Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFREEDOM WATCH, INC. v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01264
Date Filed2015-08-06
Date Closed2018-03-12
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffFREEDOM WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionFreedom Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning leaked information pertaining to the Benghazi attack and its aftermath. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Freedom Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [46]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Amit Mehta has barred Freedom Watch from challenging the Department of State's withholdings, searches, and segregability decisions pertaining to the majority of its 50-part request for records concerning former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton after Freedom Watch twice failed to meet and confer with the agency as ordered by the court. Freedom Watch ignored the first meeting, claiming later that it had no desire to narrow the issues in dispute. Mehta then ordered State to provide a Vaughn index so that Freedom Watch could review it and then meet with the agency. As to the second meeting, Mehta noted that "despite this straight forward directive, Plaintiff's counsel apparently viewed compliance as optional." Nearly a week after the deadline had expired for the second meeting, State's attorney reached out to Freedom Watch's attorney, who said he had not even looked at the Vaughn index and asked State to re-send it. State did so and tried to arrange a phone call three days later. Instead, Freedom Watch emailed State and told it that the agency had a pattern and practice of improperly withholding records during Clinton's tenure and that the court should either review the records in camera or allow Freedom Watch to take discovery. Fed up with Freedom Watch's behavior, Mehta noted that "Plaintiff's counsel's disregard of the court's orders in this case is remarkable. Counsel apparently thinks that meeting and conferring 'in good faith' means on whatever schedule is convenient for him and in whatever manner he so chooses. He also must believe that the court's orders do not place any real obligation on him, but instead present opportunities to take baseless potshots at opposing counsel. It takes real chutzpah to ignore the court's orders and, at the same time, to act the aggrieved party. One would think that, if counsel's objective is to convince this court that his opponent is acting in bad faith, he would hold himself to a higher standard. Apparently not." Mehta explained that he was reluctant to sanction Freedom Watch by dismissing the case and indicated instead that 'the lesser sanction chosen by the court " barring Plaintiff from challenging Defendant's withholdings, searches, and segregability determinations as to certain requests " is fair." He noted that the subject matter of those requests was being litigated by other plaintiffs as well and pointed out that "to the extent responsive, non-exempt materials are not already in the public domain, they surely will be at some point and thus available to Plaintiff. Consequently, Plaintiff's inability to press its own arguments as to those records does not substantially impair its interests but does relieve Defendant of re-litigating those issues in this case. In light of Plaintiff's counsel's conduct, that is a just outcome."
Issues: Litigation - Sanctions
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-08-061COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4201737) filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Notice to Counsel/Party Related Case Statement, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
2015-08-062NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. Case related to Case No. 14-cv-1431, 15-cv-345. (md) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-08-06Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (md) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-08-073SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-08-074STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 8/7/15. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 08/07/2015)
2015-09-175NOTICE of Appearance by John Kenneth Theis on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Theis, John) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-186RESPONSE re 2 Notice of Related Case filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Theis, John) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
2015-09-187First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Theis, John) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
2015-09-21MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that defendant has up to and including October 19, 2015 in which to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 9/21/15. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-09-228RESPONSE re 6 Response to Document filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
2015-10-199MOTION to Dismiss by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Theis, John) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-2110Case randomly reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Judge Richard J. Leon no longer assigned to the case as not related. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2015-11-0411Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/04/2015)
2015-11-05MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. On or before November 16, 2015, Plaintiff shall file an opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/05/2015. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response 9 to due by 11/16/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-11-1312Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION to Dismiss by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
2015-11-16MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before November 30, 2015. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/16/2015. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
2015-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to 9 due by 11/30/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
2015-11-3013Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint under FRCP Rule 12(b)(6) filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Moseley, Jonathon) Modified on 12/1/2015 (zrdj). (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-11-3014MEMORANDUM OF LAW re 13 Memorandum in opposition filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moseley, Jonathon) Modified on 12/1/2015 (zrdj). (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-12-1015REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Theis, John) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2016-01-1516NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Aimee Woodward Brown on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney John K. Theis (Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
2016-04-1417SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 9 MOTION to Dismiss in support of motion for discovery filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order by Judge Royce Lamberth, # 2 Exhibit Order by Judge Emmet Sullivan, # 3 Exhibit Response of Department of State)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-2818RESPONSE re 17 Supplemental Memorandum, Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/4/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-0319REPLY to Defendant's Response to Supplemental Memorandum filed by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
2016-05-04MINUTE ORDER: The parties are directed to meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report, on or before May 18, 2016, which addresses: (1) the enumerated items of Plaintiff's FOIA request as to which Defendant has previously produced or intends to produce records, and thus will not require Defendant to perform new searches; (2) a proposed schedule for Defendant's production to Plaintiff of records included in category (1) above; (3) the enumerated items of Plaintiff's FOIA request as to which Defendant will be required to perform a unique new search in order to identify and produce responsive records; (4) a proposed schedule, subject to Defendant's response to (5) below, for Defendant's searches and production of records included in category (3) above; and (5) whether, in light of the meet and confer, Defendant will persist with its 9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/04/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 5/4/2016. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (cdw) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
2016-05-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 5/18/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
2016-05-1320Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-16MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report, on or before May 25, 2016, which addresses the topics set out in the courts May 4, 2016, Minute Order. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/16/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-16Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/25/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-2521Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-05-26MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report, on or before May 27, 2016, which addresses the topics set out in the courts May 4, 2016, Minute Order. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/26/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/27/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-05-2722Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-05-3123ORDER setting a schedule for further proceedings in light of the parties' 22 May 27, 2016, Joint Status Report. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/31/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-0724Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-08MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Defendant Department of State's representations contained in the parties' 24 June 7, 2016, Joint Status Report, 9 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is hereby denied as moot. Additionally, given the length of time that has passed since the filing of 1 Plaintiff's Complaint, the court denies Defendant's request to delay the start of its searches for records responsive to the Unanswered Requests until after it has completed posting documents relevant to Plaintiff's remaining requests. In the Status Report due on July 1, 2016, in addition to "addressing the status of its public disclosure of records responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA requests regarding Benghazi (1-27; 37-38), and regarding the Clinton Foundation and former president Bill Clinton (34-35; 40-43)," ECF No. 23, Defendant shall provide an update as to its search efforts. The court will decide whether a telephonic status conference is required after receipt of that Status Report. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/08/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
2016-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 7/1/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
2016-07-0125STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-05MINUTE ORDER: Defendant Department of State shall submit a subsequent Status Report on or before August 5, 2016, updating the court as to (1) its posting of records responsive to the Clinton Foundation requests and any other requests, and (2) its search and production of records in response to the Unanswered Requests. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/05/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-07-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Department of State Subsequent Status Report due by 8/5/2016. (mac) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-08-0526STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
2016-08-08MINUTE ORDER: In light of 26 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before August 10, 2016, updating the court on the total number of documents responsive to the Unanswered Requests and providing an estimated date for completion of productions. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/08/2016. (lcapm3) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-08Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
2016-08-1027Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
2016-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/31/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-31Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 8/31/2016. Parties to submit a Status Report on 9/7/2016. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (cdw) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
2016-09-0128TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on August 31, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-20. Date of Issuance: September 1, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/22/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/2/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2016.(wz) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-0729Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
2016-09-16Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/22/2016 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 9/22/2016. (Court Reporter PATRICIA KANESHIRO-MILLER.) (mac) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
2016-09-23MINUTE ORDER: Per the Status Conference held on September 22, 2016, Defendant shall file a status report no later than September 29, 2016, which updates the court on: (1) the total number of documents and pages that Defendant has processed in connection with Plaintiff's FOIA Requests Nos. 44-47, and (2) the total number of such documents and pages that Defendant actually has produced to Plaintiff to date. Additionally, Defendant shall determine and report on how many of the 20,000 documents potentially responsive to Requests Nos. 44-47 are not duplicative of (1) documents already made available to Plaintiff in this case (such as the former Secretary's emails) or (2) documents made publicly available as a result of other FOIA requests. It is further ordered that Defendant shall increase its processing of responsive records to 500 pages per month. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/23/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-23Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 9/29/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-2930STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-10-2631TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amit P. Mehta held on September 22, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-16. Date of Issuance:October 26, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court r eporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/16/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2017.(pk) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-31Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/3/2016 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-03Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 11/9/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
2016-11-0732MOTION for Discovery by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-11-14Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 11/23/2016 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
2016-11-2133Memorandum in opposition to re 32 MOTION for Discovery filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-23MINUTE ORDER: Per the Status Conference held on November 23, 2016, the parties shall file a status report no later than December 7, 2016, advising the court whether the parties have agreed to narrow FOIA Requests 44 and 46 and, if not, providing a proposed schedule from Defendant. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/23/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2016-11-23Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 12/7/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2016-11-23Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 11/23/2016. (Court Reporter: Scott Wallace) (cdw) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-12-0734Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-13MINUTE ORDER: In light of 34 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before March 13, 2017. Defendant shall release documents on a monthly basis as its review for relevancy and exemptions is completed. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/13/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/13/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2017-03-1335Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13MINUTE ORDER: In light of 35 the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a subsequent Joint Status Report on or before June 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/13/2017. (lcapm2) (Entered: 03/13/2017)
2017-03-13Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/12/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-06-1236STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Brown, Aimee) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-1237STATUS REPORT by FREEDOM WATCH, INC.. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
2017-06-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon completion of Defendant's review and processing of potentially responsive material, but in no event later than August 23, 2016, the parties shall meet and confer to discuss how they wish to proceed in this matter, including whether summary judgment briefing will be required. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than August 30, 2017, that sets forth the parties' positions as to future proceedings and, if necessary, a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/13/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-06-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
2017-08-3038NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-08-3039STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
2017-09-0140ORDER: In light of 39 Defendant's Status Report, the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 15, 2017. See the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/01/2017. (lcapm2) Modified on 9/1/2017 (zcdw). (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2017-09-1441Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-11-02MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a status hearing in this matter on November 8, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. In the event counsel or a party is unable to appear on the scheduled date and time due to an unresolvable scheduling conflict, counsel shall meet and confer and provide, via email, two alternative dates and times to the Courtroom Deputy Clerk, Ms. Chashawn White (Chashawn_White@dcd.uscourts.gov), who shall reset the status hearing and provide notice to the parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/02/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/8/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
2017-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 11/17/2017 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-1442MOTION to Continue SCHEDULING CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET FOR 3:00 PM ON NOVEMBER 17 TO EARLIER IN THE MORNING OF THE SAME DAY by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
2017-11-15MINUTE ORDER granting 42 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. In light of Plaintiff's counsel's stated conflict, the conference scheduled for November 17, 2017, at 3:00 pm, is hereby vacated. The court, however, is unavailable at an earlier time on that date. The parties therefore shall meet and confer and propose two times on which they are available on either November 20 or 21, 2017, to Courtroom Deputy Ms. Chashawn White (Chashawn_White@dcd.uscourts.gov), who shall reset the conference and provide notice to the parties. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/15/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 11/21/2017 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-2143ORDER. Pursuant to the discussion at the Status Conference held on this date, the court orders the following: (1) the Defendant shall produce, no later than December 21, 2017, Vaughn indices to Plaintiff, and shall file notice to the court of its production on this date; (2) Plaintiff's counsel shall review the Vaughn indices within 21 days; (3) no later than 7 days after Plaintiff's counsel has completed review of the indices, the parties shall meet and confer in accordance with the courts September 1, 2017 40 Order; and (4) after the parties have met and conferred, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than January 23, 2018, with the court. See the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/21/2017. (lcapm3) (Entered: 11/21/2017)
2017-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's notice to the Court due by 12/21/2017. Joint Status Report due by 1/23/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 11/22/2017)
2017-12-2144NOTICE of Service of Vaughn Indexes by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2018-01-2245Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Feldon, Gary) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-02-2146MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER imposing sanction on Plaintiff. Plaintiff is barred from challenging Defendant's withholdings, searches, and segregability determinations as to certain items of Plaintiff's FOIA request. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/21/2018. (lcapm3) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
2018-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/9/2018. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
2018-03-0947NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Klayman, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar