Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE et al v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00431
Date Filed2015-03-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffNEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE
PlaintiffSANTOS ALVARADO
PlaintiffMARIA AMAYA
PlaintiffMELVIN BARDALES-DERAS
PlaintiffJIMMY BARRAZA-BONILLA
PlaintiffALFREDO CARRERA
PlaintiffDENIS CHIRINOS-AVILA
PlaintiffIRMA LEMUS
PlaintiffERLIN SAN MARTIN-GOMEZ
PlaintiffRONALD MARTINEZ-RIVERA
PlaintiffMARIO MENDOZA
PlaintiffILDA SARMIENTO
Case DescriptionThe New Orleans Workers' Center for Equal Justice and other individuals submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning the Criminal Alien Removal Initiative and related community raid programs. The Center also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. ICE denied and then granted the Center's request for expedited processing. The Center filed an administrative appeal of the failure to grant a fee waiver. ICE denied the Center's fee waiver request on appeal. The Center asked the agency to reconsider its fee waiver decision. The agency upheld its denial of the fee waiver. The Center then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-03-251COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4034046) filed by ALFREDO CARRERA, MARIO MENDOZA, MARIA AMAYA, DENIS CHIRINOS-AVILA, ERLIN SAN MARTIN-GOMEZ, ILDA SARMIENTO, SANTOS ALVARADO, IRMA LEMUS, NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE, MELVIN BARDALES-DERAS, RONALD MARTINEZ-RIVERA, JIMMY BARRAZA-BONILLA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-03-252LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-03-25Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (sth, ) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-03-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(sth, ) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-03-254RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/25/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/24/2015. (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
2015-03-305MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Yihong "Julie" Mao, :Firm- New Orleans Workers' Center for Racial Justice, :Address- 217 N. Prieur Street, New Orleans, LA 70112. Phone No. - 504-309-5165. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4038807. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANTOS ALVARADO, MARIA AMAYA, MELVIN BARDALES-DERAS, JIMMY BARRAZA-BONILLA, ALFREDO CARRERA, DENIS CHIRINOS-AVILA, IRMA LEMUS, RONALD MARTINEZ-RIVERA, MARIO MENDOZA, NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE, ERLIN SAN MARTIN-GOMEZ, ILDA SARMIENTO (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-03-306MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer J. Rosenbaum, :Firm- New Orleans Workers' Center for Racial Justice, :Address- 217 N. Prieur Street, New Orleans, LA 70112. Phone No. - 504-309-5165. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4038826. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by SANTOS ALVARADO, MARIA AMAYA, MELVIN BARDALES-DERAS, JIMMY BARRAZA-BONILLA, ALFREDO CARRERA, DENIS CHIRINOS-AVILA, IRMA LEMUS, RONALD MARTINEZ-RIVERA, MARIO MENDOZA, NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE, ERLIN SAN MARTIN-GOMEZ, ILDA SARMIENTO (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
2015-03-31MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Admission of Yihong "Julie" Mao Pro Hac Vice; granting 6 Motion for Admission of Jennifer J. Rosenbaum Pro Hac Vice. The Court having considered the plaintiff's motions 5 and 6 , and it appearing to the Court that the attorneys referenced therein meet the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Courts rules, it is ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Yihong "Julie" Mao and Jennifer J. Rosenbaum are ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 3/31/2015. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
2015-04-037MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter L. Markowitz, :Firm- Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law, Immigration Justice Clinic, :Address- 55 Fifth Avenue, Room 1109, New York, NY 10003. Phone No. - (212) 790-0340. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4045382. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
2015-04-108NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
2015-04-159NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
2015-04-1610NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Attorney Rhonda Lisa Campbell terminated. (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 04/16/2015)
2015-04-2011Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
2015-04-29MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. For good cause shown, and in light of the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED NUNC PRO TUNC to April 20, 2015. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiffs' complaint on or before May 25, 2015.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/29/2015. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
2015-04-29MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Admission of Peter L. Markowitz Pro Hac Vice. The Court having considered the plaintiffs' Motion for Admission of Peter L. Markowitz Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meet the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Courts rules, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Peter L. Markowitz is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice.. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/29/2015. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
2015-04-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer or otherwise respond to complaint by 5/25/2015, (mpt, ) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
2015-05-2512ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 05/25/2015)
2015-07-2313MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Thomas P. Fritzsche, :Firm- Benjamin N. Cardozo School of Law, Immigration Justice Clinic, :Address- 55 Fifth Avenue, 11th Floor, New York, NY 10003. Phone No. - (212) 790-0213. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4186031. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
2015-07-27MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Motion for Admission of Thomas P. Fritzsche Pro Hac Vice. The Court having considered the plaintiffs' Motion for Admission of Thomas P. Fritzsche, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Thomas P. Fritzsch is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/27/2015. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
2015-08-0414MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
2015-08-0415Joint MOTION to Stay and Joint Meet and Confer Statement by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 08/04/2015)
2015-08-05MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Joint Meet and Confer Statement and Motion to Stay. For good cause shown, and in light of the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Meet and Confer Statement and Motion to Stay is granted and this case is STAYED until September 11, 2015. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint report to the Court regarding the status of this action by September 11, 2015 and will propose a briefing schedule within that filing. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/5/2015. (lcrbw3, ) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
2015-08-05Case Stayed until 9/11/15. (ztnr) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2015 (mpt) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
2015-09-1116Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Alternative Briefing Schedules by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (Defendant's Proposed Order), # 2 Text of Proposed Order (Plaintiffs' Proposed Order), # 3 Exhibit A)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
2015-11-1918PETITION FOR CERTIFICATION OF LAW SCHOOL CLINIC PROGRAM AND LAW SCHOOL CLINICAL SUPERVISOR UNDER L.CV.R. 83.4 (zrdj) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
2015-11-2317NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to SANTOS ALVARADO, MARIA AMAYA, MELVIN BARDALES-DERAS, JIMMY BARRAZA-BONILLA, ALFREDO CARRERA, DENIS CHIRINOS-AVILA, IRMA LEMUS, RONALD MARTINEZ-RIVERA, MARIO MENDOZA, NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE, ERLIN SAN MARTIN-GOMEZ, ILDA SARMIENTO. Attorney "Julie" Yihong Mao terminated. (Mao, "Julie") (Entered: 11/23/2015)
2015-12-0319ORDER; granting 18 PETITION FOR CERTIFICATION OF LAW SCHOOL CLINIC PROGRAM AND LAW SCHOOL CLINICAL SUPERVISOR UNDER L.CV.R. 83.4, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/30/2015. (hs) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
2016-01-0720Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-02-1121NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Josh Kolsky (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-17MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 20 Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule, and given the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following schedule for the briefing of summary judgment motions: the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment, Vaughn index, and any supporting declarations or affidavits on or before February 19, 2016; the plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 21, 2016; the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 20, 2016; and the plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before May 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/17/2016. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
2016-02-18Set/Reset Deadlines: The defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment, Vaughn index, and any supporting declarations or affidavits on or before 2/19/2016; the plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 3/21/2016; the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 4/20/2016; and the plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 5/11/2016. (ad) Modified on 2/18/2016 (zrdj). (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-1822MOTION for Extension of Time to Reset and Extend Deadlines by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-1923Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to Reset and Extend Deadlines filed by NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-02-19MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of the defendant's Motion To Reset and Extend Deadlines, and the plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to the defendant's motion, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall adhere to the following schedule for the briefing of summary judgment motions: the defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment, Vaughn index, and any supporting declarations or affidavits on or before March 18, 2016; the plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 18, 2016; the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment on or before May 18, 2016; and the plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before June 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/19/2016. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-02-19Set/Reset Deadlines: The defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment, Vaughn index, and any supporting declarations or affidavits on or before 3/18/2016; the plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 4/18/2016; the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 5/18/2016; and the plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 6/08/2016. (ad) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-03-1824MOTION for Summary Judgment , Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-1825AFFIDAVIT re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Fernando Pineiro (with attached exhibits 1-7) by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 of Pineiro Decl., # 2 Exhibit 2 of Pineiro Decl., # 3 Exhibit 3 of Pineiro Decl., # 4 Exhibit 4 of Pineiro Decl., # 5 Exhibit 5 of Pineiro Decl., # 6 Exhibit 6 of Pineiro Decl., # 7 Exhibit 7 of Pineiro Decl. (Vaughn Index))(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-1826AFFIDAVIT re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Paula Harrington by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-04-1827Memorandum in opposition to re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18 Part A, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 18 Part B, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 18 Part C, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 30, # 33 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-1828Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18 Part A, # 19 Exhibit 18 Part B, # 20 Exhibit 18 Part C, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-05-1329Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment , 28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Undisputed Material Facts by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-16MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Upon consideration of the defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule, and in light of the plaintiffs' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment on or before May 25, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of their cross-motion for summary judgment on or before June 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/16/2016. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motions due by 5/25/2016. Reply to Cross Motions due by 6/15/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/25/2016. (hs) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-05-2530REPLY to opposition to motion re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-05-2531AFFIDAVIT re 30 Reply to opposition to Motion, (Supplemental Declaration of Fernando Pineiro in Support of ICE's Motion for Summary Judgment) by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Vaughn Index)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-05-2532Memorandum in opposition to re 28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Undisputed Material Facts filed by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-06-1533REPLY to opposition to motion re 28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Undisputed Material Facts filed by NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 18 part A, # 4 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 18 part B, # 5 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 18 part C, # 6 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 19, # 7 Exhibit Amended Exhibit 21, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 31, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 32, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Amended Proposed Order)(Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-07-0134Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-0135SURREPLY to re 28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, Statement of Undisputed Material Facts filed by UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Supplemental Vaughn Index entry for pp. 133-136)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-05MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to File. Upon consideration of the Unopposed Motion for Leave To File Surreply, and in light of the plaintiffs' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/5/2016. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-2936NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael T. Kirkpatrick (Kirkpatrick, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-12-0637NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NEW ORLEANS WORKERS' CENTER FOR RACIAL JUSTICE. Attorney Thomas P. Fritzsche terminated. (Fritzsche, Thomas) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar