Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBAUER v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01349
Date Filed2015-08-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffSHANE BAUER
Case DescriptionShane Bauer, an investigative reporter, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Corrections Corporation of America, a company that operates prison facilities. Bauer also requested a fee waiver. The FBI separated Bauer's multi-part request into a number of separate requests. The agency indicated that it could not find records for some parts of Bauer's request and Bauer appealed those responses. The agency finally told Bauer that there were 36,500 pages of responsive records and that he would need to pay $1,090 in duplication costs. Bauer then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-08-201COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4216871) filed by SHANE BAUER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-20Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (rd) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
2015-08-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Notice of Consent)(rd) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
2015-09-023RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/21/2015, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08/21/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/21/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/20/2015.) (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
2015-09-024NOTICE of Appearance by Rhonda Lisa Campbell on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
2015-09-155Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-10-15MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant's answer will be due October 21, 2015. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/15/15. (lccrc1) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
2015-10-216ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2016-01-07MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint an an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by January 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/7/16. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
2016-01-217Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Schedule by SHANE BAUER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
2016-01-28MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties' joint status report and proposed schedule be due February 5, 2016. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/28/16. (lccrc1) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-02-058Joint MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Campbell, Rhonda) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-0510Joint STATUS REPORT by SHANE BAUER, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE; (See docket entry no. 8 to view document.) (td) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-089ORDER granting 8 Joint Motion to Stay proceedings until February 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/8/16. (lccrc1) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff