Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01128
Date Filed2015-07-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State concerning communications between State and the White House pertaining to photographs of Osama bin Laden on or about May 2, 2011. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after the agency failed to respond within the statutory time limits, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE The Executive Office, Office of the Legal Adviser
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-07-151COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4176085) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Department of State, # 3 Summons US Attorney for DC, # 4 Summons US Attorney General)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-152LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-15Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
2015-07-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 07/17/2015)
2015-07-224ENTERED IN ERROR.....RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/21/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/21/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 7/21/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) Modified on 7/23/2015 (jf). (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-07-225RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/21/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/20/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/21/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Cristina Rotaru)(Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
2015-07-316NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Frances Thurston on behalf of All Defendants (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 07/31/2015)
2015-08-197ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-248ORDER FOR MEET AND CONFER REPORT. Attorney Meet and Confer Conference by 9/15/2015. Meet & Confer Statement due by 9/29/2015. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/24/15. (mac) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
2015-09-039ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Thurston, Robin) Modified on 9/4/2015 (znmw). (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-04NOTICE OF ERROR re 9 Notice (Other); emailed to robin.f.thurston@usdoj.gov, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Please refile document, 3. Entered in error; Incorrect case number; Please refile. (znmw, ) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0410NOTICE (correcting case number) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0411NOTICE of Court Order by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-2912Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 09/29/2015)
2015-10-01MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposed schedule, as follows: (1) Defendant shall search hardcopy records and the "state.gov" email addresses of the individuals most likely to have responsive records to Plaintiff's request by no later than November 18, 2015; (2) the parties shall meet and confer thereafter to determine if any additional searches are necessary, including but not limited to, searches of any non-state.gov email correspondence in Defendant's possession; and (3) the parties shall file a joint status report proposing a schedule for future proceedings by no later than December 2, 2015. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on October 1, 2015. (lcegs4) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
2015-10-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2015. (mac) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
2015-12-0213Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Bekesha, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-09MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to comply with the following schedule: (1) no later than January 29, 2016, Defendant will conduct a search of records provided by former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton and will notify Plaintiff of the results; (2) no later than January 29, 2016, Defendant will either provide Plaintiff with a final determination with respect to the third responsive record or inform Plaintiff of the status of the inter-agency consultation; (3) no later than February 5, 2016, the parties will meet and confer regarding any outstanding issues; (4) no later than February 10, 2016, the parties shall file a joint status report updating the Court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 9, 2015. (lcegs4, ) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
2015-12-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement by 2/5/2016. Joint Status Report due by 2/10/2016. (mac) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2016-02-1014Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-03-0215Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-07MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the parties' agreement, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than one week following the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's proposed discovery schedule in Case No. 13-1363. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 7, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-05-1016Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
2016-05-25MINUTE ORDER directing Defendant to file its Motion for Summary Judgment no later than July 13, 2016. Plaintiff shall file its motion for discovery pursuant to Rule 56(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or its opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and cross motion for Summary Judgment no later than August 10, 2016. Defendant shall its opposition or reply no later than September 14, 2015. Plaintiff shall file any reply no later than September 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 25, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-05-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant To File Its Motion For Summary Judgment due by 7/13/2016. Plaintiff Motion For Discovery Pursuant To Rule 56(d) Of The Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure Or Its Opposition To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment And Cross Motion For Summary Judgment due by 8/10/2016. Defendant Opposition Or Reply due by 9/14/2016. Plaintiff Reply due by 9/28/2016. (mac) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-07-1317Joint MOTION to Vacate Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thurston, Robin) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
2016-08-01MINUTE ORDER granting the parties' joint motion to vacate the scheduling order. The parties shall submit an updated scheduling order within one week of the Court's ruling on Judicial Watch's motion for additional discovery in Civil No. 13-1363. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on August 1, 2016. (lcegs4) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-2618NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sam M. Singer on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Robin Thurston (Singer, Sam) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-2619Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singer, Sam) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-30MINUTE ORDER. In view of 19 Joint Status Report, Defendant shall complete its search of the materials provided by the FBI to the State Department by no later than September 30, 2016, and shall produce any non-exempt, responsive agency records to the Plaintiff by no later than October 14, 2016. The parties shall file a joint status report by no later than October 31, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/30/2016. (lcegs1) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
2016-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2016. (mac) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-10-3120Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Singer, Sam) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-01In view of 20 joint status report, the parties shall submit a further joint status report by no later than December 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/1/2016. (lcegs1) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/15/2016. (mac) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-12-1521Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Singer, Sam) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2017-02-13MINUTE ORDER. In view of 21 joint status report, the parties shall submit a joint proposal for further proceedings three weeks following the latter of (1) the Court's rulings on the two pending motions to compel additional discovery in Civil Action No. 13-1363, and (2) the completion of any additional discovery authorized as a result of those rulings. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/13/2017. (lcegs1) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2018-09-2422NOTICE of Appearance by Kari E. D'Ottavio on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 09/24/2018)
2018-10-0923NOTICE of Change of Address by Kari E. D'Ottavio (D'Ottavio, Kari) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar