Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGoldwater Institute v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
DistrictDistrict of Arizona
CityPhoenix Division
Case Number2:2015cv01055
Date Filed2015-06-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Susan R Bolton
PlaintiffGoldwater Institute
Case DescriptionThe Goldwater Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Food and Drug Administration for records concerning whether ZMapp, an experimental drug given to two U.S. citizens who contracted Ebola, had been approved under the compassion use process for investigational new drugs. The Goldwater Institute also requested a fee waiver. The agency granted the fee waiver, but was denied access to the records under Exemption 4 (confidential business information). The Goldwater Institute appealed the decision, which was upheld. The Goldwater Institute then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Exemption 4 - Confidential business information

DefendantUnited States Department of Health and Human Services
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [36]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in Arizona has ruled that the FDA has not yet justified its claims that records about ZMapp, currently being considered for approval under an Investigational New Drug application, are protected by Exemption 4 (confidential business information) or Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), but that because the Goldwater Institute requested records about deliberations during the approval process such records are protected by Exemption 5 (deliberative process privilege). Based on press reports that Dr. Kent Brantly and Nancy Writebol, two health workers who contracted the Ebola virus while working in Africa, had been flown to the United States and treated successfully with ZMapp, the Goldwater Institute requested the agency's records on ZMapp, arguing that the existence of the IND application had been publicly acknowledged. After learning that Brantly and Writebol had disclosed in a report that they received three doses of ZMapp, the FDA disclosed two emails authorizing Brantley and Writebol's expanded access to ZMapp to proceed. The agency, however, insisted that the rest of the documents were protected by Exemption 4, Exemption 5, and Exemption 6. Faulting the agency for not providing an index of the records it claimed were exempt, the court noted that "it is unclear to the Court, which if any, responsive documents would fall under [Exemption 4]. Defendant has not provided a catalog of the documents in their supporting memorandum." The court added that it "cannot conclude that Defendant's assertion that trade secrets and [confidential commercial information] are 'inextricably intertwined' alone is sufficient to meet its burden. Therefore, the Court reserves judgment on whether Defendant lawfully denied Plaintiff's request based on FOIA Exemption 4." The court was considerably more certain as to Exemption 5. "Plaintiff's FOIA Request expressly asked for documents reflecting the FDA's 'deliberations made during [the authorization] process.' By the very nature of the documents sought, the Court concludes that Defendant lawfully withheld at least some documents under Exemption 5." The court found the agency had not sufficiently explained its claims under Exemption 6. The court noted that "it is unclear to the Court what personal information Plaintiff seeks that would fall under this Exemption. Like Exemption 4, the Court is left without a description or index of the documents to determine if Defendant has met its burden particularly when Dr. Brantly and Ms. Writebol both disclosed their participation in ZMapp INDs." The court observed that "defendant identified nine volumes of responsive records in its initial denial. Because the Court is unable to determine if the exemptions apply based on the generalizations given in [the agency's affidavit], the Court orders Defendant to submit a Vaughn index within 60 days of the date of this Order."
Issues: Exemption 4 - Confidential business information, Exemption 6 - Invasion of privacy, Litigation - Vaughn index
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-06-091COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-11769236 filed by Goldwater Institute. (Submitted by Jonathan Riches) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ATD) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
2015-06-092Corporate Disclosure Statement by Goldwater Institute. (Submitted by Jonathan Riches) (ATD) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
2015-06-093Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-11769236. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-15-1055-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (ATD) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
2015-06-094SUMMONS Submitted by Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/09/2015)
2015-06-105Summons Issued as to United States Department of Health and Human Services. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 06/10/2015)
2015-06-106ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/10/15. (MAW) (Entered: 06/10/2015)
2015-06-157SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Goldwater Institute: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Order upon U.S. Attorney's Office, District of Arizona on 06/10/2015. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/15/2015)
2015-06-178SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that defendant shall serve an answer or otherwise plead within thirty (30) days after service [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/17/15. (MAW) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
2015-07-019SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Goldwater Institute: Certified Mail Receipt re: Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement, 6.10.15 court order upon U.S. Department of Health & Human Services and U.S. Attorney's Office on 06/26/15. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-0110SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Goldwater Institute: Certified Mail Receipt re: Scheduling Order upon U.S. Attorneys Office and U.S. Dept. of Health & Human Services on 06/24/15. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-0111SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Goldwater Institute: Affidavit of Service re: Scheduling Order upon John S. Leonardo, U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona on 06/18/15. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
2015-07-1012ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States Department of Health and Human Services.(Johns, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2015)
2015-09-0413NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-1014MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Goldwater Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
2015-09-1515ORDER: Application is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that attorney Courtney Van Cott will henceforth not be an attorney of record in this case and attorney Aditya Dynar will henceforth be an attorney of record in this case. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 09/14/2015. (REK) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-10-0216MOTION to Stay Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Requests for Admissions (Stipulated) by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johns, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
2015-10-0517ORDER granting 16 staying the due date to respond to Plaintiffs Request forAdmissions until after Defendant files its Motion for Summary Judgment in this action. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/5/2015.(TCA) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-10-0818STIPULATION TO REVISE SEQUENCE AND TIMING OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Johns, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
2015-10-0819ORDER granting 18 Stipulation : Defendant shall file its dispositive motion on or before November 24, 2015 and Plaintiff shall file its Response and any Cross-Motion on or before January 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/8/2015. (TCA) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
2015-11-2420MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Johns, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
2015-11-2421STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Johns, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
2015-11-2422MEMORANDUM in Support of 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Johns, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
2015-12-3023NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Peter M. Lantka appearing for United States Department of Health and Human Services. Attorney Michael A Johns terminated. . (Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
2016-01-0824*RESPONSE to Motion re: 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) *Modified to add Cross-Motion on 1/11/2016 (REK). (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-01-0825MEMORANDUM in Support of Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment 24 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-01-0826*STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 25 Memorandum, 24 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Goldwater Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 8)(Riches, Jonathan) *Modified to correct text on 1/11/2016 (REK). (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-01-0827RESPONSE re: 21 Statement of Facts by Plaintiff Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-01-1328MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Clint Bolick by Goldwater Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
2016-01-1429ORDER: The Court having considered Plaintiff's Application for Withdrawal of Clint Bolick as Counsel of Record, and good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the Application is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that attorney Clint Bolick will henceforth not be an attorney of record in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to make appropriate changes in the Court's CM/ECF System to reflect this change. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/14/2016. (REK) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
2016-01-2230* MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Page Consolidated In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment re: 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lantka, Peter) *Modified to add link on 1/25/2016 (REK). (Entered: 01/22/2016)
2016-01-2631ORDER: IT IS ORDERED granting in part and denying in part Defendant's Unopposed Motion to File 25-Page Consolidated Response/Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment 30 . Defendant's Response/Reply may not exceed 11 pages but Defendant may have until February 23, 2016 to file its Response/Reply [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/26/16.(MAW) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
2016-02-1132Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment By or Before March 15, 2016 by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-1233ORDER granting 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The United States' deadline to file a Consolidated Response/Reply in support if its Motion for Summary Judgment is extended to March 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/12/16.(MAW) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-03-1534* REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S 20 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Lantka, Peter) * Modified to correct document linkage on 3/16/2016 (LAD). (Entered: 03/15/2016)
2016-03-1535* RESPONSE to 24 Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lantka, Peter) * Modified to correct event and add document linkage; attorney noticed on 3/16/2016 (LAD). (Entered: 03/15/2016)
2016-06-1636ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying both Motions for Summary Judgment without prejudice to be resubmitted after the Vaughn index is filed (Docs. 21 & 24 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Defendant to file a Vaughn index within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 6/16/16.(MAW) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
2016-08-1237First MOTION for Extension of Time To File Vaughn Index By Seven Days (Unopposed) by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
2016-08-1738ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time. The United States' deadline to file a Vaughn Index is extended to August 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/17/16.(MAW) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-08-1939*Defendant's Submission of Third DECLARATION of Nancy B Sager with Vaughn Index, MOTION For Leave To File Under Seal The Fourth Declaration Of Nancy B. Sager For In Camera Review by United States Department of Health and Human Services . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lantka, Peter) *Modified to correct event and docket text on 8/22/2016 (REK). (Entered: 08/19/2016)
2016-09-0240RESPONSE in Opposition re: 39 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Goldwater Institute. (Dynar, Aditya) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
2016-09-0841*REPLY to Response to Motion re: 39 MOTION to Seal Document In Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal The Fourth Declaration of Nancy B. Sager for In Camera Review by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Lantka, Peter) *Modified to correct event on 9/9/2016 (REK). (Entered: 09/08/2016)
2016-10-1242NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Elizabeth Harwood on behalf of United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Harwood, Ann) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-2143ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying 39 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal the Fourth Declaration of Nancy B. Sager for In Camera Review [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/21/16.(MAW) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-2744NOTICE re: Notice of Filing by United States Department of Health and Human Services re: 43 Order on Motion to Seal Document, 36 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fourth Declaration of Nancy B. Sager and Supplemental Vaughn Index . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Harwood, Ann) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
2016-10-2845NOTICE re: Amended Notice of Filing Fourth Declaration of Nancy B. Sager and Supplemental Vaughn Index by United States Department of Health and Human Services . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Harwood, Ann) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
2017-03-2046STIPULATION Motion for Renewed Scheduling Order by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-2147ORDER granting 46 Stipulation for Renewed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff's Opening Brief to be filed by 6/2/2017 [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 3/21/17. (MAW) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-05-2548First MOTION for Extension of Time Modify Briefing Schedule (Unopposed) by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 05/25/2017)
2017-05-2649ORDER granting 48 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. The following deadlines shall govern the final briefing schedule for filing amended cross-motions for summary judgment, pursuant to this Court's June 16, 2016 Order: Plaintiff's Opening Brief June 19, 2017; Defendant's Response Brief / Cross-Motion August 3, 2017; Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion / Response to Cross-Motion August 24, 2017; Defendant's Reply in Support of Cross-Motion September 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/26/17.(MAW) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-1950MOTION for Summary Judgment by Goldwater Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-1951STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Goldwater Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-15)(Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
2017-06-2652MINUTE ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2017 at 01:30PM before Judge Susan R Bolton as to 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-08-0353*MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed), RESPONSE to 50 Motion for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Lantka, Peter) *Modified to add response portion on 8/4/2017 (REK). (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-0354STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed and In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Attachment 1)(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-0355*STATEMENT OF FACTS of Additional Material Not Genuinely in Dispute and Response to Plaintiff's Separate Statement of Facts, Submitted in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re: 51 State of Facts and 53 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Lantka, Peter) *Modified to add document link on 8/4/2017 (REK). (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-1156MINUTE ORDER: On the Court's own Motion, Motion Hearing is re-set from 10/2/2017 to 10/3/2017 at 11:15AM before Judge Susan R Bolton as to 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
2017-08-2457RESPONSE to Motion re: 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed and In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2458RESPONSE re: 54 Statement of Facts Not Genuinely in Dispute in Support of Defendant's Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2459RESPONSE re: 55 Statement of Facts Not Genuinely in Dispute, Submitted in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
2017-08-2960STIPULATION To Continue Oral Argument by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-3161ORDER granting 60 Stipulated Motion to Continue Oral Argument. Oral argument in this matter is rescheduled to Tuesday, October 10, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 8/31/17. (MAW) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-1362*REPLY to Response to Motion re: 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed and In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Lantka, Peter) *Modified to correct event on 9/14/2017 (REK). (Entered: 09/13/2017)
2017-10-0663NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Leslie Cohen appearing for United States Department of Health and Human Services. . (Cohen, Leslie) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
2017-10-1064MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2017. Argument held. IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement 50 Motion for Summary Judgment. APPEARANCES: Jonathan Riches and Aditya Dynar for Plaintiff. Leslie Cohen and Peter Lantka for Defendant. (Court Reporter Liz Lemke) Hearing held 9:01 AM to 9:31 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2017-10-2365TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Goldwater Institute for proceedings held on 10/10/2017, Judge Susan R Bolton hearing judge(s). (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2018-01-2466ORDER: IT IS ORDERED denying both Motions for Summary Judgment without prejudice (Docs. 50 & 53 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Defendant to file a revised, consolidated Vaughn index containing the additional information called for in this Order within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/24/18. (MAW) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
2018-02-1567First MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed Motion to Extend Dealine to File Vaughn Index by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 02/15/2018)
2018-02-1668ORDER granting 67 Motion to Extend Time to file a consolidated Vaughn index and that the deadline for Defendant to file its consolidated Vaughn index is extended through March 9, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 2/16/18. (MAW) (Entered: 02/16/2018)
2018-03-0869NOTICE re: of Filing the Sixth Declaration of Nancy B. Sager and Revised, Consolidated Vaughn Index by United States Department of Health and Human Services . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, Attachment A)(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-03-0870Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 69 Notice (Other) by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 03/08/2018)
2018-05-0171STIPULATION MOTION FOR RENEWED SCHEDULING ORDER by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-05-0172ORDER granting 71 Stipulation. The following deadlines shall govern the final briefing schedule for filing amended cross-motions for summary judgment, pursuant to this Court's January 24, 2018 Order: Plaintiff's Opening Brief due 6/29/2018; Defendant's Response Brief / Cross-Motion due 8/29/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 5/1/18. (MAW) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-06-2973Third MOTION for Summary Judgment by Goldwater Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-2974MEMORANDUM in Support of 73 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-06-2975STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 73 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment , 74 Memorandum by Plaintiff Goldwater Institute. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-20)(Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/29/2018)
2018-07-0276NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 73 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Goldwater Institute, 75 Statement of Facts filed by Goldwater Institute, 74 Memorandum filed by Goldwater Institute. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
2018-08-2977*MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) and RESPONSE in Opposition re: 73 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment by United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Lantka, Peter) *Modified on 8/30/2018 to correct motion event and to add Response (ATD). (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-08-2978STATEMENT OF FACTS re: 77 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Renewed) and Response in Opposition re: 73 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Lantka, Peter) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
2018-09-1179RESPONSE re: 78 Statement of Facts Not Genuinely in Dispute in Support of Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Goldwater Institute. (Dynar, Aditya) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
2018-10-1680MINUTE ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2018 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Susan R Bolton as to 73 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-1881MOTION to Continue oral argument by Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1882Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 81 MOTION to Continue oral argument Proposed Order by Plaintiff Goldwater Institute. (Riches, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/18/2018)
2018-10-1983ORDER granting 81 Motion to Continue Oral Argument and oral argument on the parties' third cross-motions for summary judgment is continued to December 4, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Senior Judge Susan R Bolton on 10/19/18. (MAW) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar