Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleElectronic Frontier Foundation v. Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2015cv03791
Date Filed2015-08-19
Date Closed2018-08-03
JudgeMagistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte
PlaintiffElectronic Frontier Foundation
Case DescriptionThe Electronic Frontier Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning updates to the capabilities of CODIS, which stores DNA profiles from across the country in a series of local, state and national databases, from 2012 to the present. The FBI broke up EFF's multi-part request into four separate requests and indicated that it was unable to find any records. EFF appealed the decision to the Office of Information Policy, but after hearing nothing further substantively about its appeal, EFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-08-191COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9769431.). Filed byElectronic Frontier Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/19/2015) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-192Proposed Summons. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/19/2015) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-193Certificate of Interested Entities by Electronic Frontier Foundation (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/19/2015) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-194Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-195Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/10/2015. Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2015 10:00 AM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-196Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
2015-08-207CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Frontier Foundation.. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/20/2015) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-318SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by Electronic Frontier Foundation. Department of Justice served on 8/20/2015, answer due 10/19/2015. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/31/2015) Modified on 9/1/2015 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/31/2015)
2015-09-179STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS INITIAL RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO BE FILED AND SERVED filed by Department of Justice. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/17/2015) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-1810ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 9 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant's Initial Responsive pleading to be Filed and Served. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
2015-10-2711ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
2015-10-2712NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/27/2015) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
2015-10-2813ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Thursday, November 5, 2015, at 3:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2015) (Entered: 10/28/2015)
2015-10-2914STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Department of Justice. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/29/2015) (Entered: 10/29/2015)
2015-10-3015ANSWER to Complaint For Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act byDepartment of Justice. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 10/30/2015) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-10-3016STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 14 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2015) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
2015-11-05ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 11/5/2015 with Tamara Lange. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-12-0817CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Justice. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/8/2015) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2015-12-0818CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Justice.. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/8/2015) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2015-12-0819CLERK'S NOTICE: The Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 2/23/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. An updated Case Management Statement is due by 2/16/2016. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2015) (Entered: 12/08/2015)
2016-02-1020STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Department of Justice. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 2/10/2016) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-1121STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 20 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2016) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-2322CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/23/2016) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
2016-03-0123Minute Entry for case management conference held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/1/2016. Counsel shall file a document that relates to Defendant's second production of documents by 3/2/16. FTR Time: 10:12 - 10:15 Plaintiff Attorney: Jennifer Lynch Defendant Attorney Jonathan Lee This is a text only Minute Entry (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2016) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-0224STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/2/2016) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-0325STIPULATION AND ORDER Setting Production and Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting as modified 24 Stipulation.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-07-2226STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/22/2016) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2627STIPULATOIN AND ORDER to Extend Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule and Continue Hearing Date by 14 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 26 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
2016-08-0928MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant Department of Justice's Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment or In The Alternative Motion to Stay filed by United States Department of Justice. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 9/6/2016. Replies due by 10/4/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan U. Lee, # 2 Declaration of David M. Harvey, # 3 Exhibit A - U for Harvey Declaration)(Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/9/2016) (Entered: 08/09/2016)
2016-08-2529NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Ellen London (London, Ellen) (Filed on 8/25/2016) (Entered: 08/25/2016)
2016-08-2630STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation. (Lynch, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/26/2016) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-2931STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing for 14 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 30 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-09-0132CLERK'S NOTICE: The hearing on Defendant's motion for summary judgment is rescheduled to 11/1/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-1933STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Summary Judgment Briefing filed by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 9/19/2016) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-2034STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing for 10 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte:granting 33 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-3035STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by United States Department of Justice. (London, Ellen) (Filed on 9/30/2016) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
2016-10-0336Notice of Withdrawal of Pending Summary Judgment 28 Motion ; (London, Ellen) (Filed on 10/3/2016) Modified on 10/4/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2016-10-0337STIPULATION AND ORDER for Production of Documents and Stay of Summary Judgment Briefing signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 35 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016) (Entered: 10/03/2016)
2017-08-2938NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jonathan Unruh Lee (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/29/2017) (Entered: 08/29/2017)
2017-08-3139STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Set Briefing Schedule filed by United States Department of Justice. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/31/2017) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
2017-09-0140STIPULATION AND ORDER to Set Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 39 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) (Entered: 09/01/2017)
2018-01-1641STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Briefing Schedule filed by United States Department of Justice. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/16/2018) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-1742STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Briefing Schedule signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 41 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018) (Entered: 01/17/2018)
2018-01-2243ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION (Motion to Stay) filed by United States Department of Justice. Responses due by 1/26/2018. (Lee, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/22/2018) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
2018-01-2344ORDER Denying Defendant's Administrative Motion to Stay Case as Moot by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 43 Motion. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2018) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
2018-03-2045NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Rebecca Ann Falk (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/20/2018) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-03-2246STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Amend Briefing Schedule filed by United States Department of Justice. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 3/22/2018) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
2018-03-2647MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND BRIEFING SCHEDULED by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 46 Stipulation. Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 5/31/2018. Plaintiff's opposition and/or Cross Motions due by 7/2/2018. Defendant's Reply and/or opposition due by 8/3/2018. Plaintiff's reply due by 8/17/2018. Cross-Motion(s) Hearing set for 10/2/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018) (Entered: 03/26/2018)
2018-05-0848STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Amend Briefing Schedule filed by United States Department of Justice. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 5/8/2018) (Entered: 05/08/2018)
2018-05-1049STIPULATION AND ORDER to Amend Briefing Schedule by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 48 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) (Entered: 05/10/2018)
2018-07-3150STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION RE SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF FOIA CLAIMS WITH THE EXCEPTION OF ATTORNEYS FEES; [PROPOSED ORDER] filed by United States Department of Justice. (Falk, Rebecca) (Filed on 7/31/2018) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
2018-08-0251ORDER granting Stipulation Re Settlement and Dismissal with Prejudice of FOIA Claims with the Exception of Attorney's Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting 50 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar