "the FBI re-mailed correspondence related to this request to Pinson, once again informing her that the requested documents could be accessed for fee on the FBI's public website. Going even further, the FBI also re-reviewed the already publicly-available documents and determined that it could release further reasonably segregable material that was previously redacted." Pinson argued that because the agency had heavily redacted many of the disclosed records, she could not assess whether the agency had conducted an adequate segregability analysis. But Contreras noted that "the conclusory statement that a document is heavily redacted does not suffice to refute an agency's detailed showing that all reasonably segregable material has been released."
Issues: Adequacy - Search
Opinion/Order [366]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2012-11-151COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 4616052742) filed by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
2012-11-15SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
2012-12-032AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JEREMY PINSON.(jf, ) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
2012-12-113NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Ekeoma Dike on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Dike, Theresa) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
2012-12-204MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 2 Amended Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for extension of time)(Dike, Theresa) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
2013-01-07MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall respond to the complaint no later than March 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 7, 2013. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
2013-01-115STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 9/30/2013.....SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JEREMY PINSON. "Let this be Filed," signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/11/2013.(dr) Modified on 10/1/2013 (znmw, ). (Entered: 01/14/2013)
2013-01-116MOTION for Joinder of Plaintiff by JEREMY PINSON. "Let this be Filed," signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/11/2013. (dr) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
2013-01-117MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Dennison by JEREMY PINSON. "Let this be Filed," signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras. (dr) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
2013-02-278MOTION to Strike 5 Amended Complaint by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Shon Kuta Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Dike, Theresa) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
2013-02-279MOTION to Strike 7 MOTION to Dismiss, 6 MOTION for Joinder by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Shon Kuta Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Dike, Theresa) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
2013-03-1110MOTION to Strike 5 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
2013-03-1111MOTION for Leave to File re-amend complaint to add parties by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
2013-03-1112MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 03/12/2013)
2013-03-1513MOTION for Hearing, MOTION for Sanctions by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
2013-03-1514RESPONSE re 9 MOTION to Strike 7 MOTION to Dismiss, 6 MOTION for Joinder , 8 MOTION to Strike 5 Amended Complaint filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
2013-03-1515MOTION for Vaughn Index by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
2013-03-2116RESPONSE re 10 MOTION to Strike 5 Amended Complaint filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dike, Theresa) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
2013-03-2117RESPONSE re 11 MOTION for Leave to File filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dike, Theresa) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
2013-03-2118RESPONSE re 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dike, Theresa) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
2013-03-2119RESPONSE re 13 MOTION for Hearing MOTION for Sanctions filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dike, Theresa) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
2013-03-2120RESPONSE re 15 MOTION for Vaughn Index filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dike, Theresa) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
2013-03-22NOTICE OF ERROR re 20 Response to motion; emailed to theresa.dike@usdoj.gov, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. In future, make only one docket entry and select all relevant motions; do not file multiple times. (znmw, ) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
2013-07-1821ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by John H. Spittell on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Theresa Dike (Spittell, John) Modified on 7/19/2013 (znmw, ). (Entered: 07/18/2013)
2013-07-1822ENTERED IN ERROR.....CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 21 Substitution of Counsel . (Spittell, John) Modified on 7/19/2013 (rdj). (Entered: 07/18/2013)
2013-07-1823CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 21 Substitution of Counsel. (rdj) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-07-19NOTICE OF ERROR re 21 Substitution of Counsel; emailed to john.spittell@usdoj.gov, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. Entered in error; Incorrect case number; Please refile. (znmw, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-07-19NOTICE OF ERROR re 22 Certificate of Service; emailed to john.spittell@usdoj.gov, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. Entered in error; Separate COS must contain full case caption; Refile with Notice of Subsitution. (znmw, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-07-1924NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL - by John H. Spittell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; Substituting for attorney Theresa Dike. (ztnr, ) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
2013-09-3025ORDER denying 6 Motion for Joinder; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion to Strike; granting 9 Motion to Strike; granting 10 Motion to Strike; granting 11 Motion for Leave to File; denying without prejudice 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying without prejudice 13 Motion for Hearing; denying without prejudice 13 Motion for Sanctions; denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Vaughn Index. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/30/2013. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
2013-09-3026MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 6 Motion for Joinder; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting 8 Motion to Strike; granting 9 Motion to Strike; granting 10 Motion to Strike; granting 11 Motion for Leave to File; denying without prejudice 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying without prejudice 13 Motion for Hearing; denying without prejudice 13 Motion for Sanctions; denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Vaughn Index. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/30/2013. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
2013-10-0827SUPPLEMENT to Complaint filed by JEREMY PINSON. "Let this be filed.", by Judge Rudolph Contreras(rdj) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
2013-10-1528NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Ezekiel Ross on behalf of All Defendants (Ross, Carl) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
2013-10-1529MOTION to Stay by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Carl) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
2013-10-16MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion to Stay ALL Proceedings. It is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings in this case are STAYED due to a lapse in the appropriations act that had been funding the Department of Justice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that upon restoration of appropriations, all current deadlines for the parties shall be extended commensurate with the duration of the lapse in appropriations. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 16, 2013. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
2013-10-1830MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Leave to File a Supplement by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
2013-10-2331MOTION to Issue Summons to new defendants by JEREMY PINSON "Leave to file granted, Let this be filed" signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/22/2013 (jf, ) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
2013-10-2332Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (official/individual capacity) filed by JEREMY PINSON.(jf, ) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
2013-10-2433NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kimberly J. Duplechain on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney John H. Spittell (Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
2013-11-1534MOTION for Leave to File Out of Time by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
2013-11-1535Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION for Discovery MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Leave to File Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Limited Discovery filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
2013-11-18MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Opposition. It is hereby ORDERED that the time by which Defendants must respond to Plaintiff's motion for limited discovery is extended, nunc pro tunc, up to and including November 15, 2013. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/18/2103. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/18/2013)
2013-11-1936MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 32 Amended Complaint by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
2013-11-20MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that that the Motion for Extension of Time is granted nunc pro tunc. Defendants may file answers to Plaintiff's Corrected Amended Complaint no later than January 24, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/20/2013. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
2013-11-2137MOTION to Dismiss by CHRIS DENNISON. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/21/2013 (jf, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
2013-12-1338MOTION for Sanctions by JEREMY PINSON (td, ) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
2013-12-2639Memorandum in opposition to re 38 MOTION for Sanctions filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
2014-01-2240MOTION for Briefing Schedule by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Lundy Decl.)(Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
2014-01-2441ORDER granting 40 Defendants' motion to amend the briefing schedule. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/24/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
2014-02-0442NOTICE of Appearance by Judith A. Kidwell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
2014-02-0443MOTION for Order Scheduling Briefing by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ordering amended briefing schedule)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
2014-02-0744ORDER granting 43 Defendants' second motion to amend the briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/7/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/07/2014)
2014-02-1945MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As To DEA , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration William C. Little, Jr., # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Text of Proposed Order granting Motion To Dismiss As To DEA Claims)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
2014-02-2446FOX/NEAL Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/24/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
2014-02-2647MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As to Civil Rights Division , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As to Civil Rights Division by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Hermilla Decl. & Exhibits)(Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
2014-02-2648MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As To Criminal Division , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Criminal Division by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Cunningham Decl. & Exhibits)(Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
2014-02-2649MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As To National Security Division , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To National Security Division by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Mallory Decl. & Exhibits)(Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
2014-02-26Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/24/2014 (tj ) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
2014-02-2650FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/26/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
2014-02-2651FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/26/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
2014-02-2652FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/26/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
2014-02-28Set Deadlines: Responses due by 3/26/2014 (tj ) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
2014-03-0453MOTION for Order by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
2014-03-1154MOTION for Extension of Time to File dispositive motion as to OIG claims by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting DOJ until March 19, 2014 to file dispositive motion as to OIG claims)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
2014-03-1255MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Plaintiff's Claims As To DOJ's Civil Division by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration James M. Kovakas, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Granting DOJ partial summary judgment)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
2014-03-13MINUTE ORDER granting 54 The Department of Justice's Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the Department of Justice shall file any dispositive motions, with respect to the claims concering the DOJ's Office of Inspector General, on or before March 19, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/13/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-1356Memorandum in opposition to re 53 MOTION for Order filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For An Order)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-13Set Deadlines: Motions due by 3/19/2014. (tj, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-1357FOX/NEAL Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/13/2013. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
2014-03-14Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 4/13/2014 (tj ) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
2014-03-1858MOTION for Extension of Time to File DOJ's dispositive Motion Concerning OIG Claims by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting DOJ An Extension Until March 21, 2014)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/18/2014)
2014-03-1859RESPONSE re 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Plaintiff's Claims As To DOJ's Civil Division , 49 MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As To National Security Division MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To National Security Division , 45 MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As To DEA MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , 47 MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As to Civil Rights Division MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As to Civil Rights Division , 48 MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As To Criminal Division MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Criminal Division filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
2014-03-1860MOTION to Compel by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
2014-03-19MINUTE ORDER granting 58 The Department of Justice's Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the Department of Justice shall file any dispositive motions, with respect to the claims concering the DOJ's Office of Inspector General, on or before March 21, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/19/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-03-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion due by 3/21/2014. (zgdf) (Entered: 03/19/2014)
2014-03-2061MOTION for Order To Amend Briefing Schedule For All Parties by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Briefing Schedule Order)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
2014-03-21MINUTE ORDER granting 61 Defendants' motion to amend the briefing schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's second amended complaint and any additional dispositive motions, shall be filed on or before May 30, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/21/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
2014-03-21Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/30/2014 (tj) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
2014-03-2162MOTION to Dismiss As To OIG Claims , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Waller, # 4 Exhibit Chart of Requests, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/21/2014)
2014-03-2463MOTION to Dismiss In Part, or, Alternatively , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Claim as to the Office of Legal Counsel by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Colborn Decl. & Exhibits)(Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/24/2014)
2014-03-2564FOX/NEAL Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/25/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
2014-03-2565FOX/NEAL Order advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/25/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/25/2014)
2014-03-2666MOTION to Dismiss , In Part, or, Alternatively , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims as to the United States Marshals Service by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Bordley Declaration & Exhibits)(Duplechain, Kimberly) Modified on 4/17/2014 (zjf, ). (Entered: 03/26/2014)
2014-03-2667NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attorney Kimberly J. Duplechain terminated. (Duplechain, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
2014-03-2668MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Plaintiff's Response (ECF No. 59) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting DOJ unitl March 31, 2014 to file replies)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
2014-03-2669RESPONSE re 60 MOTION to Compel filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Kindra Vargas)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
2014-03-2870FOX NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/28/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
2014-03-28MINUTE ORDER granting 68 Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's replies to Plaintiff's responses 59 shall be filed on or before March 31, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/28/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/28/2014)
2014-03-3171REPLY to opposition to motion re 47 MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As to Civil Rights Division MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As to Civil Rights Division filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
2014-03-3172REPLY to opposition to motion re 49 MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As To National Security Division MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To National Security Division filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
2014-03-3173REPLY to opposition to motion re 48 MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As To Criminal Division MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Criminal Division filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
2014-03-3174RESPONSE re 45 MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As To DEA MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
2014-04-0375RESPONSE re 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Plaintiff's Claims As To DOJ's Civil Division filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
2014-04-0976REPLY to opposition to motion re 45 MOTION to Dismiss In Part, As To DEA MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
2014-04-0977REPLY to opposition to motion re 55 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To Plaintiff's Claims As To DOJ's Civil Division filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
2014-04-1178RESPONSE re 66 MOTION to Dismiss , In Part, or, Alternatively MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims as to the United States Marshals Service filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/15/2014)
2014-04-1479RESPONSE re 62 MOTION to Dismiss As To OIG Claims MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/17/2014)
2014-04-2180REPLY to opposition to motion re 66 MOTION to Dismiss , In Part, or, Alternatively MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiffs Claims as to the United States Marshals Service filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
2014-04-2181MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting DOJ Until April 24, 2014 to file a reply to Plaintiff's response at ECF No. 79)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 04/21/2014)
2014-04-22MINUTE ORDER granting 81 Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant United States Department of Justice's reply to 79 Plaintiff's response shall be filed on or before April 24, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/22/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/22/2014)
2014-04-2283STIPULATED MOTION to Intervene by JEREMY PINSON "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Rudolph Contreras(rdj) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
2014-04-2382REPLY to opposition to motion re 62 MOTION to Dismiss As To OIG Claims MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
2014-04-2584Memorandum in opposition to re 83 MOTION to Intervene filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Intervene)(Kidwell, Judith) Modified on 4/25/2014 (jf, ). (Entered: 04/25/2014)
2014-05-0585MOTION in Limine or Order to Produce Rules by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
2014-05-2386MOTION for Extension of Time to File Remaining Dispositive Motions by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David Hardy, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
2014-05-2787MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Stephanie Boucher, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Kidwell, Judith) (Entered: 05/27/2014)
2014-05-28MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants shall file any remaining dispositive motions in this case on or before October 1, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/28/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
2014-05-28Reset Deadlines: Any remaining Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2014. (tj ) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
2014-06-1688Memorandum in opposition to re 86 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Remaining Dispositive Motions filed by JEREMY PINSON. (td, ) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
2014-07-1089ORDER denying 30 Motion for Discovery; denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying 30 Motion for Leave to Supplement. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/10/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1090MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 30 Motion for Discovery; denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying 30 Motion for Leave to Supplement. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/10/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1091ORDER granting 31 Motion to Issue Summons to New Defendants. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/10/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1092ORDER denying 37 Chris Dennison's Motion to Dismiss. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/10/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1093ORDER denying 38 Plaintiff's motion for sanctions; and denying 39 Defendant's request to prohibit Plaintiff from filing any further motions without leave from the Court. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/10/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1094ORDER denying in part 53 Motion for Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/10/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1095ORDER denying as moot 60 Motion to Compel Service. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/10/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1096ORDER denying 83 Motion to Intervene. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/10/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-1097ORDER denying 85 Motion in Limine. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/10/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
2014-07-2898ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/28/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
2014-07-28Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/28/2014. (tj ) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
2014-07-2899ORDER directing the Defendant to inform the Court as to whether it intends to file a dispositive motion. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/28/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
2014-08-11100NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Shannon L. Fagan on behalf of JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE Substituting for attorney Judith Kidwell (Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
2014-08-11101STATUS REPORT by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 08/11/2014)
2014-08-15102MOTION to Enforce Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf, ) (Entered: 08/18/2014)
2014-08-18103RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 98 Order filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
2014-08-19MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Claim as to the Office of Legal Counsel as conceded; and granting 87 Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff's Claim as to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, Firearms, and Explosives as conceded. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/19/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
2014-08-25104MOTION for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 08/25/2014)
2014-08-26MINUTE ORDER granting 104 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's opposition to Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction shall be filed on or before August 28, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/26/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/26/2014)
2014-08-28105Memorandum in opposition to re 102 MOTION to Enforce MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
2014-09-08106MOTION for Order To Produce Documents by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 09/09/2014)
2014-09-11107REPLY to opposition to re 102 MOTION to Enforce MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
2014-09-18108Memorandum in opposition to re 106 MOTION for Order To Produce Documents filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
2014-09-24109ORDER granting in part and denying in part as moot 47 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
2014-09-24110MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part as moot 47 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
2014-09-24111ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
2014-09-24112MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 48 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/24/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
2014-09-26113MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION for Protective Order, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
2014-09-30114ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/30/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-09-30115MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 45 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/30/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-09-30116ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/30/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-09-30117MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/30/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
2014-10-01118MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/01/2014)
2014-10-06119ORDER granting in part and denying in part 118 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/06/2014. (lcrc2) ( (Entered: 10/06/2014)
2014-10-09120RESPONSE re 113 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration and Exhibits A, B, C, D, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F, # 4 Exhibit G, # 5 Exhibit H)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
2014-10-10Set Deadlines: Motions due by 12/19/2014. (tj ) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
2014-10-10121RESPONSE re 113 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
2014-10-16122ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Joseph Young on behalf of NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION (Young, Eric) Modified on 10/16/2014 (td, ). (Entered: 10/16/2014)
2014-10-16NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 122 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (td, ) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
2014-10-16123NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Joseph Young on behalf of All Defendants (Young, Eric) (Entered: 10/16/2014)
2014-10-20124NOTICE of Change of Address by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-20125MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Compel by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-21126RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 114 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration and Exhibit)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-21127ERRATA to Certificate of Service by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE 126 Response to Order of the Court,, filed by NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, BLAKE DAVIS, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR.. (Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
2014-10-24128MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Briefing Pursuant to Court Order Dkt. No. 111 by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
2014-10-24MINUTE ORDER granting 128 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's motion for an extension of time to file supplemental briefing regarding the "2011 Budget" portion of FOIA Request No. 11-351-P is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's supplemental brief shall be due on or before October 31, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/24/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
2014-10-27129SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 116 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration and Exhibit A)(Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
2014-10-28130NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Fagan, Shannon) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
2014-10-29131MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Declaration with Exhibits, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Eric) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
2014-10-31132RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 112 Memorandum & Opinion, 111 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration with Exhibit)(Young, Eric) (Entered: 10/31/2014)
2014-11-06133NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Shannon Fagan (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
2014-11-06135REPLY re 126 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re 114 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
2014-11-06136Second MOTION for Sanctions by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
2014-11-07134Memorandum in opposition to re 125 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Compel filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jason Krider)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
2014-11-17137MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Declaration 2nd Hardy Decl. with Exhibits, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Eric) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
2014-11-17138MOTION for Order to Show Cause by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-19MINUTE ORDER denying 138 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for a show cause order is denied. The Clerk's Office is directed to mail an additional copy of this Court's September 24, 2014, Order 111 and Memorandum Opinion 112 to Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/19/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
2014-11-20139RESPONSE re 136 MOTION for Sanctions filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Hutchison dec, # 2 Declaration Larsen dec, # 3 Exhibit Notice of payment of filing fee)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
2014-11-20140MOTION for Sanctions by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 11/20/2014)
2014-11-21141ORDER granting 105 Defendants' request to sever 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; transferring 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado; and severing and transferring 32 Plaintiff's Privacy Act claim to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. See Document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/21/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
2014-11-21142MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 105 Defendants' request to sever 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; transferring 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado; and severing and transferring 32 Plaintiff's Privacy Act claim to the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/21/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
2014-11-24143MOTION for Extension of Time to File remaining dispositive motions by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
2014-11-24MINUTE ORDER granting 143 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion for a 14-day extension of time to file dispositive motions is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Bureau of Prison's dispositive motion is due on or before December 15, 2014. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining defendants' dispositive motions are due on or before January 5, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/24/2014. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
2014-11-25Set Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2014. (tj ) (Entered: 11/25/2014)
2014-12-02144RESPONSE re 140 MOTION for Sanctions filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Thrower Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
2014-12-08145MOTION for Order to Show Cause by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
2014-12-08146REPLY to opposition to re 140 MOTION for Sanctions filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
2014-12-15147MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Memo and Certificate of Service, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Declaration Blanco Decl., # 5 Declaration Greene Decl., # 6 Declaration Christenson Decl., # 7 Declaration Mack Decl., # 8 Declaration Moorer Decl., # 9 Declaration Todd Decl., # 10 Declaration Velilla-Arce Decl., # 11 Declaration Mitchell Decl., # 12 Exhibit Mitchell Decl. Exhs. Part 1, # 13 Exhibit Mitchell Decl. Exhs. Part 2, # 14 Exhibit Mitchell Decl. Exhs. Part 3, # 15 Exhibit Mitchell Decl. Exhs. Part 4, # 16 Exhibit Mitchell Decl. Exhs. Part 5)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
2014-12-15148REPLY to opposition to re 140 MOTION for Sanctions filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
2014-12-16Partial Case transferred to the USDC for the U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado, pursuant to Court Order entered 11/21/2014. Sent to Court by extraction. (See order for full detail) (jf, ) (Entered: 12/16/2014)
2014-12-29149Memorandum in opposition to re 145 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Signed Receipt for ECF documents)(Young, Eric) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2015-01-05150WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 1/23/2015.....MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Executive Office for United States Attorneys by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Declaration Luczynski Declaration with Exhibits)(Taaffe, Damon) Modified on 1/26/2015 (znmw, ). (Entered: 01/05/2015)
2015-01-05151MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
2015-01-05152MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
2015-01-05153Memorandum in opposition to re 131 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
2015-01-09154Memorandum in opposition to re 152 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Young, Eric) (Entered: 01/09/2015)
2015-01-12155REPLY to opposition to motion re 131 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Young, Eric) (Entered: 01/12/2015)
2015-01-13156Memorandum in opposition to re 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
2015-01-20157RESPONSE re 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Executive Office for United States Attorneys filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 01/22/2015)
2015-01-23158MOTION to Withdraw 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Executive Office for United States Attorneys and to reset briefing schedule for EOUSA by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
2015-01-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 158 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw EOUSA's Motion for Summary Judgment, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion to withdraw is granted, and 150 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment with Respect to EOUSA is denied as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant EOUSA's renewed motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before February 23, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/23/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
2015-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 2/23/2015. (tj ) (Entered: 01/23/2015)
2015-01-27159REPLY to opposition to re 152 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-02-09160REPLY to opposition to re 151 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
2015-02-09161MOTION for Discovery by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
2015-02-10162ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/10/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
2015-02-10163MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 66 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/10/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/10/2015)
2015-02-13164Partial RESPONSE re 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
2015-02-18166MOTION for Return of Property by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
2015-02-18167MOTION Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
2015-02-19165Memorandum in opposition to re 161 MOTION for Discovery filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/19/2015)
2015-02-23168ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/23/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-02-23169MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 55 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/23/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-02-23170MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Declaration Luczynski, # 5 Exhibit Luczynski)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
2015-02-23171Memorandum in opposition to re 158 MOTION to Withdraw 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Executive Office for United States Attorneys and to reset briefing schedule for EOUSA filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
2015-02-23172MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
2015-02-24173Memorandum in opposition to re 172 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/24/2015)
2015-02-27174MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 151 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/27/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
2015-02-27175NOTICE of filing Jenkins Declaration by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE re 174 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jenkins)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/27/2015)
2015-03-02176SEALED DOCUMENT (Memorandum in opposition) re 166 MOTION for Return of Property filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) Modified event title on 3/31/2015 (znmw, ). (Entered: 03/02/2015)
2015-03-09177MOTION for Order to Show Cause by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-03-09178REPLY to opposition to re 161 MOTION for Discovery filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-03-09179MOTION for Vaughn Index, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part by JEREMY PINSON (td, ) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-03-09180RESPONSE re 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons filed by JEREMY PINSON. (td, ) (Entered: 03/10/2015)
2015-03-12181NOTICE Regarding BOP's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE re 180 Response to motion (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 03/12/2015)
2015-03-13182Memorandum in opposition to re 177 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
2015-03-16183NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse Dyer Stewart on behalf of All Defendants (Stewart, Jesse) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
2015-03-17184NOTICE of filing in camera by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Jenkins, # 2 Exhibit Program Statement 5800.17)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 03/17/2015)
2015-03-19185ORDER granting in part and denying in part 62 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/19/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
2015-03-19186MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 62 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/19/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
2015-03-19187MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Remaining Claim Against the Civil Division by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Kovakas Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) Modified event title on 3/20/2015 (znmw, ). (Entered: 03/19/2015)
2015-03-23188REPLY to opposition to re 166 MOTION for Return of Property filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-03-23189MOTION regarding incamera inspection by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-03-30190NOTICE DEFENDANTS' CONSENT TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO REMOVE DOCUMENTS FROM PUBLIC RECORD AND FILE UNDER SEAL by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE re 176 Memorandum in Opposition, 166 MOTION for Return of Property, 188 Reply to opposition to Motion (Stewart, Jesse) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-03-30191MOTION to Stay Briefing Schedule by JEREMY PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
2015-03-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 190 Defendants' Notice of Consent to Plaintiff's Request to Remove Documents from Public Record and File Under Seal, it is hereby ORDERED that 176 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion shall be filed under seal. The Clerk is instructed to remove 176 Defendants' opposition and attachments from the public record and place them under seal. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/31/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
2015-04-13193NOTICE of Change of Address by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf, ) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
2015-04-14192Memorandum in opposition to re 191 MOTION to Stay filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
2015-04-27194RESPONSE re 184 NOTICE of filing in camera filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
2015-04-27195REPLY to opposition to re 191 MOTION to Stay filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
2015-05-04197Second MOTION for Extension of All Deadlines by JEREMY V. PINSON (td, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
2015-05-05196Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of the Office of Inspector General of the Department of Justice by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support Renewed Motion, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Waller Supplemental Declaration, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Young, Eric) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
2015-05-15198MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying as moot 106 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Produce Documents. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/15/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-15199MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying as moot 126 Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/15/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-15200MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 132 Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/15/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-15201MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying as moot 166 Plaintiff's Motion for Return of Property. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/15/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-15202ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and Protective Order or Appointed Counsel; denying 125 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production or Appoint Counsel; denying 136 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 140 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 145 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause; and denying 152 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/15/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-15203MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 113 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and Protective Order or Appointed Counsel; denying 125 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production or Appoint Counsel; denying 136 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 140 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 145 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause; and denying 152 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/15/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-15204ORDER OF APPOINTMENT OF PRO BONO COUNSEL. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/15/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2015)
2015-05-18205RESPONSE re 196 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Behalf of the Office of Inspector General of the Department of Justice filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf, ) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
2015-05-20206FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/20/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
2015-05-20207Memorandum in opposition to re 197 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to dispositive motions filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Wilcox, # 2 Exhibit Attachments to Wilcox declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
2015-05-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/19/2015. (tj ) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
2015-05-28208REPLY to opposition to motion re 187 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
2015-06-05209MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying without prejudice 161 Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery Case Management Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/05/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
2015-06-08210MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 189 Plaintiff's Motion Regarding In Camera Inspection. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/08/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
2015-06-15211MOTION for supplemental briefing by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
2015-06-22212MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsey as to 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part , MOTION for Discovery by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-06-25213NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore C. Whitehouse on behalf of JEREMY V. PINSON (Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
2015-06-26214RESPONSE re 211 MOTION for supplemental briefing, 212 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part MOTION for Discovery filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
2015-06-30215Consent MOTION for Hearing by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2015-06-30216MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 172 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/30/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2015-06-30217MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 179 Plaintiff's Motion for Vaughn Index and Enlargement of Time. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/30/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
2015-07-01MINUTE ORDER granting 215 Defendants' Consent Motion for Status Conference: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 8, 2015, at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 14. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall make arrangements for Mr. Pinson to attend the status conference telephonically. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/01/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-01218MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying as moot 191 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule and denying 197 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend All Deadlines. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/01/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-02Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/8/2015 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (gdf) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-08Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 7/8/2015. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Annette Montalvo.) (tj) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-08219ORDER pursuant to status conference. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/08/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
2015-07-15220TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on 7-8-2015; Page Numbers: 1-19. Date of Issuance:7-15-2015. Court Reporter/Transcriber Annette M. Montalvo, Telephone number 202-354-3111, Court Reporter Email Address : annette.montalvo@gmail.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 8/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2015.(Montalvo, Annette) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-15221NOTICE Regarding Mr. Pinson's Enhanced Access to Electronic Law Library by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-17222MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying as moot 177 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/17/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-23223RESPONSE re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
2015-07-23224RESPONSE re 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
2015-07-28225MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 167 Plaintiff's Motion for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/28/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-07-28226MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part , 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/28/2015)
2015-08-14MINUTE ORDER granting 226 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies: Upon consideration of Defendants' motion for an extension of time, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted and that BOP's and EOUSA's replies in support of their dispositive motions shall be due on August 20, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/14/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-08-17227ORDER granting 187 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/17/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-08-17228MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 187 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/17/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-08-20229REPLY to opposition to motion re 147 MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-20230REPLY to opposition to motion re 170 MOTION for Summary Judgment in Part filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-21231Consent MOTION for Order Extending Time for Plaintiffs Response to Motion of Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation for Partial Summary Judgment by JEREMY V. PINSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-08-24232Consent MOTION for Order Extending Time for Plaintiffs Response to Motion of Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation for Partial Summary Judgment by JEREMY V. PINSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
2015-08-24MINUTE ORDER granting 232 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's consent motion for an extension of time to file, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED and that Plaintiff's response to the FBI's motion shall be due on or before September 22, 2015. Given the restrictions on Plaintiff's access to writing instruments, the Court is willing to grant additional extensions as needed regardless of the status of the Special Assistant U.S. Attorney. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/24/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
2015-08-24233MOTION to Stay by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
2015-08-25234RESPONSE re 233 MOTION to Stay filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/25/2015)
2015-08-27235ORDER directing Defendants to provide additional information on or before September 10, 2015. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/27/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
2015-09-01236MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's remaining Claims against the U.S. Marshals Service by U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mr. William Bordley, with exhibits, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stewart, Jesse) (Entered: 09/01/2015)
2015-09-04237MOTION for Extension of Time to File Justification for OIP's Withholdings on BOP's Behalf [Re: ECF 235] by NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-04MINUTE ORDER granting 237 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Defendants' motion for an extension of time to respond to 235 the Court's August 27, 2015 Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted and that Defendants' response to the Court's Order shall be due on or before October 2, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/04/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-17238Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion of Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation for Partial Summary Judgment by JEREMY V. PINSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-17MINUTE ORDER granting 238 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's consent motion for an extension of time to file, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to 137 Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation's motion for summary judgment on or before October 29, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/17/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-10-01239MEMORANDUM re 131 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, BLAKE DAVIS, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Rodgers)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
2015-10-02240FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/02/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-10-05MINUTE ORDER denying 233 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay: As Plaintiff is no longer held in the conditions detailed in his motion to stay, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is DENIED as moot. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/5/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-10-14241RESPONSE re 137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
2015-10-21242Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to BOPs Justifications for Withholdings Noted in OIPs Dispositive Motion by JEREMY V. PINSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2015-10-21MINUTE ORDER granting 242 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's consent motion for an extension of time to file, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to 239 Defendant Federal Bureau of Prison's Justifications for Withholdings Noted in OIP's Dispositive Motion on or before December 2, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/21/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2015-10-28243MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
2015-10-28MINUTE ORDER granting 243 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its reply to 241 Plaintiff's response on or before November 18, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/28/2015.(lcrc2) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
2015-11-06244FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/06/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/7/2015. (gdf) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-11-10245ORDER granting in part and denying in part 170 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/10/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-10246MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 170 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/10/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-10247NOTICE by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE re 239 Memorandum,,, (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-18248REPLY to opposition to motion re 137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment with respect to FBI filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
2015-11-23249Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
2015-12-02250MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to BOP's Justifications for Withholdings Noted in OIP's Dispositive Motion by JEREMY V. PINSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-02MINUTE ORDER granting 250 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its response to 239 Defendant Federal Bureau of Prison's Justifications for Withholdings Noted in OIP's Dispositive Motion on or before January 4, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/02/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-04251MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 249 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
2015-12-04MINUTE ORDER granting 251 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their opposition to 249 Plaintiff's motion on or before December 14, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/04/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
2015-12-11252MOTION for Extension of Time to File EOUSA's Second Motion for Summary Judgment by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
2015-12-11MINUTE ORDER granting 252 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the numbered FOIA requests for which judgment was denied in this Court's November 10, 2015 Order on or before December 16, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/11/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
2015-12-11253Memorandum in opposition to re 249 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Earwin, # 2 Declaration Samuels, # 3 Declaration Cozza-Rhodes, # 4 Declaration Wilcox)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
2015-12-16254Second MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to Executive Office for United States Attorneys (EOUSA) by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Luczynski, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits to Luczynski Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
2015-12-28255MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting as conceded 236 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/28/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
2015-12-28256FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/28/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
2015-12-30257MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to 249 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Order to Supplement by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
2015-12-31MINUTE ORDER granting in part 257 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his reply to 253 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on or before January 20, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/31/2015.(lcrc2) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
2016-01-04258ORDER granting in part and denying in part 147 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/04/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-01-04259MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 147 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/04/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-01-04260REPLY to opposition to re 249 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
2016-01-04261RESPONSE re 239 MEMORANDUM re 131 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 01/06/2016)
2016-01-14262REPLY to opposition to motion re 252 MOTION for Extension of Time to File EOUSA's Second Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply Regarding BOP's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Records Withheld by OIP 239 filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
2016-01-15263Memorandum in opposition to re 254 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to Executive Office for United States Attorneys (EOUSA) filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-28264REPLY to opposition to motion re 254 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to Executive Office for United States Attorneys (EOUSA) filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-02-03265Second MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons by NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Baime, # 4 Declaration Christenson)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
2016-02-05266FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/05/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-12269MOTION for Order to Show Cause by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
2016-02-16267ORDER granting in part and denying in part 131 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/16/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-02-16268MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 131 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/16/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-03-04MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that on or before March 11, 2016, Defendants shall file a response to 269 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/04/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
2016-03-07270MOTION for Extension of Time on all deadlines by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
2016-03-11271Memorandum in opposition to re 269 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Torres, # 2 Declaration Nelson)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
2016-03-16273NOTICE of Change of Address by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-18272ORDER granting 270 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/18/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/18/2016 (tj) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-24274MOTION for Order Concerning Access to the Courts by JEREMY V. PINSON (td) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
2016-03-28279NOTICE of More Definite Statement by JEREMY V. PINSON (td) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-03-29275ORDER granting in part and denying in part 137 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/29/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-03-29276MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 137 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/29/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-03-29277ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Memorandum in opposition to re 274 MOTION for Order filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) Modified on 3/29/2016 (td). (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-03-29278Memorandum in opposition to re 274 MOTION for Order filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-03-29NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 277 Memorandum in Opposition,, was entered in error per counsel and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (td) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-04-06280MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs Replies to Defendants Oppositions to Motion for Order to Show Cause (ECF 271) and Motion for Order Concerning Access to the Courts (ECF 278) by JEREMY V. PINSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-06281ORDER granting 280 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/06/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 5/18/2016. (tj) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-08282ORDER denying 249 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 257 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Supplement. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/08/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-08283MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 249 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 257 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Supplement. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/08/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-28284MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to FBI by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-04-28MINUTE ORDER granting 284 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the FOIA requests for which judgment was denied in 275 this Court's March 29, 2016 Order on or before June 23, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/28/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-05-02285MOTION for Extension of Time to File BOP's Supplemental Second Motion for Summary Judgment by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-02MINUTE ORDER granting 285 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their supplemental renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons on or before June 10, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/02/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-02MINUTE ORDER concerning 279 Plaintiff's More Definite Statement: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(4)(B), when a court grants a motion for a more definite statement, "the responsive pleading must be served within 14 days after the more definite statement is served." See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(a)(4)(B). Plaintiff's more definite statement was docketed on March 28, 2016. See ECF No. 279. To date, Defendants have not answered or otherwise responded to that statement. Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's more definite statement on or before June 1, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/02/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-06-01286MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying 274 Plaintiff's Motion for Order Concerning Access to the Courts. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/01/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-01287MOTION to Dismiss filed by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE. (Taaffe, Damon) Modified event title on 6/2/2016 (znmw). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 6/2/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-01288NOTICE of Filing Supporting Document by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE re 287 Response to Document,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2d Samuels Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-01289FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/01/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-01290ORDER granting in part and denying in part 254 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/01/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-01291MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 254 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/01/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-07292MEMORANDUM & ORDER denying as moot 269 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/07/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-10293Third MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Christenson, # 4 Declaration Smith)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-15294FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/15/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-06-15295Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File FBI's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-06-15MINUTE ORDER granting 295 Defendants' Second Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the Federal Bureau of Investigation on or before July 25, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/15/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-06-15296MOTION for Reconsideration re 286 Order on Motion for Order by JEREMY V. PINSON (td) (Main Document 296 replaced on 6/17/2016) (td). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
2016-06-23297MOTION for Extension of Time to File EOUSA's renewed motion for summary judgment by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-24MINUTE ORDER granting 297 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the Executive Office for United States Attorneys on or before August 1, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/24/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-07-01298MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Bivens Claims (ECF No. 287) by JEREMY V. PINSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-01MINUTE ORDER granting 298 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his opposition to 287 Defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, renewed motion for summary judgment regarding Plaintiff's Bivens claims on or before July 15, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/01/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-19299MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Bivens Claims (ECF No. 287) by JEREMY V. PINSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting 299 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his opposition to 287 Defendants' motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, renewed motion for summary judgment regarding Plaintiff's Bivens claims on or before August 29, 2016. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, in light of Plaintiff's transfer to a new facility, 296 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/19/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-25300Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by BLAKE DAVIS, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Third Hardy, # 4 Exhibit 7/25/16 Schott Letter)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-26301ENTERED IN ERROR.....ERRATA Third Hardy Declaration (Due to Technical Error) by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE 300 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, BLAKE DAVIS, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR.. (Taaffe, Damon) Modified on 7/27/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-07-27NOTICE OF ERROR re 301 Errata; emailed to damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov, cc'd 13 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Document incomplete/illegible, 2. Please refile document, 3. Entered in error; Document is opening (Entered: 07/27/2016)
2016-07-27302ERRATA Third Hardy Declaration with Exhibits by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE 300 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, BLAKE DAVIS, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR.. (Taaffe, Damon) (Main Document 302 replaced on 8/1/2016) (jf). (Main Document 302 replaced on 8/1/2016) (jf). (Entered: 07/27/2016)
2016-07-27303NOTICE of Filing and Pinson's Change of Address by JOHN DIGNAM, NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
2016-07-27304FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/27/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
2016-07-29305ORDER granting in part and denying in part 239 Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/29/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-07-29306MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 239 Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/29/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-07-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Partial Summary Judgment motion due by 8/29/2016. (hs) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-01307Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding EOUSA by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-02MINUTE ORDER granting 307 Defendants' Second Motion for an Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the Executive Office for United States Attorneys on or before August 31, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/02/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Summary Judgment motions due by 8/31/2016. (hs) (Entered: 08/02/2016)
2016-08-10308ORDER granting in part 265 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/10/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-10309MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part 265 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/10/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-11310RESPONSE re 307 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding EOUSA filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-11311RESPONSE re 287 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-22312MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief Concerning FOIA Request No. 2013-2100 by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-22MINUTE ORDER granting 312 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their supplemental briefing regarding FOIA Request No. 2013-2100 on or before September 12, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/22/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-22313Memorandum in opposition to re 300 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-22314RESPONSE re 293 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Main Document 314 replaced on 9/2/2016) (jf). (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-25315REPLY to opposition to motion re 287 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-26316MOTION to Vacate 308 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-26317Supplemental MOTION for Discovery by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-29318Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding FOIA Request No. AG/10-R1351 (SAMs memoranda) by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Fourth Christenson, # 2 Exhibit A-C)(Taaffe, Damon) Modified event title on 8/30/2016 (znmw). Modified on 3/22/2017 to correct text/event (jf). (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-30319FOX/NEAL ORDER advising plaintiff to respond or Court may deem matter as conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/30/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-31320Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File EOUSA's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-08-31MINUTE ORDER granting 320 Defendants' Third Motion for an Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the Executive Office for United States Attorneys on or before September 28, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/31/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 9/28/2016. (tj) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-02321REPLY to opposition to motion re 293 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-02322REPLY to opposition to motion re 300 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding FBI filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Third Hardy)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-02323ERRATA Third Hardy Declaration by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 300 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NATIONAL SECURITY DIVISION, BLAKE DAVIS, OFFICE OF THE DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OFFICE OF THE ASSOCIATE ATTORNEY GENERAL, U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY, OFFICE OF LEGAL COUNSEL, JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR.. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-12324Memorandum in opposition to re 316 MOTION to Vacate 308 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-12325Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding FOIA Request 2013-2100 by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Fifth Christenson, # 2 Exhibit Christenson Exhibits)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-12326Memorandum in opposition to re 317 MOTION for Discovery filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
2016-09-13327FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond to 325 Defendants' Supplemental Summary Judgment Motion or the Court may deem the matter as conceded. See document for details. Responses due by 10/13/2016. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/13/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-09-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/13/2016 (tj) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-09-16328RESPONSE re 318 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding FOIA Request No. AG/10-R1351 (SAMs memoranda) filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-26329STIPULATION re 325 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding FOIA Request 2013-2100 by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-28330REPLY to opposition to motion re 318 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding FOIA Request No. AG/10-R1351 (SAMs memoranda) filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-28MINUTE ORDER granting 325 Defendants' Supplemental Summary Judgment Motion: Upon consideration of 329 Plaintiff's Stipulation, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding FOIA Request 2013-2100 be GRANTED as unopposed. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/28/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-28331Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time to File EOUSA's renewed motion for summary judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-28MINUTE ORDER granting 331 Defendants' Fourth Motion for an Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the Executive Office for United States Attorneys on or before October 28, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/28/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/28/2016. (tj) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-10-28332Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Luczynski, # 4 Exhibit Apodoca docket sheet)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-28333NOTICE of Plaintiff's Change of Address by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2016-10-31334FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond to 332 Defendants' Supplemental Summary Judgment Motion or the Court may deem the matter as conceded. See document for details. Responses due by 12/1/2016. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/31/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 12/1/2016 (tj) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-10-31335MOTION to Modify Appointment of Counsel by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 11/02/2016)
2016-11-14336MOTION to Strike 332 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-17337Memorandum in opposition to re 336 MOTION to Strike 332 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-21338SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Opposition to motion, # 2 Declaration Kirsch Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-12-05340RESPONSE re 332 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-06339REPLY to opposition to re 335 MOTION to Modify Appointment of Counsel filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-12341MOTION for Protective Order and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-15342Memorandum in opposition to re 341 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-19343NOTICE of Repeat Service of EOUSA Releases by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 340 Response to motion (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-19344SURREPLY to re 332 Supplemental MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-27345MOTION to access to the courts by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2016-12-27346MOTION to enjoin block to courts by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2016-12-27347MOTION for legal actions by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2016-12-30348MOTION for Sanctions on DOJ Counsel by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
2017-01-06349MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Replies to Defendants' Oppositions to "Motion to Strike Doc. 332" (ECF No. 336); "Motion for Protective Order and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order" (ECF No. 341); "Motion for Order on Access to the Courts" (ECF No. 345); "Motion for Order Enjoining Block to Courts" (ECF No. 346); "Motion for Order on Legal Actions" (ECF No. 347); and "Motion for Sanctions on DOJ Counsel" (ECF No. 348) by JEREMY V. PINSON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06MINUTE ORDER granting 349 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall reply to 337 Defendants' opposition to 336 Plaintiff's "Motion to Strike" and 342 Defendants' opposition to 341 Plaintiff's "Motion for Protective Order and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order" on or before January 28, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall reply to Defendants' oppositions to 345 346 347 348 Plaintiff's other motions within 30 days of the filing of Defendants' oppositions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/6/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 1/28/2017. (zgdf) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06350NOTICE of Hand Delivery of EOUSA releases by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 343 Notice (Other) (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 293 Defendants' Third Motion for Summary Judgment with Respect to the Bureau of Prisons, it is hereby ORDERED that the Bureau of Prisons shall file a status report on or before January 26, 2017, discussing the status of its efforts to repair the search functionality of its email system. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/11/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
2017-01-12351MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 346 MOTION to enjoin block to courts, 348 MOTION for Sanctions, 347 MOTION for legal actions, 345 MOTION to access to the courts by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-13MINUTE ORDER granting 351 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the Bureau of Prisons shall file its responses to Plaintiff's filings docketed as 345 , 346 , 347 , and 348 on or before January 26, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/13/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-25352Memorandum in opposition to re 346 MOTION to enjoin block to courts, 348 MOTION for Sanctions, 347 MOTION for legal actions, 345 MOTION to access to the courts filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-25353STATUS REPORT Regarding Bureau of Prisons's Email Search Capabilities and Request Processing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-02-13354MOTION for additional briefing on request(s) by JEREMY V. PINSON (jf) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-13355RESPONSE re 345 MOTION to access to the courts filed by JEREMY V. PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
2017-02-17356ORDER granting in part and denying in part 293 Defendants' third motion for summary judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/17/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-17357MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 293 Defendants' third motion for summary judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/17/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-27358Memorandum in opposition to re 354 MOTION for additional briefing on request(s) filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-03-22359ORDER granting 318 Defendants' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/22/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-22360MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 318 Defendants' Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/22/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-27361ORDER denying 316 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/27/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-27362MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 316 Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/27/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-29363ORDER granting in part and denying in part 300 Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/29/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-29364MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 300 Defendants' Second Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/29/2017. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-03-30365ORDER denying 287 Defendants' motion to dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 287 Defendants' motion for summary judgment; denying 310 , construed as a motion to amend the complaint; denying as premature 317 Plaintiff's supplemental motion for discovery; and appointing pro bono counsel. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/30/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-30366MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 287 Defendants' motion to dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 287 Defendants' motion for summary judgment; denying 310 , construed as a motion to amend the complaint; denying as premature 317 Plaintiff's supplemental motion for discovery; and appointing pro bono counsel. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/30/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
2017-03-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 5/1/2017. (tj) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-04367MOTION regarding witness intimidation by JEREMY PINSON. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/03/2017 (jf) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-06368MOTION for Extension of Time to File FBI's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
2017-04-10369NOTICE on Law Library Access by JEREMY PINSON (jf) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-10370MOTION to Compel by JEREMY PINSON (jf) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-10371NOTICE to the Court by JEREMY PINSON (jf) (Entered: 04/11/2017)
2017-04-17372Memorandum in opposition to re 367 MOTION filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Manci Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/17/2017)
2017-04-17373MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint by JEREMY PINSON (jf) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
2017-04-24374MOTION for order to produce on cd by JEREMY PINSON (jf) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-25375MOTION for Extension of Time to File BOP's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-25376Memorandum in opposition to re 374 MOTION for order to produce on cd, 370 MOTION to Compel filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-25377Memorandum in opposition to re 373 MOTION for Leave to File filed by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-05-01378NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore C. Whitehouse on behalf of JEREMY PINSON (Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01379NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Gomez on behalf of JEREMY PINSON (Gomez, Robert) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-01380MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Whitehouse, Theodore) (Entered: 05/01/2017)
2017-05-05381ANSWER to 32 Amended Complaint and More Definite Statement 279 by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 32 Amended Complaint filed by JEREMY PINSON.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-08MINUTE ORDER granting 368 Motion for an Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the Federal Bureau of Investigation FOIA requests on or before June 15, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/8/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-23382NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 366 Memorandum & Opinion, 365 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,, Order on Motion for Discovery, by JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 05/23/2017)
2017-05-24383Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re 382 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (znmw) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-05-25MINUTE ORDER granting 375 Motion for an Extension of Time: In light of the lack of opposition, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons FOIA requests on or before June 23, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/25/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Renewed Summary Judgment motion due by 6/23/2017. (hs) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-05-26USCA Case Number 17-5120 for 382 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES E. SAMUELS, JR. (zrdj) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
2017-06-15384NOTICE of Plaintiff's Change of Mailing Address by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-15385Third MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration Fourth Hardy Declaration)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
2017-06-16386ERRATA Replacement Documents To Correct PDF Errors by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 385 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Fourth Hardy Declaration with Exhibits)(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
2017-06-22387Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File BOP's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment on Outstanding FOIA Claims by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
2017-06-22MINUTE ORDER granting 387 Second Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their renewed motion for summary judgment with respect to the Bureau of Prisons FOIA requests on or before August 22, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/22/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff