Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleADVOCATES FOR HIGHWAY AND AUTO SAFETY v. FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00920
Date Filed2015-06-16
Date Closed2015-08-25
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffADVOCATES FOR HIGHWAY AND AUTO SAFETY
Case DescriptionAdvocates for Highway and Auto Safety submitted a FOIA request to the Federal Highway Administration for records concerning the ET-Plus end terminal guardrail. Advocates also asked for a fee waiver. The agency granted a partial fee waiver and Advocates appealed that decision, which was upheld by the agency. Advocates then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantFEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-06-161COMPLAINT against FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4138107) filed by ADVOCATES FOR HIGHWAY AND AUTO SAFETY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons to FHWA, # 5 Summons to Attorney General)(Einspanier, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
2015-06-162Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADVOCATES FOR HIGHWAY AND AUTO SAFETY. (Einspanier, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
2015-06-16Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (rd) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
2015-06-163SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 06/16/2015)
2015-06-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/17/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/17/2015. (Einspanier, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
2015-06-235NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Kurdock on behalf of ADVOCATES FOR HIGHWAY AND AUTO SAFETY (Kurdock, Peter) (Main Document 5 replaced on 6/23/2015) (jf). (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-07-136NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Nicole Liaw on behalf of FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION (Liaw, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-07-137Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liaw, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/13/2015)
2015-07-16MINUTE ORDER granting 7 the government's consent motion for an enlargement of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The government is directed to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by no later than August 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on July 16, 2015. (lcegs1) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
2015-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 8/17/2015. (mac) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-08-138Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by FEDERAL HIGHWAY ADMINISTRATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Liaw, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
2015-08-13MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Defendant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer shall be filed no later than August 24, 2015. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 13, 2015. (lcegs4) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
2015-08-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer due by 8/24/2015 (tcr) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-08-249NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ADVOCATES FOR HIGHWAY AND AUTO SAFETY (Einspanier, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar