Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEATON v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01322
Date Filed2015-08-14
Date Closed2015-12-28
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffJOSHUA EATON
Case DescriptionJoshua Eaton, a freelance journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning First Unitarian Church of Los Angeles. The agency acknowledged receipt of his request and separated the request into three separate requests based on the categories of records he was seeking. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Eaton filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-08-141COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4210733) filed by JOSHUA EATON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summonses for FBI, USAO, US AG, # 3 Exhibit Plaintiff Exhibits 1 - 12)(English, Alexander) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-08-14Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (sth) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-08-142SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 08/14/2015)
2015-08-283RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/19/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail/Return Receipt for FBI)(English, Alexander) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-08-284RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail/Return Receipt for Attorney General)(English, Alexander) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-08-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/18/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/17/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail/Return Receipt for US Attorney)(English, Alexander) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
2015-09-166Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension Of Time In Which To File Its Answer 6 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before October 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on September 22, 2015. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
2015-09-23Set/Reset Deadline: Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before 10/21/2015. (kt) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
2015-10-217ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2015-10-22MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties appear for a status conference on November 2, 2015, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/22/2015. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
2015-10-22Set/Reset Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 11/2/2015, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
2015-11-02Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 11/2/2015. Status Conference set for 12/2/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter Jeff Hook.) (dot) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
2015-12-02Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 12/2/2015. Oral motion by Defendant for extension of time to answer, HEARD and GRANTED; Defendant has 30 days to answer. Parties are close to settlement, and will be filing a stipulation of settlement. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook). (kt) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-238STIPULATION of Settlement by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Kelly, Wynne) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
2015-12-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Stipulation of Settlement 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/28/2015. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff