Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00684
Date Filed2015-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for any emails sent to or from former deputy chief of staff Huma Abedin using a non-government email address. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after the agency failed to respond within the statutory deadline, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-05-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4081001) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons US State Department)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
2015-05-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2015)
2015-05-05Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (md, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
2015-05-063SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
2015-05-064STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 6, 2015. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
2015-05-125RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/11/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/10/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/11/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/11/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
2015-06-106ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
2015-06-247STATUS REPORT (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-06-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of proceedings in this matter, pursuant to the parties' 7 Joint Status Report and upon consideration of the plaintiff's request for limited discovery in the form of responses to various questions: the defendant shall make a rolling production of documents to the plaintiff beginning on August 31, 2015 and continuing every sixty days thereafter until January 29, 2016. The parties shall, by March 1, 2016, file a joint status report advising the Court whether the parties have resolved all disputes over the defendant's response to the plaintiff's FOIA request or whether dispositive motions are anticipated. The defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment, if any, by April 1, 2016. The plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment, if any, by May 2, 2016. The defendant shall file its reply and opposition by June 2, 2016. The plaintiff shall file its reply by June 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 25, 2015. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/25/2015)
2015-06-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's rolling production of documents to plaintiff to begin on 8/31/2015 and continue every sixty days until 1/29/2016; Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2016; Summary Judgment motion due by 4/1/2016; Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/2/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/2/2016; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 6/16/2016. (tg) (Entered: 06/26/2015)
2015-09-038NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Designate Coordinating Judge)(Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-039MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of its Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-0410NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Order)(Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-2111RESPONSE re 9 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of its Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-10-0112REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of its Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
2015-10-1513NOTICE of Denial of State Department's Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
2015-10-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DENYING AS MOOT the defendant's 9 Motion to Stay Pending Resolution of Its Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge, as the defendant's Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge has been denied. See Order, In re: U.S. Department of State FOIA Litigation Regarding Emails of Certain Former Officials , No. 15-mc-1188 (D.D.C. Oct. 8, 2015). Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 16, 2015. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
2016-01-1114Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
2016-01-11MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of further proceedings: The defendant shall make a rolling production of responsive, non-exempt documents, excluding news clippings/briefings, to the plaintiff beginning on March 1, 2016, and continuing every thirty days thereafter until April 30, 2017, after review of a minimum of 400 pages per month. The parties shall, by May 30, 2016, and every ninety days thereafter, submit to the Court a joint status report advising the Court of the status of this ongoing production. The parties shall, by March 15, 2017, submit a final joint status report advising the Court whether the parties have resolved all disputes over the defendant's response to the plaintiff's FOIA request or whether dispositive motions are anticipated and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern the submission of dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 11, 2016. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
2016-01-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's rolling production beginning 3/1/2016, and continuing every thirty days thereafter until 4/30/2017; Joint Status Report submission by 5/30/2016, and every ninety days thereafter until 3/15/2017. (tg) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
2016-05-2715Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Anderson, Caroline) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-08-2916NOTICE of Appearance by James O. Bickford on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Bickford, James) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-2917Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-11-2818Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2017-03-0119Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-1520Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of further proceedings: The parties shall, by May 31, 2017, submit a final joint status report advising the Court whether the parties have resolved all disputes over the defendant's response to the plaintiff's FOIA request or whether dispositive motions are anticipated and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern the submission of dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 15, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Final Joint Status Report due by 5/31/2017. (tg) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-04-2421Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production and File Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 04/24/2017)
2017-04-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 21 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the defendant is ORDERED to make its final production of nonexempt and responsive documents no later than May 31, 2017. The parties are FURTHER ORDERED to file a joint status report no later than June 30, 2017, informing the Court (1) whether any additional searches will be performed in connection with this case and, if not, (2) whether dispositive motions will be required and proposing a briefing schedule if necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 25, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 04/25/2017)
2017-04-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's final production of nonexempt and responsive documents due by 5/31/2017; Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2017. (tg) (Entered: 04/26/2017)
2017-06-3022Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-03MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by July 31, 2017, a further Joint Status Report proposing a schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 3, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 07/03/2017)
2017-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/31/2017. (tg) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-3123Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/31/2017)
2017-08-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by October 6, 2017, a further Joint Status Report proposing a schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 1, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2017. (tg) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-10-0624Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-06MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' 24 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the parties shall, by October 11, 2017, file a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 6, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/11/2017. (tg) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-1125Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
2017-11-13MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by December 31, 2017, a further Joint Status Report proposing a schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 13, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-11-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/31/2017. (tg) (Entered: 11/13/2017)
2017-12-2926Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 12/29/2017)
2018-01-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by January 31, 2018, a further Joint Status Report proposing a schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 2, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 01/02/2018)
2018-01-3127Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 01/31/2018)
2018-02-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 27 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by February 28, 2018, a further Joint Status Report proposing a schedule to govern future proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 1, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2018. (tg) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
2018-02-2828Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 02/28/2018)
2018-03-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control further proceedings: the government shall, by April 27, 2018, file any motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff shall, by May 25, 2018, file any opposition to the government's motion and any cross-motion for summary judgment. The government shall, by June 27, 2018, file any reply to its motion and any opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion. The plaintiff shall, by July 13, 2018, file any reply to its cross-motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 1, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's motion for summary judgment due by 4/27/2018. Plaintiff's opposition to the government's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion due by 5/25/2018. Government's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion due by 6/27/2018. Plaintiff's reply in support of its cross-motion due by 7/13/2018. (hmc) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
2018-04-2729MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 04/27/2018)
2018-05-2330Memorandum in opposition to re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-05-2331Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
2018-06-2732REPLY to opposition to motion re 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Statement of Facts)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2733Memorandum in opposition to re 31 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (See docket entry 32 to view document)(zrdj) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-1334NOTICE by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. re 31 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , 33 Memorandum in Opposition (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
2018-08-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the plaintiff's representation in its 34 Notice Concerning Its Reply in Support of Its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment ("Notice") that "Plaintiff no longer challenges the adequacy of the search" and that "[t]he only remaining issue is an award of attorneys' fees and other litigation costs," Notice at 1, the parties to file, by August 31, 2018, a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings unless a stipulation of dismissal has been entered by that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 15, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
2018-08-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/31/2018. (tg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
2018-08-3135Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 35 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by September 27, 2018, a further joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed by that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 1, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 09/01/2018)
2018-09-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2018. (tg) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
2018-09-2736Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-27MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 36 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by October 26, 2018, a further joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed by that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 27, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 09/27/2018)
2018-09-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/26/2018. (tg) (Entered: 09/28/2018)
2018-10-2937Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-2938NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Peterson on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-2939Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report Nunc Pro Tunc by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING, nunc pro tunc , the parties' 39 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The parties' 37 Joint Status Report of October 29, 2018 is deemed timely filed. It is further ordered that the parties are DIRECTED to file, by November 30, 2018, a further joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed by that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 29, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2018. (tg) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar