Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCODREA et al v. BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv00988
Date Filed2015-06-23
Date Closed2017-03-07
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffDAVID CODREA
PlaintiffLEN SAVAGE
PlaintiffFFL DEFENSE RESEARCH CENTER
Case DescriptionDavid Codrea, Len Savage, and the FFL Defense Research Center submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for various records pertaining to firearms. The agency failed to respond within the statutory time limits and the requesters filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [18]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-06-231COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4148401) filed by FFL DEFENSE RESEARCH CENTER, LEN SAVAGE, DAVID CODREA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Hardy, David) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-06-232LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FFL DEFENSE RESEARCH CENTER (Hardy, David) (Entered: 06/23/2015)
2015-06-23Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (rd) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-06-243SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
2015-06-294STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 29, 2015. (lcbah3) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
2015-08-035NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
2015-08-036ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
2015-08-177Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File status report by DAVID CODREA, FFL DEFENSE RESEARCH CENTER, LEN SAVAGE (Hardy, David) (Entered: 08/17/2015)
2015-08-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' 7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Status Report. Accordingly, the parties shall, by September 14, 2015, file a Joint Meet and Confer Report as directed in the Court's 4 Standing Order. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 18, 2015. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
2015-08-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 9/14/2015. (tg) (Entered: 08/18/2015)
2015-09-148Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File status report by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING nunc pro tunc the parties' 8 Joint Motion for Additional Extension of Time to File Status Report. The parties shall, by September 30, 2015, file a Joint Meet and Confer Report as directed in the Court's 4 Standing Order. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 15, 2015. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 9/30/2015. (tg) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-09-309MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
2015-10-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Meet and Confer Statement, the parties to file, by December 30, 2015, a Joint Meet and Confer Report as directed in the Court's 4 Standing Order, para. 3(b)(ii). Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 1, 2015. (lcbah3) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
2015-10-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 12/30/2015. (tg) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
2015-12-3010Joint STATUS REPORT by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
2015-12-3011Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Briefing Schedule by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
2016-01-04MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 and 11 Joint Status Report and Motion to Extend Time to File a Joint Meet and Confer Statement, the parties' request for an extension of time. The parties shall, by March 15, 2016, file a Joint Meet and Confer Report as directed in the Court's 4 Standing Order. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 4, 2016. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-01-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 3/15/2016. (tg) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-03-2812NOTICE Joint Meet and Confer Statement by DAVID CODREA, FFL DEFENSE RESEARCH CENTER, LEN SAVAGE (Hardy, David) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-03-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Meet and Confer Statement, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of proceedings in this matter: (1) the plaintiffs shall, by April 7, 2016, inform the defendant of any withholdings in dispute; (2) the defendant shall, by May 23, 2016, file a Vaughn index and any dispositive motion; (3) the plaintiffs shall, by June 22, 2016, respond to the defendant's dispositive motion; (4) the defendants shall, by July 11, 2016, file any reply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 29, 2016. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs to notify the defendant by 4/7/2016 of any withholdings in dispute; defendant's Vaughn Index and Dispositive Motion due by 5/23/2016; plaintiffs' Opposition to Dispositive Motion due by 6/22/2016; defendant's Reply due by 7/11/2016. (tg) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
2016-05-2313MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Attachments: # 1 Boucher Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
2016-06-2214RESPONSE re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAVID CODREA, FFL DEFENSE RESEARCH CENTER, LEN SAVAGE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's disclosures)(Hardy, David) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
2016-07-0615Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
2016-07-07MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The defendant shall, by July 19, 2016, file any reply in support of its 13 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 7, 2016. (lcbah3) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-07-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply in Support of its 13 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/19/2016. (tg) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
2016-07-1916REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES. (Attachments: # 1 Bennett Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2017-03-0717ORDER GRANTING the defendant's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to close this case. See Order for Further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 7, 2017. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-0718MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the defendant's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 7, 2017. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff