Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00402
Date Filed2015-03-20
Date Closed2015-07-20
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPEER submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Agriculture's Natural Resources Conservation Service for records concerning the agency's efforts to protect grasslands and wetlands in the "Prairie Pothole" region. The agency responded to PEER's request but withheld six documents under Exemption 5 (deliberative process privilege). PEER filed an administrative appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Exemption 5 - Privileges - Deliberative process privilege - Predecisional, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE Natural Resources Conservation Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-03-201COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4029185) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
2015-03-20Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (sth, ) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
2015-03-202SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
2015-04-063ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/24/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/23/2015. (Dinerstein, Paula) Modified on 4/7/2015 (td, ). (Entered: 04/06/2015)
2015-04-064RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/24/2015. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
2015-04-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/24/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/23/2015. (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
2015-04-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE served on 3/31/2015 (Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 04/06/2015)
2015-04-07NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 3 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, was entered in error and counsel refiled said pleading as docket entry no. 5 . (td, ) (Entered: 04/07/2015)
2015-04-227Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 04/22/2015)
2015-04-23MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have up to, and including, May 25, 2015 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/23/2015. (lccrc1, ) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
2015-05-218Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 05/21/2015)
2015-05-22MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint; Defendant's Answer or other response to Plaintiffs Complaint shall be due to be filed by June 8, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/22/2015. (tcr) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
2015-06-049STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar