Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY v. SALLY JEWEL et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2014cv02201
Date Filed2014-12-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffFOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY
Case DescriptionThe Forest County Potawatomi Community submitted a total of 10 FOIA requests to the Bureau of Indian Affairs for records concerning the Menominee Tribe's application to the United States to acquire land in trust in Kenosha, Wisconsin for gaming purposes. The agency provided some responsive records but withheld a large number of records under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). The Community alleged that the agency's disclosure of records to the State of Wisconsin waived any privilege for confidential business information. The Community ultimately filed suit.
Complaint issues: Exemption 4 - Confidential business information

DefendantSALLY JEWEL Secretary of the Interior, in her official capacity
DefendantKEVIN WASHBURN Assistant Secretary Indian Affairs, in his official capacity
DefendantPAULA HART Director, Office of Indian Gaming, in her official capacity
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS
DefendantDIANE ROSEN Regional Director for the Midwest Region Bureau of Indian Affairs, in her official capacity
DefendantOFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING
DefendantCENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [62]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2014-12-291COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3947455) filed by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY.(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2014-12-292CIVIL COVER SHEET by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY re 1 Complaint filed by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY.(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2014-12-29Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (sth, ) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2014-12-29SUMMONS Not Issued as to KEVIN WASHBURN, PAULA HART, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (sth, ) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2014-12-293STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 29, 2014. (lcbah3) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/29/2014) (zjth, ). (Entered: 12/29/2014)
2014-12-304REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY re 1 Complaint filed by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY. (Attachments: # 1 Summons to K. Washburb, # 2 Summons to P. Hart, # 3 Summons to Rosen, # 4 Summons Dept. of Interior, # 5 Summons Midwest Regional BIA, # 6 Summons to Office of Indian Gaming, # 7 Summons to Bureau of Indian Affairs, # 8 Summons to US Attorney's Office, # 9 Summons to Attorney General)(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
2014-12-315SUMMONS (10) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(rdj) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
2015-01-036REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE K. Washburn by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY re 1 Complaint filed by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY.(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 01/03/2015)
2015-01-057SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to KEVIN WASHBURN. (jf, ) (Entered: 01/05/2015)
2015-01-148RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/5/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/4/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
2015-01-159RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on 01/172015 (Whittlesey, Dennis) Modified on 1/16/2015 (jf, ). (Entered: 01/15/2015)
2015-01-2810MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Donna M. Connelly, :Firm- The Rothstein Law Firm, :Address- P.O. Box 8180, Santa Fe, NM 87501. Phone No. - 505-988-8004. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3976471. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-01-2811MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Eric Dalstrom, :Firm- The Rothstein Law Firm, :Address- 80 E. Rio Salado Parkway, Ste. 710,Tempe, AZ 85281. Phone No. - 480-921-9296. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3976502. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-01-2812MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Richard W. Hughes, :Firm- The Rothstein Law Firm, :Address- 1215 Paseo De Peralta, P.O. Box 8180,Santa Fe, New Mexico 87504. Phone No. - 505.988.8004. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3976518. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-01-2813MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kristina Martinez, :Firm- The Rothstein Law Firm, :Address- 1215 Paseo De Peralta, P.O. Box 8180,Santa Fe, New Mexico 87504. Phone No. - 505-988-8004. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3976529. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-01-2814MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for April E. Olson, :Firm- The Rothstein Law Firm, :Address- 80 E. Rio Salado Parkway,Suite 710,Tempe, AZ 85281. Phone No. - 480-921-9296. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-3976532. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-01-28MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 10 , 11 , 12 , 13 , and 14 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice . Ms. Donna M. Connolly, Esq., Mr. Eric Dahlstrom, Esq., Mr. Richard W. Hughes, Esq., Ms. Kristina E. Martinez, Esq., and Ms. April E. Olson, Esq., may enter their appearances for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 28, 2015. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
2015-02-0215NOTICE of Appearance by Heather D. Graham-Oliver on behalf of CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-0216Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The defendants shall, by March 6, 2015, respond to the plaintiffs' 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 2, 2015. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 3/6/2015. (tg, ) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
2015-02-0317NOTICE of Appearance by Richard W. Hughes on behalf of FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
2015-02-0618NOTICE of Appearance by Donna M. Connolly on behalf of FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Connolly, Donna) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
2015-02-0619NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Martinez on behalf of FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Martinez, Kristina) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
2015-02-0920NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Nicholas Dahlstrom on behalf of FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Dahlstrom, Eric) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
2015-02-0921NOTICE of Appearance by April E. Olson on behalf of FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Olson, April) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
2015-03-0622Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
2015-03-06MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 22 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The defendants shall, by March 20, 2015, respond to the plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 6, 2015. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
2015-03-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 3/20/2015. (tg, ) (Entered: 03/09/2015)
2015-03-1923Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
2015-03-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 23 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. The defendants shall, by March 24, 2015, respond to the plaintiff's 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 19, 2015. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/19/2015)
2015-03-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the complaint due by 3/24/2015. (ztg, ) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
2015-03-2424ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS.(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 03/24/2015)
2015-03-2625Amended ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS.(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
2015-04-0726STATUS REPORT (JOINT) AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
2015-04-07MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of proceedings in this matter, pursuant to the parties' 26 Joint Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule: the defendants shall, by April 30, 2015, file any Motion on the Pleadings; the plaintiff shall, by June 1, 2015, file any opposition; the defendants shall, by June 12, 2015, file any reply. The defendants shall complete production of all responsive materials other than those they contend are exempt by May 28, 2015, and produce any Vaughn index by June 11, 2015. The parties shall, within fourteen days of the Court's ruling on the defendants' motion on the pleadings, or by June 25, 2015, whichever date is later, submit jointly a proposed schedule for the filing and briefing of dispositive motions, if necessary. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 7, 2015. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
2015-04-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion on the pleadings due by 4/30/2015; Opposition due by 6/1/2015; Reply due by 6/12/2015; Production of responsive materials except those exempt due by 5/28/2015; Vaughn Index due by 6/11/2015; Joint Proposed Schedule for the Filing and Briefing of Dispositive Motions due fourteen days of the Court's ruling on the defendants' motion on the pleadings or 6/25/2015, whichever date is later. (tg, ) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
2015-06-1727Consent MOTION for Order Amending Original Scheduling Order by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
2015-06-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 27 Consent Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The defendants shall, by June 19, 2015, produce any and all remaining non-exempt material from the Central Office and the Office of Indian Gaming ("OIG"); the defendants shall, by June 26, 2015, provide Vaughn indices from the Central Office and the OIG to the FOIA requester; the Midwest Regional Office shall, by July 10, 2015, complete review of documents and produce a Vaughn index to the FOIA requester; the parties shall, by July 17, 2015, propose jointly a schedule for the filing and briefing of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 18, 2015. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
2015-06-1828NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Martinez, Kristina) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
2015-06-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' production of non-exempt material from the Central Office and the Office of Indian Gaming due by 6/19/2015; Defendants' production of Vaughn indices from the Central Office and the OIG to the FOIA requester due by 6/26/2015; Midwest Regional Office's complete review of documents and production of Vaughn index to the FOIA requester due by 7/10/2015; Joint proposed schedule for the filing of briefing and dispositive motions due by 7/17/2015. (tg) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
2015-07-1729MOTION for Order Requiring Defendants to File Status Report by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-1730STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-20MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the plaintiff to file any response to the defendants' 30 Status Report and Proposed Scheduling Order by July 21, 2015 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 20, 2015. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
2015-07-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to 30 Status Report and Proposed Scheduling Order due by 5:00 PM on 7/21/2015. (tg) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
2015-07-2131RESPONSE re Order to Defendants Status Report filed by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY. (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-07-21MINUTE ORDER (paperless) AMENDING, in light of the defendants' 30 Status Report and Proposed Scheduling Order and the plaintiff's 31 Response, this Court's scheduling order of June 18, 2015 as follows: the defendants shall, by July 22, 2015, produce to the plaintiff a Vaughn index based on the "Central Office files;" the defendants shall, by July 29, 2015, produce all remaining non-exempt material and produce a Vaughn Index for those documents withheld; the parties shall, by August 6, 2015, file a joint proposed schedule for the filing and briefing of dispositive motions. In light of the foregoing, the plaintiff's 29 Motion for Order Requiring Defendants to File Status Report is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 21, 2015. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-07-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 7/22/2015, Production of remaining non-exempt material and production of a Vaughn Index for those documents withheld due by 7/29/2015; Joint proposed schedule due by 8/6/2015. (tg) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-08-0632STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
2015-08-07MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING the following SCHEDULING ORDER, in light of the parties' 32 Joint Proposed Schedule for the Filing of Briefing and Dispositive Motions: the plaintiff shall, by October 5, 2015, submit to the defendants any responses and/or objections to the defendants' Vaughn Indices; the parties shall attempt to resolve any disputes related to the Vaughn Indices by December 3, 2015; the defendants shall, by January 31, 2016, file any dispositive motion; the plaintiff shall, by February 29, 2016, file any opposition and/or cross-motion; the defendants shall, by March 21, 2016, file any replies and/or oppositions to cross-motion; the plaintiff shall, by April 11, 2016, file any reply. If necessary, the plaintiff shall, within 90 days from the date of any Court Order approving discovery regarding the plaintiff's "policy and practice claim," found in Count II of the 1 Complaint, serve its initial discovery requests; the plaintiff shall serve follow-up discovery requests and take any depositions deemed necessary expeditiously and pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; if necessary, the plaintiff shall file any dispositive motion regarding the policy and practice claim by September 1, 2016. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 7, 2015. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-08-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/5/2015; Resolution of any disputes related to the Vaughn Indices due by 12/3/2015; Dispositive Motion due by 1/31/2016; Cross-Motion/Opposition to Dispositive Motion due by 2/29/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion/Reply to Opposition to Dispositive Motion due by 3/21/2016; Dispositive Motion regarding the policy and practice claim, if necessary, due by 9/1/2016. (tg) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-10-0533NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Response and Objection to the Vaughn Index by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY re Scheduling Order,,,,, (Hughes, Richard) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-11-0434NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's First Amended Response and Objection to the Vaughn Index by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY re 33 Notice (Other) (Connolly, Donna) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
2016-02-0135Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
2016-02-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING nunc pro tunc the defendants' 35 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Accordingly the SCHEDULING ORDER is modified as follows: the defendants shall, by March 16, 2016, file any dispositive motion; the plaintiff shall, by April 18, 2016, file any opposition and/or cross-motion; the defendants shall, by May 6, 2016, file any reply and/or oppositions to cross-motion; and the plaintiff shall, by May 19, 2016, file any reply. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 2, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
2016-02-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motion due by 3/16/2016; Cross Motion and Opposition to Dispositive Motion due by 4/18/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Dispositive Motion due by 5/6/2016; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 5/19/2016. (tg) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
2016-03-1636Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
2016-03-17MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING nunc pro tunc the defendants' 36 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, any dispositive motions shall be filed by April 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 17, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2016. (tg) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-04-1337Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment with request to Amend Existing Scheduling Order by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-13MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 37 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly the SCHEDULING ORDER is MODIFIED as follows: the defendants shall, by May 16, 2016, file any motion for summary judgment; the plaintiff shall, by June 27, 2016, file any opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment; the defendants shall, by July 26, 2016, file any reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion; the plaintiff shall, by August 8, 2016, file any reply in support of its cross-motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 13, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-14Set/Reset Deadlines: The defendants shall, by 5/16/2016, file any motion for summary judgment; the plaintiff shall, by 6/27/2016, file any opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment; the defendants shall, by 7/26/2016, file any reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion; the plaintiff shall, by 8/08/2016, file any reply in support of its cross-motion. (ad) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-05-1638MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Reed C. Bienvenu, :Firm- The Rothstein Law Firm, :Address- P.O. Box 8180, Santa Fe, NM 87501. Phone No. - 505-988-8004. Fax No. - 505.982.0307 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4528837. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Whittlesey, Dennis) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice . Mr. Reed Bienvenue, Esq. may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 16, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-1639NOTICE of Appearance by Reed C. Bienvenu on behalf of FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Hughes, Richard) Modified on 5/17/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-1740MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-05-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' unopposed 40 Motion for Leave to Amend Scheduling Order. Accordingly, the defendants shall, by June 1, 2016, file any motion for summary judgment; the plaintiff shall, by July 13, 2016, file any opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment; the defendants shall, by July 26, 2016, file any replies in support of their own motion for summary judgment and any opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion; the plaintiff shall, by August 8, 2016, file any reply in support of its own cross-motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 19, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-05-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/1/2016; Cross-Motion/Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/13/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion/Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/26/2016; Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/8/2016. (tg) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-06-0141Unopposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' unopposed 41 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Accordingly, the Scheduling Order is amended as follows: the defendants shall, by June 3, 2016, file their motion for summary judgment; the plaintiff shall, by July 15, 2016, file any opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment; the defendants shall, by July 28, 2016, file any replies in support of their motion and any opposition to any cross-motion; and the plaintiff shall, by August 10, 2016, file any reply in support of its own cross-motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 1, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
2016-06-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/3/2016; Cross-Motion/Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/15/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion/Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/28/2016; Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/10/2016. (tg) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-0342Unopposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-03MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' unopposed 42 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Accordingly, the Scheduling Order is amended as follows: the defendants shall, by June 9, 2016, file their motion for summary judgment; the plaintiff shall, by July 22, 2016, file any opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment; the defendants shall, by August 4, 2016, file any replies in support of their motion and any opposition to any cross-motion; and the plaintiff shall, by August 17, 2016, file any reply in support of its own cross-motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 3, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/9/2016; Cross-Motion/Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/22/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion/Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/4/2016; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 8/17/2016. (tg) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-0943Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Modify,, Scheduling Order by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-09MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 43 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Accordingly, the SCHEDULING ORDER is amended as follows: defendants shall, by June 10, 2016, file their motion for summary judgment; the plaintiff shall, by July 25, 2016, file any opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment; the defendants shall, by August 5, 2016, file any reply in support of their own motion for summary judgment and any opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion; and the plaintiff shall, by August 18, 2016, file any reply in support of its own cross-motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 9, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-06-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/10/2016; Cross-Motion/Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/25/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion/Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/5/2016; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 8/18/2016. (tg) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-1044MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts SUMF, # 2 Affidavit Corbine Declaration, # 3 Affidavit Paula Hart Declaration, # 4 Affidavit Danks Declaration, # 5 Appendix Defendants' Appendix)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-1345NOTICE OF FILING OF SCOTT DOIG'S DECLARATION AND VAUGHN INDEX by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Scott Doig Declaration, # 2 Exhibit Vaughn Index)(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-07-2046Unopposed MOTION for Order Amending Scheduling Order by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Dahlstrom, Eric) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-20MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 46 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Accordingly, the SCHEDULING ORDER is amended as follows: the plaintiff shall, by August 15, 2016, file any opposition to the defendants' motion for summary judgment as well as any cross-motion for summary judgment; the defendants shall, by September 21, 2016, file any reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiffs cross-motion; and the plaintiff shall, by October 12, 2016, file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 20, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
2016-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Opposition to defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/15/2016; defendants' opposition to plaintiff's Cross-Motion and Reply to plaintiff's opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/21/2016; plaintiff's Reply to defendants' opposition to Cross Motion due by 10/12/2016. (tg) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
2016-08-1247Unopposed MOTION for Order Amending Scheduling Order by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Dahlstrom, Eric) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-12MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 47 Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. Accordingly, the SCHEDULING ORDER is amended as follows: the plaintiff shall, by August 17, 2016, file any opposition to the defendants' motion for summary judgment as well as any cross-motion for summary judgment; the defendants shall, by September 23, 2016, file any reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion; and the plaintiff shall, by October 17, 2016, file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 12, 2016. (lcbah4) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross-Motion/Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/17/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion/ Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/23/2016; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 10/17/2016. (tg) (Entered: 08/15/2016)
2016-08-1648NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Wynne Patrick Kelly on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Heather D. Graham-Oliver (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
2016-08-1749Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support and Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration of April E. Olson, # 4 Exhibit A of Olson Decl., # 5 Exhibit B of Olson Decl., # 6 Exhibit C of Olson Decl., # 7 Exhibit D of Olson Decl., # 8 Exhibit E of Olson Decl., # 9 Exhibit F of Olson Decl., # 10 Exhibit G of Olson Decl., # 11 Exhibit H of Olson Decl., # 12 Exhibit I of Olson Decl., # 13 Exhibit J of Olson Decl., # 14 Exhibit K of Olson Decl., # 15 Exhibit L of Olson Decl., # 16 Exhibit M of Olson Decl., # 17 Exhibit N of Olson Decl., # 18 Exhibit O of Olson Decl., # 19 Exhibit P of Olson Decl., # 20 Exhibit Q of Olson Decl., # 21 Exhibit R of Olson Decl., # 22 Exhibit S of Olson Decl., # 23 Declaration of John Repa, # 24 Exhibit A to Repa Decl., # 25 Exhibit B to Repa Decl., # 26 Exhibit C to Repa Decl., # 27 Exhibit D to Repa Decl., # 28 Text of Proposed Order)(Bienvenu, Reed) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-09-2050Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 49 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-20MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 50 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment. Accordingly, the defendants shall, by October 24, 2016, file their combined Response to the plaintiff's 49 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in support of the defendants' 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 20, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' combined Response to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/24/2016. (tg) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-10-2151Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File / Extension of the Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-24MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 51 Consent Motion for Extension of the Briefing Schedule. Accordingly, the Scheduling Order is amended as follows: the defendants shall, by November 14, 2016, file any combined response to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of the defendants' motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff shall, by December 12, 2016, file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 24, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-10-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' combined response to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of their motion for summary judgment is due by 11/14/2016; plaintiff's reply, if any, in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment is due by 12/12/2016. (jth) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
2016-11-1452Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and the Briefing Schedule to Allow the Parties to Explore Resolution by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-11-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 52 Consent Motion for Extension of the Briefing Scheduling in this Case. Accordingly, the Scheduling Order is amended as follows: the defendants shall, by December 5, 2016, file any combined response to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of the defendants' motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff shall, by January 6, 2017, file any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 15, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' response to Cross Motion/Reply is support of Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/5/2016; Plaintiff's reply in support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/6/2017. (tg) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-12-0253Joint MOTION to Stay the Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 12/02/2016)
2016-12-05MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' 53 Joint Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule. Accordingly, the briefing schedule is stayed for 60 days, and the parties are DIRECTED to file, no later than February 6, 2017, a joint status report advising the Court of the parties' progress toward settlement of this case, unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed before that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 5, 2016. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-05Set/Reset Deadline: The parties are DIRECTED to file, no later than 2/06/2017, a joint status report advising the Court of the parties' progress toward settlement of this case, unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed before that date. (ad) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2017-02-0654Joint MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion to Stay, Joint Status Report by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-06MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' 54 Joint Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule. Accordingly, this action is STAYED until April 7, 2017, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court of the parties' progress toward settlement of this case, with a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this case, unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed before that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 6, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-06Case Stayed until 4/7/2017. (tg) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/7/2017. (tg) (Entered: 02/06/2017)
2017-04-0755Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Briefing to Allow Further Negotiation by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-07MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 55 Consent Motion for Extension of the Briefing Schedule to Allow Further Negotiation. Accordingly, the stay in this action is extended through May 8, 2017, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court of the parties' progress toward settlement of this case, with a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this case, unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed before that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 7, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-04-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/8/2017. (tg) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-05-0856Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Continue Negotiations and Stay the Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-08MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' 56 Consent Motion for Extension of the Briefing Schedule to Allow Further Negotiation. Accordingly, the stay in this action is extended through June 7, 2017, by which date the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court of the parties' progress toward settlement of this case, with a proposed schedule to govern future proceedings in this case, unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed before that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 8, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/7/2017. (tg) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-06-0757Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-07MINUTE ORDER (paperless) in light of the parties' 57 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule, ISSUING the following revised Scheduling Order to govern further proceedings in this case: The defendants shall, by July 6, 2017, file a combined response to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of the defendants' motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff shall, by August 7, 2017, file a reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 7, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment due by 7/6/2017; Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment due by 8/7/2017. (tg) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-07-0658Memorandum in opposition to re 49 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Delabreau Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-0659REPLY to opposition to motion re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL OFFICE BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS, KEVIN WASHBURN, OFFICE OF INDIAN GAMING, PAULA HART, DIANE ROSEN, SALLY JEWEL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS. (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-08-0760REPLY to opposition to motion re 49 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FOREST COUNTY POTAWATOMI COMMUNITY. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Consolidated Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Second A. E. Olson Declaration, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit T to Second A. E. Olson Declaration)(Bienvenu, Reed) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
2017-09-3061ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part defendants' 44 Motion for Summary Judgment, and DENYING plaintiff's 49 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 30, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/30/2017)
2017-09-3062MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the defendants' 44 Motion for Summary Judgment and the plaintiff's 49 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 30, 2017. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/30/2017)
2017-10-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed schedule due by 10/27/2017. (hmc) (Entered: 10/02/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff