Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2015-05-04 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3590738.), filed by Vietnam Veterans of America, National Veterans Council for Legal Redress. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L)(Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2015) |
2015-05-04 | | Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 05/04/2015) |
2015-05-04 | | Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 05/05/2015) |
2015-05-04 | 2 | Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/4/2015. Amended Pleadings due by 7/3/2015. Discovery due by 11/3/2015. Dispositive Motions due by 12/3/2015. Signed by Clerk on 5/4/2015.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/06/2015) |
2015-05-04 | 3 | STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/4/2015.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/06/2015) |
2015-05-04 | 4 | ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/4/2015.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/06/2015) |
2015-05-06 | 5 | NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 3 Standing Protective Order, 1 Complaint,, filed by Vietnam Veterans of America, National Veterans Council for Legal Redress, 4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/6/2015.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/06/2015) |
2015-05-06 | 6 | ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Department of the Air Force, Department of the Army, Department of Defense, Department of the Navy* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Michael J. Wishnie* *Jerome N. Frank Legal Services - Wall St* *Yale Law School, 127 Wall Street* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 05/06/2015) |
2015-06-15 | 7 | MOTION for Extension of Time until July 9, 2015 to respond to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint,, by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Army, Department of Defense, Department of the Navy. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 06/15/2015) |
2015-06-16 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by David Christopher Nelson on behalf of Department of the Air Force, Department of the Army, Department of Defense, Department of the Navy in addition to the appearances already on file (Nelson, David) (Entered: 06/16/2015) |
2015-06-19 | 9 | ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time until July 9, 2015 to respond to Plaintiffs' 1 Complaint,,. Signed by Clerk on 6/19/2015. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/19/2015) |
2015-06-19 | | Answer deadline updated for Department of the Air Force to 7/9/2015; Department of the Army to 7/9/2015; Department of Defense to 7/9/2015; Department of the Navy to 7/9/2015. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 06/19/2015) |
2015-07-09 | 10 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Army, Department of Defense, Department of the Navy.(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2015) |
2015-07-14 | 11 | First AFFIDAVIT of Service for Declaration of Service served on U.S. Department of Defense, Department of the Army, Department of the Navy, and Department of the Air Force on May 14, 2015, filed by National Veterans Council for Legal Redress, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2015) |
2015-07-22 | 12 | First MOTION for Status Conference to enter a scheduling order for Defendants' production of records and summary judgment motions by National Veterans Council for Legal Redress, Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2015) |
2015-07-23 | 13 | ORDER granting 12 Motion for Conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 07/23/2015. (LaPre, E.) (Entered: 07/23/2015) |
2015-07-23 | 14 | NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 579-5617. (LaPre, E.) (Entered: 07/23/2015) |
2015-08-10 | 15 | NOTICE of Appearance by Bethany Yue-Ping Li on behalf of National Veterans Council for Legal Redress, Vietnam Veterans of America (Li, Bethany) (Entered: 08/10/2015) |
2015-08-11 | 16 | NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Matthew Manes on behalf of National Veterans Council for Legal Redress, Vietnam Veterans of America (Manes, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/11/2015) |
2015-08-12 | 17 | Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Scheduling Conference held on 8/12/2015, 10 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) ORDERED that on or before August 14, 2015, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order setting forth deadlines for (i) joinder of additional parties and amendment of pleadings; (ii) production of responsive, non-exempt records; (iii) completion of all discovery; and (iv) filing of dispositive motions. To the extent that the parties cannot reach agreement, the parties may file brief written submissions, not to exceed five pages, in support of their respective proposed schedules. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all counsel are on the line, please call chambers at (203) 579-5617. (LaPre, E.) (Entered: 08/12/2015) |
2015-08-14 | 18 | Joint MOTION for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order Order by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Army, Department of Defense, Department of the Navy. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 08/14/2015) |
2015-08-17 | 19 | ORDER granting 18 Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Scheduling Order. The Court adopts the deadlines set forth in the parties' motion as its Scheduling Order in this case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 08/17/2015. (LaPre, E.) (Entered: 08/17/2015) |
2015-08-17 | | Set Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2015; Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2016; Status Report due by 11/13/2015 (Ghilardi, K.) (Entered: 08/18/2015) |
2015-11-13 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Further Proceedings by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Army, Department of Defense, Department of the Navy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 11/13/2015) |
2015-12-18 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by Department of the Air Force, Department of the Army, Department of Defense, Department of the Navy. (Josephson, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2015) |
2016-01-06 | 23 | PROPOSED ORDER & Stipulation of Settlement by Vietnam Veterans of America. (Wishnie, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2016) |
2016-01-06 | 24 | ORDER dismissing case with prejudice pursuant to the parties' 23 Stipulation of Settlement. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the parties' stipulation to the extent consistent with applicable law. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 01/06/2016. (LaPre, E.) (Entered: 01/06/2016) |
2016-01-06 | | JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Perez, J.) (Entered: 01/06/2016) |
Hide Docket Events |