Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWRIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00510
Date Filed2015-04-08
Date Closed2015-06-30
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffCHRIS WRIGHT
Case DescriptionChris Wright, a blogger, submitted a FOIA request to the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for records concerning the original software specifications, and contracting records concerning the award for developing the Healthcare.gov website. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated it had been processing the request, but after Wright was unable to get any further response from the agency, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-04-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616069410) filed by CHRIS WRIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rdj) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-08SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (rdj) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
2015-04-102GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives; failure to conform to this Order may, when appropriate, result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/10/2015. (lckbj1) (Entered: 04/10/2015)
2015-04-173RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/13/2015, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/13/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/13/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/13/2015.) (jf, ) (Entered: 04/21/2015)
2015-05-134ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 05/13/2015)
2015-05-19MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by 6/2/2015. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/19/2015. (lckbj1) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
2015-06-025STATUS REPORT and SCHEDULE OF PRODUCTION by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/02/2015)
2015-06-026MOTION for Court Enforcement of Settlement Agreement, MOTION for Summary Judgment, MOTION for Hearing by CHRIS WRIGHT (jf) (Entered: 06/03/2015)
2015-06-057Memorandum in opposition to re 6 MOTION for court enforcement of settlement agreement MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Hearing filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kade, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
2015-06-088ENTERED IN ERROR.....ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this Court should not dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. See attached Order for details. Show Cause Response due by 6/26/2015. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/08/2015. (lckbj1) Modified on 6/8/2015 (ztnr). (Entered: 06/08/2015)
2015-06-08NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: 8 Order to Show Cause was entered in error; counsel should disregard.(ztnr) (Entered: 06/08/2015)
2015-06-099REPLY to opposition to re 6 MOTION for court enforcement of settlement agreement MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Hearing filed by CHRIS WRIGHT. (jf) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
2015-06-23MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Court Enforcement of Settlement Agreement, for Summary Judgment, and for Expedited Hearing. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a status report by 7/1/2015, which shall include a proposed briefing schedule if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/23/2015. (lckbj1) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-06-3010Joint STIPULATION of Dismissal. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff