Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00123
Date Filed2015-01-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for any records referring to or prepared for former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton. Leopold also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency granted his fee waiver, but denied his request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-01-251COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-3972595) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons to State Department, # 3 Summons Summons to Attorney General, # 4 Summons Summons to US Attorney's Office)(James, Ryan) (Entered: 01/25/2015)
2015-01-25Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sth, ) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
2015-01-262SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
2015-01-263NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Louis Light on behalf of JASON LEOPOLD (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/26/2015)
2015-02-074RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/29/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/28/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/29/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/07/2015)
2015-02-095RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/4/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit to Affidavit of Service)(James, Ryan) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
2015-03-026NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Prince on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
2015-03-027ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/02/2015)
2015-03-06MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before March 20, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/06/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/06/2015)
2015-03-208Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit a Proposed Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
2015-03-20MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Briefing Schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before March 27, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/20/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
2015-03-279STATUS REPORT (JOINT) REGARDING SCHEDULE by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Email Correspondence)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
2015-03-31MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a status hearing shall be held on April 8, 2015, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/31/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
2015-03-31Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/8/2015 @ 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
2015-04-08Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 4/8/2015. Parties discuss the status of this action. Order to follow. Next status conference set for 5/19/2015 @ 9:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (Court Reporter: Annette Montalvo.) (tj ) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
2015-04-2810ORDER instructing parties to meet and confer. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/28/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
2015-05-0511TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on April 8, 2015; Page Numbers: 1-16. Date of Issuance:5-5-2015. Court Reporter/Transcriber Annette M. Montalvo, Telephone number 202-354-3111, Court Reporter Email Address : annette.montalvo@gmail.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 5/26/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/5/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2015.(Montalvo, Annette) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
2015-05-1812NOTICE of Filing of Declaration of John H. Hackett by DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 10 Order (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John H. Hackett)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
2015-05-19MINUTE ORDER: As stated on the record at today's status conference, Defendant shall file a notice to the Court on or before May 26, 2015, that includes the following: (1) a new production schedule for the Secretary Clinton e-mails that accounts for rolling production and updates from counsel every 60 days, (2) a proposed deadline for production of the Secretary Clinton e-mails relating to Benghazi, and (3) a proposed order that encapsulates the parties' agreement on the narrowing of Plaintiff's request concerning searches for records beyond the Secretary Clinton e-mails. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/19/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
2015-05-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 5/19/2015. Parties discuss the status of this action. Order to be issued by the court. (Court Reporter: Annette Montalvo.) (tj ) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
2015-05-2613NOTICE IN RESPONSE TO COURTS ORDER OF MAY 19, 2015 by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order re Production Schedule for the Secretary Clinton Emails, # 2 Proposed Order re Searches for Records Beyond the Secretary Clinton Emails)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
2015-05-2714Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Notice by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Response, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Plantiff's Proposed Scheduling Order)(James, Ryan) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
2015-05-2715ORDER granting 14 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Response. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/27/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
2015-05-2716SCHEDULING ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/27/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
2015-05-2717SCHEDULING ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/27/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
2015-05-27Set Deadlines: Production due by 1/29/2016. Joint Status Report due by 9/8/2015. (tj) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
2015-05-2718RESPONSE re 13 Notice (Other), filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw) (Entered: 05/28/2015)
2015-06-1819STATUS REPORT (JOINT) Regarding Parties' Discussions of Search Terms by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
2015-06-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before July 20, 2015, regarding the status of discussions pertaining to the development of machine-searchable terms. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/19/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
2015-06-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/20/2015 (tj) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-07-0720STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
2015-07-2021STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
2015-07-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before August 20, 2015, regarding the status of continued discussions pertaining to the development of machine-searchable terms responsive to Plaintiffs Narrowed FOIA Request. It is FURTHER ORDERED that as to those topics set forth in Plaintiffs Narrowed FOIA Request where the parties have already agreed upon search terms, Defendant shall begin conducting searches based on the agreed-upon terms, and it shall report its progress on those searches in the August status report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/21/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
2015-08-0722STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-08-1023Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's status report filed August 7, 2015 by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's response to Defendant's status report filed on August 7, 2015, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's response to Defendant's status report filed on August 7, 2015, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Plaintiff's motion for leave to file response to Defendant's status report filed August 7, 2015)(James, Ryan) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-08-1024MOTION for Order to amend the Court's Order of May 27, 2015 by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's motion to amend the Court's Order of May 27, 2015, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order granting motion to amend the Court's Order of May 27, 2015)(James, Ryan) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-08-10MINUTE ORDER granting 23 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion For Leave To File A Response To Defendant's Status Report: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's consent motion for leave to file is granted. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's response is hereby accepted as filed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/10/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
2015-08-1025RESPONSE re 22 Status Report filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(znmw) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
2015-08-1726Memorandum in opposition to re 24 MOTION for Order to amend the Court's Order of May 27, 2015 filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-08-2027STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-09-0228NOTICE of Filing Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
2015-09-0429NOTICE of Order Entered in Misc. No. 15-1188 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Copy of Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0430MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0831STATUS REPORT re Release of Records on August 31, 2015 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
2015-09-0832Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2015)
2015-09-09MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference at 11:30 AM on September 11, 2015, in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/9/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
2015-09-09MINUTE ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Court Order of May 27, 2015: In light of the representations made in 31 Defendant's Status Report Regarding Release of Records on August 21, 2015, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is DENIED as unnecessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/9/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
2015-09-10Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/11/2015 @ 11:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
2015-09-11MINUTE ORDER: As stated on the record at today's status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a status report on or before September 18, 2015 that details: (1) the estimated number of documents that have been provided by former State Department employees Philippe Reines, Huma Abedin, and Cheryl Mills, respectively, and (2) how far each of those groups of documents has progressed through the five-step scanning process outlined in [12-1] the Declaration of John H. Hackett. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall provide to Defendant on or before September 18, 2015, a notice that outlines a proposed search priority among the issues and custodians encompassed by Plaintiff's request. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/11/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
2015-09-11MINUTE ORDER: As stated on the record at today's status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant shall file a status report on or before October 12, 2015, regarding the status of the Defendant's efforts to solicit volunteers to be temporarily assigned to the Department's Office of Information Programs and Services to assist in responding to this and other FOIA-related requests. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/11/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
2015-09-11Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 9/11/2015. Parties advise the court of the status of this action. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Annette Montalvo.) (tj) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
2015-09-1833TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on 9-11-2015; Page Numbers: 1-18. Date of Issuance:9-18-2015. Court Reporter/Transcriber Annette M. Montalvo, Telephone number 202-354-3111, Court Reporter Email Address : annette.montalvo@gmail.com.<P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 10/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/17/2015.(Montalvo, Annette) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
2015-09-1834STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Email from Counsel)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
2015-09-2135Memorandum in opposition to re 30 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(James, Ryan) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-10-0136REPLY to opposition to motion re 30 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
2015-10-0637Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
2015-10-07MINUTE ORDER granting 37 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file its status report on or before October 13, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/7/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
2015-10-0738STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
2015-10-09MINUTE ORDER denying 30 Defendant's Motion to Stay: In light of the October 8, 2015 Order, ECF No. 41, in Case No. 15-mc-1188, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Stay is denied. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/9/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
2015-10-1339STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
2015-10-1640ORDER instructing parties to meet and confer. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/16/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
2015-10-3041Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John F. Hackett, # 2 Plaintiff Exhibit 1)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-11-05MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference at 2:30 PM on November 10, 2015, in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/05/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-05Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/10/2015 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-0642STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-11-1043SCHEDULING ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/10/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 11/10/2015. Parties address the filed status report and corrections. The court will issue a scheduling order re: production of documents. (Court Reporter: Annette Montalvo.) (ztj) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-1244SCHEDULING ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/12/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
2015-12-0745STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
2015-12-1446STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
2015-12-2247Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Searches for Records Potentially Responsive to Part 2 of the FOIA Request by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2015)
2015-12-28MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Complete Searches for Records Potentially Responsive to Part 2 of the FOIA Request: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall complete its searches for records potentially responsive to part 2 of the Narrowed FOIA Request on or before July 1, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/28/2015. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
2016-01-0748STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-01-2249MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production of Clinton Emails by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
2016-01-2550Memorandum in opposition to re 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production of Clinton Emails filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 June 15 Letter from ICIG to State IG)(James, Ryan) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
2016-01-2851REPLY to opposition to motion re 49 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production of Clinton Emails filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-02-01MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference at 2:30 PM on February 9, 2016, in Courtroom 14. Plaintiff's counsel to appear by telephone. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/01/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
2016-02-01Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/9/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
2016-02-0552STATUS REPORT Regarding Release of Records by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-09MINUTE ORDER: As stated on the record at today's status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before February 10, 2016, Defendant shall file a status report explaining, in the detail described at the hearing, its position that the pages of former Secretary Clinton's e-mails that have already proceeded through final, internal State Department review cannot be publicly posted until February 18, 2016. That status report should also identify what, if any, alternative methods of production might permit production to, or access by, Plaintiff before February 18, or otherwise explain, in detail, why such alternative methods cannot be achieved. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before February 12, 2016, Defendant shall file a detailed explanation of how the Department's oversight in originally failing to send 7,254 pages of documents to other agencies for interagency consultation arose, what caused that oversight, and why it was not discovered until recently. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/09/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-09Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 2/9/2016. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Lisa Moreira.) (tj) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-1053NOTICE of Plaintiff's Availability to Review Records in DC by JASON LEOPOLD (James, Ryan) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-1054STATUS REPORT Regarding Interim Production of Clinton Emails by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric F. Stein)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-1155ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Complete the Production of Clinton Emails. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/11/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/1/2016 (tj) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-1256NOTICE in Response to the Courts Minute Order of February 9, 2016 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-2557TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on February 9, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-22. Date of Issuance:February 25, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 202-354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2016.(Moreira, Lisa) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
2016-03-0158STATUS REPORT Regarding Final Production of Clinton Emails by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
2016-03-0259TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on 11-10-2015; Page Numbers: 1-26. Date of Issuance:3-2-2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Annette M. Montalvo, Telephone number 718-804-2711, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href=http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/dcd/node/2189>Transcript Order Form.</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 3/23/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2016.(Montalvo, Annette) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-0860STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
2016-03-08MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that on or before March 22, 2016, Defendant shall file an update to 39 Defendant's status report regarding its efforts to solicit volunteers to be temporarily assigned to the Department's Office of Information Programs and Services. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/08/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
2016-03-2261STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-04-0862STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-08MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit on or before April 22, 2016 their respective positions on whether the Court should adjust 44 its November 12, 2015 Production Scheduling Order, in light of the completion of the Clinton e-mail production and the 35 new staff members that the State Department Office of Information Programs and Services has hired to date, as reflected in 61 Defendant's March 22, 2016 status report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/08/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-2263Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-04-2564SCHEDULING ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/25/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-05-0665STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-06-0866STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
2016-07-0867STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
2016-07-2268Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Part 1 of the Narrowed FOIA Request by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-08-0869STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-0970NOTICE REGARDING THE JULY 22, 2016 JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PART 1 OF THE NARROWED FOIA REQUEST by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Vaughn index)(James, Ryan) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-10MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that on or before August 12, 2016, Defendants shall file a response to 70 Plaintiff's Notice Regarding the July 22, 2016 Joint Status Report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/10/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-1271RESPONSE re 70 Notice (Other) REGARDING THE JULY 22, 2016 JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PART 1 OF THE NARROWED FOIA REQUEST filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-1872MOTION for Leave to File Reply to ECF 71 by JASON LEOPOLD (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Reply to ECF 71)(James, Ryan) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-18MINUTE ORDER granting 72 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Reply (ECF No. 72-2) to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Notice Regarding the July 22, 2016 Joint Status Report is accepted as filed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/18/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/18/2016)
2016-08-1873REPLY re 71 RESPONSE re 70 Notice (Other) REGARDING THE JULY 22, 2016 JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING PART 1 OF THE NARROWED FOIA REQUEST filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (znmw) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-08-22MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference on September 26, 2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/22/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-26Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/26/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-09-0874STATUS REPORT re Release of Records Responsive to Part 2 of the Narrowed FOIA Request by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-09-26Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 9/26/2016. Parties to file a submission by 9/28/2016. (Court Reporter Patricia Kaneshiro Miller) (nbn) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-26MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before September 28, 2016, the parties shall file a joint status report on the matters as discussed in today's hearing. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/26/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/28/2016 (tj) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/10/2016 (tj) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
2016-09-2875Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order for 15-cv-123, # 2 Text of Proposed Order for 15-cv-2117)(Prince, Robert) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-3076ORDER. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/30/2016. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-0777STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 10/07/2016)
2016-10-2678TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Rudolph Contreras held on September 26, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-21. Date of Issuance:October 26, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the cou rt reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2017.(pk) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2017-04-25MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before May 10, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/25/2017. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/10/2017 (tj) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
2017-05-0379Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Prince, Robert) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff