Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00687
Date Filed2015-05-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for all emails received by Hillary Clinton in her official capacity while serving as Secretary of State. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after it failed to respond within the statutory deadline, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [41]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge James Boasberg has ruled that the Department of State properly withheld 30 pages of records concerning communications between the agency and former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton or her associates pertaining to the production of 55,000 emails sent from non "state.gov" email addresses under Exemption 5 (deliberative process privilege). Judicial Watch requested the records and State disclosed 87 documents, but withheld 153 documents in full or in part. Judicial Watch claimed the 30 records withheld under Exemption 5 were subject to the government misconduct exception because the records would show the agency's complicity in Clinton's misuse of a private server or, alternatively, show that the agency had discussed how to create misinformation to minimize the public's perception of the misconduct. After reviewing the records in camera, Boasberg indicated that "even assuming that the conduct hypothesized by Judicial Watch would rise to the level required for the narrow government-misconduct exception, the records show no such acts. More specifically, the material withheld does not provide insight into Clinton's misuse of the private server, not does it reveal any purported Department complicity in that act or effort to downplay her misconduct after the fact." Discussing various emails that were withheld, Boasberg pointed out that "while others do discuss the scope and methodology of State's efforts to recapture emails, the communications again appear to be well within the realm of legitimate policy ends. These records, in other words, demonstrate only that State employees were actively offering various opinions as they worked to ensure that the agency appropriately responded to the news swirling around Clinton's emails."
Issues: Exemption 5 - Privileges - Waiver of privilege
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-05-061COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4081920) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for U.S. Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. State Department)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
2015-05-062LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
2015-05-06Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (md, ) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
2015-05-073MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Lauren M. Burke, :Firm- Judicial Watch, Inc., :Address- 425 Third Street, SW Ste. 800. Phone No. - 202-646-5194. Fax No. - 202-646-5199 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4084733. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lauren M. Burke, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
2015-05-08MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of LAUREN M. BURKE. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/8/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
2015-05-084SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md, ) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
2015-05-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/18/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/18/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 5/18/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
2015-06-176ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
2015-06-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by July 2, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/18/15. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
2015-06-18Set/Reset Deadline: The parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by 7/2/2015. (ad) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
2015-07-027RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order to Submit Joint Proposed Production Schedule filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-02MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' 7 Joint Proposed Production Schedule, the Court ORDERS that by July 31, 2015, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report concerning a proposed schedule for Request F-2015-05048. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/02/2015. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-02Set/Reset Deadline: By 7/31/2015, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report concerning a proposed schedule for Request F-2015-05048. (ad) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
2015-07-308NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/30/2015)
2015-07-319STATUS REPORT (Second Joint) Concerning Proposed Production Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
2015-08-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court GRANTS parties' 9 Second Joint Status Report Concerning Proposed Production Schedule and hereby ORDERS that 1) Initial production of responsive, non-exempt records shall be due by September 3, 2015; 2) Rolling productions shall be due every 5 weeks thereafter, with an anticipated completion of December 17, 2015, and 3) a further status report, with date for production of draft Vaughn index, shall be filed no later than December 31, 2015. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/03/15. (lcjeb2, ) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
2015-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Initial production of responsive, non-exempt records shall be due by 9/03/2015; Rolling productions shall be due every 5 weeks thereafter, with an anticipated completion of 12/17/2015, and a further status report, with date for production of draft Vaughn index, shall be filed no later than 12/31/2015. (ad) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
2015-09-0310NOTICE Regarding Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Misc. No. 15-1188 Motion for Designation of Coordinating Judge)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-0411NOTICE of Court Order in Misc. No. 15-1188 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit : Order in Misc. No. 15-1188)(Federighi, Carol) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-12-1612Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Production and File Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
2015-12-16MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 12 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall complete production responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA Request F-2015-05048 no later than February 1, 2016. The Court FURTHER ORDERS that the parties shall meet and confer regarding the scope of a draft Vaughn index, and Defendant shall submit a status report with a reasonable date for production of a draft Vaughn index no later than February 17, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/16/2015. (lcjeb2, ) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
2015-12-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's completion of production responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA Request F-2015-05048 due by 2/1/2016; Defendant's Status Report due by 2/17/2016. (tg) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
2016-01-2813Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Final Installment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-01-29MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 13 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall complete production responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA Request F-2015-05048 by no later than February 4, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 01/29/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-01-29Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall complete production responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA Request F-2015-05048 by no later than 2/4/2016. (ad) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-02-1714STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
2016-02-18MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by April 11, 2016, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 02/18/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-18Set/Reset Deadline: By 4/11/2016, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report. (ad) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-04-1115Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-11MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by May 11, 2016, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 04/11/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-12Set/Reset Deadline: By 5/11/2016, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report. (ad) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-05-1116Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-05-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by June 10, 2016, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 05/12/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-05-12Set/Reset Deadline: By 6/10/2016, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report. (ad) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-06-1017Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-06-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by June 24, 2016, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 06/13/2016. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-13Set/Reset Deadline: By 6/24/2016, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report. (ad) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-2418STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-06-2419STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
2016-07-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a status conference on July 15, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 19. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/5/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-05Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference is set for 7/15/2016, at 9:30 AM, in Courtroom 19, before Judge James E. Boasberg. (ad) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-05MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to request from counsel, the Court ORDERS that the status conference set for July 15, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED AND RESET for July 14, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 19. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/5/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-05Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 7/15/2016, at 9:30 AM, is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 7/14/2016, at 9:30 AM, in Courtroom 19, before Judge James E. Boasberg. (ad) (ad) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-1320PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE Jointly by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
2016-07-14MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) The parties' 20 Proposed Briefing Schedule is ADOPTED for Request No. 5048; 2) As to Request No. 5056, Defendant shall produce by September 15, 2016, a Vaughn Index for all fully withheld documents and documents partially redacted under Exemption 4; 3) By July 28, 2016, Plaintiff shall identify up to 200 documents partially redacted under Exemption 5; 4) By October 28, 2016, Defendant shall produce a Vaughn Index concerning those 200 documents; and 5) The parties shall return for a further status conference on August 22, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/14/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
2016-07-14Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Hearing held on 7/14/2016. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith.) (tg) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
2016-07-14Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Vaughn Index due by 9/15/2016; Plaintiff's identification of up to 200 documents partially redacted under Exemption 5 due by 10/28/2016; Status Conference scheduled for 8/22/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (tg) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
2016-07-2921NOTICE of Document Identification by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Burke, Lauren) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-1222Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-22MINUTE ORDER: As agreed at today's status conference, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall commence its appraisal of the approximately 14,900 documents on disk 1, which appraisal shall be completed by September 22, 2016; 2) Defendant shall also conduct a rolling review of such documents once appraised; and 3) The parties shall return for a further status hearing on September 22, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 19, at which time Defendant shall inform the Court of the status of its review, and the Court shall set a production schedule. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/22/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-22MINUTE ORDER: At the parties' request, the Court ORDERS that the Status Hearing set for September 22, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED AND RESET for September 23, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 19. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/22/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 8/22/2016. The Status Hearing set for 9/22/2016, at 10:30 AM is hereby VACATED AND RESET for 9/23/2016, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 19, before Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (ad) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-22Set/Reset Deadline: The Defendant shall commence its appraisal of the approximately 14,900 documents on disk 1, which appraisal shall be completed by 9/22/2016. (ad) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-09-0123TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 8-22-16; Page Numbers: 1-15. Date of Issuance:9-1-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa W GRIFFITH, Telephone number 2023543247, Tape Number: Lisa_Griffith@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 9/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2016.(Griffith, Lisa) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-0624Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-06MINUTE ORDER granting Unopposed 24 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before September 30, 2016; 2) Plaintiff shall files its opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before October 31, 2016; 3) Defendant shall file its reply and cross-opposition on or before November 30, 2016; and Plaintiff shall files its cross-reply on or before December 30, 2016. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/22/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
2016-09-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before 9/30/2016; Plaintiff shall files its opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 10/31/2016; Defendant shall file its reply and cross-opposition on or before 11/30/2016; and Plaintiff shall files its cross-reply on or before 12/30/2016. (ad) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-23MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) As to disk 1 documents, the State Department shall process 350 pages and produce non-exempt material thereon by October 7, 2016, another 350 pages by October 21, 2016, another 350 pages by November 4, 2016, and 500 additional pages per month thereafter; 2) States shall also complete its appraisal of the three other disks likely to contain responsive material by October 17, 2016; and 3) The parties shall return for a further status conference on November 7, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 9/23/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-23Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 9/23/2016. (The State Department shall process 350 pages and produce non-exempt material thereon by 10/7/2016, another 350 pages by 10/21/2016, another 350 pages by 11/4/2016, and 500 additional pages per month thereafter; The State Department shall complete its appraisal of the three other disks likely to contain responsive material by 10/17/2016). A further Status Conference is set for 11/7/2016, at 9:30 AM, in Courtroom 19, before Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith). (kt) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-3025MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Eric Stein, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Eric Stein, # 4 Exhibit Vaughn Index accompanying Declaration of Eric Stein, # 5 Statement of Facts)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-0126NOTICE OF PROPOSED ORDER 25 for Summary Judgment Proposed Order by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Olson, Lisa) Modified text and added linkage on 10/3/2016 (td). (Entered: 10/01/2016)
2016-10-0427NOTICE Regarding Review of FBI Materials by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Sept. 30, 2016 Order, Leopold v. U.S. Dep't of State, No. 15-cv-123, # 2 Exhibit Oct. 3, 2016 Order, Leopold v. Dep't of Justice, No. 15-2117)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-1128Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) and Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-11MINUTE ORDER granting Consent 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that 1) Plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before November 18, 2016, 2) Defendant shall file its reply and cross-opposition on or before December 21, 2016, and 3) Plaintiff shall file its cross-reply on or before January 20, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/11/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before 11/18/2016, Defendant shall file its reply and cross-opposition on or before 12/21/2016, and Plaintiff shall file its cross-reply on or before 1/20/2017. (ad) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-2729TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 9-23-16; Page Numbers: 1-32. Date of Issuance:10-27-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa W GRIFFITH, Telephone number 202-354-3247, Tape Number: Lisa_Griffith@dcd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 11/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2017.(Griffith, Lisa) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-11-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the status hearing set for November 7, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET for 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 19. The Court apologizes for any inconvenience to the parties. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/3/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-04Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 11/07/2016, at 9:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 19, before Judge James E. Boasberg. (ad) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-07MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall process disks 3-5 at the rate of 500 pages per month beginning upon its completion of the processing of disk 1; 2) The parties shall appear at a status hearing on November 29, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. to discuss whether State then possesses the Huma Abedin emails recovered by the FBI from her husband's computer; and 3) The parties shall appear at a status hearing on March 7, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. to discuss the rate of processing of disks 3-5 in light of any ruling by Judge Randolph Moss in related cases. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/7/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-11-07Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 11/7/2016. A Status Conference is set for 11/29/2016, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 19, before Judge James E. Boasberg. A Status Conference is set for 3/7/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 19, before Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Barbara DeVico) (ad) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-11-1830Memorandum in opposition to re 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Partial) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Facts)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-1831Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-2932TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge James E. Boasberg held on 11-7-16; Page Numbers: 1-22. Date of Issuance:11-29-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Barbara J. DeVico, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Tape Number: barbctr76@gmail.com. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P> NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 12/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/30/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/27/2017.(DeVico, Barbara) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-11-29MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that within one week of the State Department's receipt of additional emails from the FBI, it shall file a notice with the Court so that a further status hearing may be set to discuss a timetable for processing and release. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/29/16. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-11-29Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 11/29/2016. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (ad) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-12-2133REPLY to opposition to motion re 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Vaughn Index 05048 Documents, # 2 Exhibit April 2, 2015 Letter, # 3 Exhibit March 3, 2015 Letter)(Olson, Lisa) Modified linkage on 12/22/2016 (td). (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-2134Memorandum in opposition to re 31 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE; (See docket entry no. 33 to view document.) (td) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2235NOTICE of Filing of Corrected Vaughn Index for FOIA Request Number F-2015-05048 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Vaughn Index for FOIA Request No. F-2015-05048)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-2836Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 31 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
2016-12-28MINUTE ORDER granting 36 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff will file its Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Partial Summary Judgment on or before February 3, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/28/2016. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
2016-12-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 2/3/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
2017-01-24MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall produce the 30 documents identified as still at issue in Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for in camera review by January 31, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/24/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-01-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall produce the 30 documents identified as still at issue in Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment for in camera review by 1/31/2017. (nbn) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
2017-01-3137NOTICE of Submission of Documents for In Camera Review by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE re Order, (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-3138NOTICE of Filing of Second Amended Vaughn Index for FOIA Request Number F-2015-05048 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Second Amended Vaughn Index regarding F-2015-05048)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-01-3139REPLY to opposition to motion re 31 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Kennedy Depo. Excerpt, # 2 Exhibit Lang Depo. Excerpt)(Fedeli, Chris) (Entered: 01/31/2017)
2017-02-17MINUTE ORDER: Because the Court will be in trial, the status hearing set for March 7, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED AND RESET for March 7, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/17/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-17Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/7/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
2017-02-2140ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and DENYING Plaintiff's 31 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/21/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2141Memorandum Opinion re 40 Order on Motions for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/21/2017. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-03-0642NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jennie Leah Kneedler on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Lisa A. Olson (Kneedler, Jennie) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-0643Unopposed MOTION to Continue March 7, 2017 Status Hearing by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kneedler, Jennie) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-06MINUTE ORDER granting Unopposed 43 Motion to Continue. The Court ORDERS that status hearing set for March 7, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED and RESET for April 4, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 19. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/6/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
2017-03-06Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/4/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (nbn) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-04-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held on 4/4/2017. A further Status Conference is set for 7/20/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 19 before Judge James E. Boasberg. (Court Reporter Barbara DeVico) (nbn) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-04MINUTE ORDER: As discussed at today's status hearing, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall continue processing disks 3-5 at the rate of 500 pages per month; and 2) Defendant shall inform the Court within one week of its receipt of any additional emails from the FBI. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/4/17. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-06-2244NOTICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE re Order, (Kneedler, Jennie) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff