Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. Department of Defense et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2015cv06979
Date Filed2015-09-03
Date Closed2016-02-08
JudgeJudge Paul A. Engelmayer
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffCharlie Savage
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Charlie Savage submitted FOIA requests to a number of agencies for records concerning Executive Order 12333, which regulates intelligence activities in the executive branch. All the agencies acknowledged receipt of Savage's request, but after none of them had responded, he filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Defense
DefendantDepartment of Defense
TERMINATED: 02/08/2016
DefendantNational Security Agency
DefendantNational Security Agency
TERMINATED: 02/08/2016
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
TERMINATED: 02/08/2016
DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantDepartment of Justice
TERMINATED: 02/08/2016
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
TERMINATED: 02/08/2016
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
TERMINATED: 02/08/2016
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-09-031COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11350355)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage.(Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-032CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-033RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company.(Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-034REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Defense, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-035REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-036REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-037REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-038REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-039REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Charlie Savage, The New York Times Company. (Kutner, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/03/2015)
2015-09-0410ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Defense. (rch) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0411ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Security Agency. (rch) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0412ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (rch) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0413ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice. (rch) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0414ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (rch) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-0415ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency. (rch) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-04CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (rch) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-04Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. (rch) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-09-04Case Designated ECF. (rch) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
2015-10-0516LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 10/5/15. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-10-0617ORDER granting 16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re: 1 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Central Intelligence Agency answer due 11/12/2015; Department of Defense answer due 11/12/2015; Department of Justice answer due 11/12/2015; Federal Bureau of Investigation answer due 11/12/2015; National Security Agency answer due 11/12/2015; Office of the Director of National Intelligence answer due 11/12/2015. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/6/2015) (kl) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
2015-11-1018JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 11/10/15. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-1119ORDER granting 18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. GRANTED. Defendants' time to respond to the complaint is hereby extended to December 14, 2015. SO ORDERED. Central Intelligence Agency answer due 12/14/2015; Department of Defense answer due 12/14/2015; Department of Justice answer due 12/14/2015; Federal Bureau of Investigation answer due 12/14/2015; National Security Agency answer due 12/14/2015; Office of the Director of National Intelligence answer due 12/14/2015. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/11/2015) (kko) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
2015-12-1020LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 12/10/15. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-1021ORDER granting 20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted. SO ORDERED. Central Intelligence Agency answer due 1/13/2016; Department of Defense answer due 1/13/2016; Department of Justice answer due 1/13/2016; Federal Bureau of Investigation answer due 1/13/2016; National Security Agency answer due 1/13/2016; Office of the Director of National Intelligence answer due 1/13/2016. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/10/2015) (kl) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2016-01-1122LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 1/11/16. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Barnea, Jean-David) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
2016-01-1223ORDER granting 22 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from AUSA Jean-David Barnea dated 1/11/16. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Granted. So ordered. Central Intelligence Agency answer due 2/12/2016; Department of Defense answer due 2/12/2016; Department of Justice answer due 2/12/2016; Federal Bureau of Investigation answer due 2/12/2016; National Security Agency answer due 2/12/2016; Office of the Director of National Intelligence answer due 2/12/2016. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/12/2016) (rjm) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
2016-02-0824NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charlie Savage. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0825NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiffs The New York Times Company and Charlie Savage hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed without prejudice against all Defendants. Granted. Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency and Department of Defense terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/8/2016) (kl) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff