Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDONNELLY et al v. UNITED STATES SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND
DistrictEastern District of Michigan
CityFlint
Case Number4:2015cv11232
Date Filed2015-03-31
Date Closed2016-05-10
JudgeDistrict Judge Linda V. Parker
PlaintiffELAINE DONNELLY
PlaintiffCENTER FOR MILITARY READINESS
Case DescriptionElaine Donnelly, founder of the Center for Military Readiness, submitted seven FOIA requests to the U.S. Special Operations Command. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Donnelly filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-03-311COMPLAINT filed by ELAINE DONNELLY, CENTER FOR MILITARY READINESS against UNITED STATES SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5096910 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: USA. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Mersino, Erin) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
2015-03-312STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by CENTER FOR MILITARY READINESS, ELAINE DONNELLY (Mersino, Erin) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
2015-04-013STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by CENTER FOR MILITARY READINESS, ELAINE DONNELLY (Mersino, Erin) (Entered: 04/01/2015)
2015-04-024SUMMONS Issued for *UNITED STATES SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND* (DAll) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
2015-04-025SUMMONS Issued for the United States Attorney and the Office of the Attorney General. (DAll) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
2015-04-02A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
2015-05-066ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by UNITED STATES SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. (Helms, Brandon) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
2015-05-067NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2015 at 12:30 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (Loury, R) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
2015-05-188DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mersino, Erin)[JOINT STATUS REPORT] Modified on 5/18/2015 (DPer). (Entered: 05/18/2015)
2015-05-22Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/22/2015 (Loury, R) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
2015-05-229SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (Loury, R) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
2015-06-0910STIPULATED ORDER to Adjourn Deadlines for Initial Disclosures and Witness Lists. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
2015-07-0211NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 7/20/2015 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-15Reset Conference: TELEPHONIC Status Conference RESET for 7/27/2015 at 12:00 PM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-15Reset Conference: TELEPHONIC Status Conference RESET for 8/21/2015 at 11:30 AM before District Judge Linda V. Parker (RLou) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-08-21Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Linda V. Parker: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/21/2015 (RLou) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-08-2112SECOND SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 10/23/2015 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (RLou) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-10-2013STIPULATED ORDER to Adjourn Summary Judgment Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2015-10-2014THIRD SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/29/2016 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (RLou) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2016-01-2515STIPULATION AND ORDER to Adjourn Summary Judgment Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
2016-01-2516FOURTH SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/5/2016 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (RLou) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
2016-02-0517MOTION TO EXTEND Summary Judgment Deadlines by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1--Jan. 29, 2016 FOIA Letter, # 3 Exhibit 2--Feb. 1 Emails, # 4 Exhibit 3--Feb. 2 Emails, # 5 Exhibit 4--Feb. 3-4 Emails) (Helms, Brandon) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-0518ORDER Extending Summary Judgment Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-0519FIFTH SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 2/26/2016 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (RLou) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-2620STIPULATED ORDER to Adjourn Summary Judgment Deadlines. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
2016-02-2621SIXTH SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 3/25/2016 . Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (Refer to image for additional dates) (RLou) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
2016-03-1722Third MOTION TO EXTEND Deadlines for Summary Judgment Briefing Unopposed by UNITED STATES SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Ex. 1--Emails dated Feb. 3-24, 2016, # 3 Ex. 2--Emails dated Feb. 26 to Mar. 3, 2016, # 4 Ex. 3--Emails dated Mar. 14, 2016, # 5 Ex. 4--Emails dated Mar. 14-15, 2016) (Helms, Brandon) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-1823FINAL ORDER Extending Summary Judgment Deadlines ( Defendant's Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 4/15/2016 ). Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-2324NOTICE of Appearance by Kate M. Oliveri on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Oliveri, Kate) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
2016-03-2325MOTION for Withdrawal of Attorney Erin Mersino by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal) (Mersino, Erin) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
2016-03-2426ORDER granting 25 Motion to withdraw as counsel. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (DPer) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
2016-04-1427MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES SPECIAL OPERATIONS COMMAND. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit 1 Plaintiffs FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit 2 McRaven Memorandum dated Mar. 22, 2013, # 4 Exhibit 3 FOIA Receipt Letter, # 5 Exhibit 4 Letter from James Boisselle to Erin Mersino dated June 30, 2015, # 6 Exhibit 5 First Vaughn Index, # 7 Exhibit 6 Declaration of Mark H. Herrington on behalf of SOCOM, # 8 Exhibit 7 Letter from James Boisselle to Erin Mersino Jan. 29, 2016, # 9 Exhibit 8 Second Vaughn Index, # 10 Exhibit 9 Executive Order 13526, # 11 Exhibit 10 Letter from Paul Jacobsmeyer to Erin Mersino dated Feb. 24, 2016, # 12 Exhibit 11 RAND Contract Documents, # 13 Exhibit 12 Emails from Brandon Helms to Erin Mersino dated Mar. 14, 2016, # 14 Exhibit 13 Emails between Brandon Helms and Erin Mersino dated Mar. 1415, 2016, # 15 Exhibit 14 Ctr. for Public Integrity v. U.S. Office of Personnel Mgmt., # 16 Exhibit 15 Summary of Productions and Contested Withholdings, # 17 Exhibit 16 Declaration of Anne M. Hougendobler on behalf of Booz Allen Hamilton, # 18 Exhibit 17 Declaration of Scott W. Wyler on behalf of CACI-WGI, Inc., # 19 Exhibit 18 Declaration of William Welser, IV on behalf of RAND Corporation) (Helms, Brandon) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-05-1028STIPULATION of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Oliveri, Kate) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-1029ORDER of DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (RLou) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff