Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION v. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01125
Date Filed2015-07-15
Date Closed2016-10-25
JudgeJudge Gladys Kessler
PlaintiffDAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe Daily Caller News Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau for emails to or from Bureau personnel and two agency employees who were members of the union pertaining to political matters. At the request of the agency, the Daily Caller narrowed the scope of its request to 27 specific terms. The agency then told the Daily Caller that its request was too broad to be searched. The Daily Caller appealed the agency's decision, which was upheld. The Daily Caller then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-07-151COMPLAINT against CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4176016) filed by THE DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons US Attorney General, # 4 Summons CFPB)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by THE DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-15Case Assigned to Judge Gladys Kessler. (md) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-173SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-224RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/21/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/21/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU served on 7/20/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-08-205ANSWER to Complaint by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU.(Cohen, Bradley) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-206ORDER setting an Initial Scheduling Conference on September 10, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 8/20/15. (CL) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-20Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26A before Judge Gladys Kessler. (CL) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-09-047MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Cohen, Bradley) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-09MINUTE ORDER: The time for the Initial Scheduling Conference set for September 10, 2015, is hereby changed to 10:45 a.m. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/9/15. (CL) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
2015-09-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gladys Kessler: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 9/10/2015. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook) (tth) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
2015-09-118ORDER that Defendant shall file a Status Report on or before November 5, 2015, and shall provide the first production of documents on or before November 5, 2015. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on September 10, 2015. (lcgk2) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
2015-09-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/5/2015 (tth) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-11-059STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Cohen, Bradley) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-0610ORDER that the Parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than June 3, 2016, indicating whether further proceedings will be necessary and, if so, the Parties shall file a proposed schedule for such proceedings. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 11/6/15. (CL) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-11-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/3/2016 (CL). (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-12-0111NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Gerard Justin Cedrone on behalf of CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU Substituting for attorney Bradley Heath Cohen (Cedrone, Gerard) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
2016-06-0312Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Cedrone, Gerard) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-0613ORDER that the Parties shall file a further Joint Status Report, on or before June 28, 2016, informing the Court of the status of the Parties' discussions and proposing a schedule for further proceedings, if necessary. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/6/16. (CL) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/28/2016 (CL) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-2814Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Cedrone, Gerard) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-2815ORDER that the Parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report on or before July 19, 2016, informing the Court of the status of the Parties' discussions and proposing a schedule for summary judgment briefing, if necessary. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 6/28/16. (CL) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/19/2016 (CL). (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-07-1116NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by James O. Bickford on behalf of CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU Substituting for attorney Gerard J. Cedrone (Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
2016-07-1917Joint STATUS REPORT by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU. (Bickford, James) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-2518ORDER that this case shall follow the briefing schedule outlined herein (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/25/16. (CL) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-07-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2016. Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/28/2016. Reply to Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2016. Cross Motions due by 10/28/2016. Response to Cross Motions due by 12/2/2016. Reply to Cross Motions due by 12/16/2016. (CL) (Entered: 07/25/2016)
2016-09-3019Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-09-3020ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; the Parties shall proceed with summary judgment briefing as follows: Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due October 14, 2016; Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion are due November 11, 2016; Defendant's Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply in Support are due December 16, 2016; Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Cross-Motion is due January 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/30/16. (CL) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-09-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 11/11/2016. Response to Cross Motions due by 12/16/2016. Reply to Cross Motions due by 1/13/2017. Summary Judgment motions due by 10/14/2016. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/11/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/16/2016. (CL) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-1421Consent MOTION for Briefing Schedule Amendment by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-1422MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-1423Vaughn Index and Declaration from Bernard J. Barrett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit Vaughn Index)(Bickford, James) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-1724ORDER granting 21 Defendant's Consent Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule; the Parties shall proceed with summary judgment briefing on the schedule previously ordered, except that the scheduled cross-motions shall not address the document described in Defendant's motion, the cover email attaching it, or any other associated attached; Defendant shall file a Status Report on or before December 9, 2016, informing the Court of the status of negotiations related to the remaining document and, if necessary, proposing a schedule for summary judgment briefing on the document and those associated with it. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 10/17/16. (CL) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/9/2016 (CL) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-2425STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff