Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBristow First Assembly of God et al v. BP p.l.c. et al
DistrictNorthern District of Oklahoma
CityTulsa
Case Number4:2015cv00523
Date Filed2015-09-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Terence Kern
PlaintiffBristow First Assembly of God
PlaintiffMark S Evans individually, and as parent and next of kin to C.J.E. and B.K.E., minor children
- CJE
- BKE
PlaintiffChristina J Evans individually, and as parent and next of kin to C.J.E. and B.K.E., minor children
- CJE
- BKE
Case DescriptionThis is not a FOIA suit.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantBP p.l.c.
DefendantMarathon Oil Corporation
DefendantMarathon Petroleum Corporation
DefendantKinder Morgan, Inc.
DefendantWendell Sandlin
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantWendell Sandlin terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantBolin Oil Company a Partnership comprised of
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantBolin Oil Company a Partnership comprised of, terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantDH Bolin
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantDH Bolin terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantDP Bolin
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantDP Bolin terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantRL Bowlin
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantRL Bowlin terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantCW Bolin
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantCW Bolin terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantCW Stradley
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantCW Stradley terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantBilly Joe Bennett
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantBilly Joe Bennett terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantPeggy L Bennett
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantPeggy L Bennett terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantLiberty National Bank
formerly known as Chickasha Bank of Chickasha
DefendantLiberty National Bank
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
formerly known as Chickasha Bank of Chickasha
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantCP Mercer
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantCP Mercer terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantM Aline Mercer their subsidiaries, heirs, estates, successors, executors and assigns of the named persons and entities
TERMINATED: 09/28/2016
DefendantM Aline Mercer their subsidiaries, heirs, estates, successors, executors and assigns of the named persons and entities, terminated by Order at dkt #[66] on 9/28/16; unterminated by Amended Complaint dkt #[68]
DefendantChickasha Bank of Chickasha
DefendantChickasha Bank of Chickasha
Horace Lamar McKay
Documents
Docket
Opinion/Order [66]
Complaint
Opinion/Order [144]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-06-24PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Mark S Evans, Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-141CIVIL COVER SHEET by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-142NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Creek County, Bristow Division, case number CJ-2015-00016 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number 1085-1500175) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-143STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-144ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Sherry-Fischer on behalf of Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-145ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Larry D Ottaway on behalf of Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Ottaway, Larry) (Entered: 09/14/2015)
2015-09-156MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Bristow First Assembly of God and Kinder Morgan, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-09-157MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing BP p.l.c., Marathon Oil Corporation and Marathon Petroleum Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-09-158MOTION to Dismiss Party Kinder Morgan, Inc. by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) Modified on 10/28/2015 - STRICKEN per 53 (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-09-159BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kinder Morgan, Inc. ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. ; (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
2015-09-1610CERTIFICATE by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-1611SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Stacy L Acord on behalf of BP p.l.c. (Acord, Stacy) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-1612Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by BP p.l.c. (Acord, Stacy) Modified on 9/17/2015 to correct event (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-1613SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Archer Scott McDaniel on behalf of BP p.l.c. (McDaniel, Archer) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-1614CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Other Affiliate: JP Morgan Chase) by BP p.l.c. (Acord, Stacy) Modified on 9/17/2015 to add other affiliate (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-1615SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Miranda Rachelle Calhoun on behalf of BP p.l.c. (Calhoun, Miranda) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
2015-09-1716MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendant BP has until October 5, 2015 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Petition/Complaint ; granting 12 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: 2 Notice of Removal ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-17NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event (Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s)); Correction: corrected event (Motion for Extension of Time to Answer) (Re: 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-1717CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
2015-09-1818ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kenneth H Blakley on behalf of Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
2015-09-1819Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or otherwise Plead (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
2015-09-2120MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Marathon Defendants have until 10/05/15 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Petition/Complaint ; granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: 2 Notice of Removal ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
2015-09-2221CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
2015-09-2222CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marathon Oil Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
2015-09-2323Supplemental CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent BlackRock, Inc. for Marathon Oil Corporation) by Marathon Oil Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
2015-10-0524ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-10-0525ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Marathon Oil Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-10-0526MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Brief in Support by BP p.l.c. (With attachments) (McDaniel, Archer) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
2015-10-0627SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Micheal L Darrah on behalf of Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
2015-10-0628SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Ervin Edd Pritchett, Jr on behalf of Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (Pritchett, Ervin) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
2015-10-0629RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kinder Morgan, Inc. ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans ; (With attachments) (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
2015-10-0930ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall Gene Vaughan on behalf of RL Bowlin (Vaughan, Randall) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
2015-10-0931Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by RL Bowlin (Vaughan, Randall) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
2015-10-0932ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Mitchener, III on behalf of RL Bowlin (Mitchener, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2015)
2015-10-1333ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendant, Estate of R.L. Bolin, Deceased is granted an extension of time to answer the Petition until 10 days after the Court rules on the remand issue or the pending Motion to Dismiss, whichever last occurs ; granting 31 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
2015-10-1434NOTICE of Party Name Correction by RL Bowlin (Vaughan, Randall) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-10-1435ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Louis Randolph, Jr on behalf of RL Bowlin (Randolph, John) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-10-1436MOTION to Remand by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (With attachments) (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
2015-10-1537MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Re: 36 MOTION to Remand ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (With attachments) (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
2015-10-1638MOTION for Attorney(s) Ross A. Lewin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1513397) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
2015-10-1639MOTION for Attorney(s) Bonnie A. Barnett to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1513422) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
2015-10-1640MOTION for Attorney(s) P. Leigh Bausinger to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 1085-1513425) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 10/16/2015)
2015-10-1941MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - re: attorney Ross A. Lewin ; granting 38 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-1942MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - re: attorney Bonnie Allyn Barnett ; granting 39 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-1943MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - re: attorney P. Leigh Bausinger ; granting 40 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-1944Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kinder Morgan, Inc. ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-1945SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Jandra Susanne Jorgenson on behalf of Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (Jorgenson, Jandra) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-1946MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Replies due by 10/27/2015); granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kinder Morgan, Inc. ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-1947SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Robert Allan DeVore on behalf of Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (DeVore, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-2048MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; granting 37 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2015-10-2149NOTICE of Supplemental Authority to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Re: 36 MOTION to Remand ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2015-10-2650MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) (Re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kinder Morgan, Inc. ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) Modified on 10/27/2015 to correct event (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-10-2651MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer Petition (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-10-2652RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 26 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Brief in Support ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans ; (With attachments) (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-10-27NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event (Notice (Other)); Correction: corrected event (Motion to Withdraw Document(s)) (Re: 50 MOTION to Withdraw Document(s) ) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
2015-10-2753MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Striking Doc. 8 ; striking/withdrawing document(s); granting 50 Motion to Withdraw Documents(s) (Re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kinder Morgan, Inc. ) (Documents Terminated: 8 MOTION to Dismiss Party Kinder Morgan, Inc. ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
2015-10-2754MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendant Kinder Morgan has until November 16, 2015 to answer or otherwise respond to the Petition ; granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (vah, Chambers) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
2015-11-0455RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 36 MOTION to Remand ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. ; (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) Modified on 11/6/2015 to seal exhibit 8 as it was filed unredacted; counsel will file the redacted version using the Errata/Correction event (sc, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 11/04/2015)
2015-11-0656ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: 55 Response in Opposition to Motion, ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
2015-11-0957REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 26 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Brief in Support ) by BP p.l.c. ; (Acord, Stacy) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
2015-11-1658ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
2015-11-1859REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 36 MOTION to Remand ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans ; (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
2016-04-0160SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Melissa Ann East on behalf of BP p.l.c. [Note: Attorney Melissa Ann East added to party BP p.l.c.(pty:dft).] (East, Melissa) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
2016-05-1361ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/13/2016) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
2016-05-2362NOTICE of Matter Under Advisement by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (DeVore, Robert) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
2016-05-2663ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lane Rudder Neal on behalf of Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans [Note: Attorney Lane Rudder Neal added to party Bristow First Assembly of God(pty:pla), Attorney Lane Rudder Neal added to party Christina J Evans(pty:pla), Attorney Lane Rudder Neal added to party Mark S Evans(pty:pla).] (Neal, Lane) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-06-1364Joint JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (DeVore, Robert) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-08-2365NOTICE of Matter Under Advisement (Re: 36 MOTION to Remand ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (DeVore, Robert) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-09-2866OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss; denying 36 Motion to Remand (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-2967ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/12/2016) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-10-1268AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Mark S Evans, Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans (Darrah, Micheal) Modified on 10/12/2016 to correct who amended complaint is against (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-12NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong against party selected; Correction: edited docket text to reflect who amended complaint is against (Re: 68 Amended Complaint, ) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-1269JOINT STATUS REPORT by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
2016-10-1870MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern referring the Joint Status Report to Magistrate Judge McCarthy to conduct a scheduling conference and enter a scheduling order , referring for a scheduling conference to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: 69 Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2016-10-2071MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): Parties are directed to submit a Joint Proposed Case Management Plan by 11/21/2016 ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 11/21/2016) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-2172Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Re: 68 Amended Complaint, ) by BP p.l.c., Kinder Morgan, Inc., Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-2173ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendants have until 11/7/2016 to file an answer or respond to Amended Complaint. ; granting 72 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
2016-10-2574SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Rhiannon Kay Baker on behalf of BP p.l.c. [Note: Attorney Rhiannon Kay Baker added to party BP p.l.c.(pty:dft).] (Baker, Rhiannon) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-2575MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Miranda R. Calhoun by BP p.l.c. (McDaniel, Archer) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
2016-10-2676MOTION to Reconsider (Re: 66 Opinion and Order, Ruling on Motion to Dismiss, Ruling on Motion to Remand ) by BP p.l.c. (McDaniel, Archer) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-2677MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Motion to Withdraw Attorney Miranda R. Calhoun as counsel of record for Defendant BP p.l.c. (Doc. 75) is granted. ; terminating attorney Miranda Rachelle Calhoun ; granting 75 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-11-0478MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint by BP p.l.c. (McDaniel, Archer) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-0479Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BP p.l.c. (With attachments) (McDaniel, Archer) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-0780MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-11-0781Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-11-0782BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: 81 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. ; (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-11-0783Partial MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint And Brief In Support by Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
2016-11-1584ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jordyn L Cartmell on behalf of Kinder Morgan, Inc. [Note: Attorney Jordyn L Cartmell added to party Kinder Morgan, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Cartmell, Jordyn) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-1585Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: 78 MOTION to Strike, 79 MOTION to Dismiss, 80 MOTION to Strike, 81 MOTION to Dismiss, 83 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint And Brief In Support ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (DeVore, Robert) Modified on 11/16/2016 to change prefix text and add links 78-81 (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2016-11-16NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: not all links were not created; Correction: created additional links to 78 , 79 , 80 and 81 (Re: 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion ) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-1686RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 76 MOTION to Reconsider ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans ; (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-1687MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond [Doc. 85] is granted. Responses are due 12/12/2016 and replies are due 12/27/2016. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 12/12/2016, Replies due by 12/27/2016); granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: 80 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint , 81 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 79 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 83 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint And Brief In Support , 78 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
2016-11-2188NOTICE Joint Case Management Plan by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (DeVore, Robert) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-2189NOTICE Defendants' Proposed Case Management Plan by BP p.l.c., Kinder Morgan, Inc., Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
2016-11-2890MOTION to Strike Document(s) (Re: 89 Notice (Other) ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (DeVore, Robert) (Entered: 11/28/2016)
2016-11-2991REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 76 MOTION to Reconsider ) by BP p.l.c. ; (With attachments) (McDaniel, Archer) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
2016-12-0592MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Courtroom #2, Third Floor) , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2016 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-0593MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: 90 MOTION to Strike Document(s) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
2016-12-0694MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Cartmell, Jordyn) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-0695MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: 94 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
2016-12-0796ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting 94 Motion for Leave to Appear (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-0997RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 90 MOTION to Strike Document(s) ) by BP p.l.c., Kinder Morgan, Inc., Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation ; (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-1298RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 83 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans ; (DeVore, Allan) Modified on 12/13/2016 to change link (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-1299RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 81 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 83 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint And Brief In Support , 79 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans ; (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-13100MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy: Scheduling Conference held on 12/13/2016 ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); denying 90 Motion to Strike Document(s) (Court Reporter: C2) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/13/2016)
2016-12-14101SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 4/30/2018, Dispositive Motions due by 5/14/2018, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 10/15/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/14/2016)
2016-12-15102Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: 81 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 83 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint And Brief In Support , 80 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint , 79 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 78 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint ) by BP p.l.c., Kinder Morgan, Inc., Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-15103MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery by Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/15/2016)
2016-12-16104MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Briefs (Doc. 102) is GRANTED. Defendants' Reply Briefs to Motions to Strike Portions of the Amended Complaint (Docs. 78, 80) and Partial Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 79, 81, 83) are due no later than 1/6/2017. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Replies due by 1/6/2017); granting 102 Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Motion Response (Re: 80 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint , 81 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 79 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 83 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint And Brief In Support , 78 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-16105MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: 103 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
2016-12-19106RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 103 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Set of Discovery ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans ; (DeVore, Allan) (Entered: 12/19/2016)
2016-12-22107MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Brief to Plaintiffs' Response and Objection to Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss (Re: 99 Response in Opposition to Motion, ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (With attachments) (Darrah, Micheal) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-22108MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Brief to Their Response and Objection to Defendants' Partial Motions to Dismiss (Doc. 107) is granted. Supplemental Brief to Partial Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 79,81,83) shall not exceed five (5) pages. ; granting 107 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (Re: 81 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 83 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint And Brief In Support , 79 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2016-12-22109Supplemental BRIEF in Opposition of Motion (Re: 81 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , 83 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint And Brief In Support , 79 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans ; (With attachments) (Darrah, Micheal) Modified on 12/27/2016 to edit text to reflect this Brief is in opposition (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 12/22/2016)
2017-01-06110REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 78 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint ) by BP p.l.c. ; (McDaniel, Archer) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06111REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 79 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by BP p.l.c. ; (With attachments) (McDaniel, Archer) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06112REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 80 MOTION to Strike Portions of Amended Complaint ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. ; (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06113REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 81 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. ; (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-06114REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: 83 Partial MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint And Brief In Support ) by Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation ; (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
2017-01-30115MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; finding as moot 103 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-03-21116NOTICE of Defendant Kinder Morgan, Inc.'s Intent to Serve Subpoena Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(b)(1) to The Oklahoma District Council of the Assemblies of God of the State of Oklahoma by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) Modified on 3/22/2017; this is a discovery document and pursuant to FRCP 5(d)(1) and Local Rule 26.3, discovery material is not to be filed (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-21117NOTICE of Defendant Kinder Morgan, Inc.'s Intent to Serve Subpoena Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(b)(1) to Erin E. Brockovich, Robert W. Bowcock, and Integrated Resource Management, Inc. by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) Modified on 3/22/2017; this is a discovery document and pursuant to FRCP 5(d)(1) and Local Rule 26.3, discovery material is not to be filed (srt, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-22NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: these are discovery documents which should not be filed; Correction: notified counsel that discovery should not be filed (Re: 116 Notice (Other), 117 Notice (Other), ) (srt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-03-22118ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David L Kearney on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney David L Kearney added to party Bristow First Assembly of God(pty:pla), Attorney David L Kearney added to party Christina J Evans(pty:pla), Attorney David L Kearney added to party Mark S Evans(pty:pla).] (Kearney, David) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
2017-04-14119NOTICE of Change of Address by Kenneth H Blakley by on behalf of Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
2017-04-19120SPECIAL APPEARANCE by Robert Dale Edinger on behalf of Marathon Oil Corporation, Marathon Petroleum Corporation [Note: Attorney Robert Dale Edinger added to party Marathon Oil Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Dale Edinger added to party Marathon Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft).] (Edinger, Robert) (Entered: 04/19/2017)
2017-06-26121MOTION for Leave to File Motion to File Sur-Reply by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (DeVore, Allan) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
2017-06-28122MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , referring motion(s) to Magistrate McCarthy (Re: 121 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to File Sur-Reply ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
2017-06-29123Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: 101 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans (Kearney, David) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-30124MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: 123 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-05125ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy re: Initial Written Discovery Deadline ; granting 123 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: 101 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), ) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
2017-07-10126MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting 121 Motion for Leave to File Document(s) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
2017-07-17127MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy directing the Court Clerk to record into cases 15-cv-523-TCK-FHM, 15-cv-524-TCK-FHM, and 15-cv-525-TCK-FHM all entries made in case 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM as these matters are related. Case 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM is hereby terminated and the parties are directed to file all future pleadings regarding this matter into cases 15-cv-523-TCK-FHM, 15-cv-524-TCK-FHM, and 15-cv-525-TCK-FHM only. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
2017-07-17128MOTION to Quash , MOTION for Protective Order (originally filed as dkt #1 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) by BP p.l.c., Horace Lamar McKay (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17129MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District USDC - ND OK (originally filed as dkt #2 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) by BP p.l.c., Horace Lamar McKay (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17130MOTION for Attorney(s) A Scott McDaniel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (originally filed as dkt #3 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) by BP p.l.c., Horace Lamar McKay (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17131RESPONSE to Motion (originally filed as dkt #4 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) (Re: 128 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order (originally filed as dkt #1 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans ; (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17132REPLY to Response to Motion (originally filed as dkt #5 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) (Re: 128 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order (originally filed as dkt #1 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) ) by BP p.l.c., Horace Lamar McKay ; (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17133ORDER (Signed by Judge Melinda Harmon) (originally filed as dkt #6 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) ; granting 129 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17134CASE TRANSFERRED IN from USDC SD/TX (originally filed as dkt #7 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17135MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning case to Judge Claire V Eagan, due to a conflict, Judge John E Dowdell no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 17-mc-10-CVE(originally filed as dkt #8 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17136MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk changing case number to 17-MC-10-CVE-FHM (originally filed as dkt #9 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17137MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing BP p.l.c. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement (originally filed as dkt #10 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17138LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Nicholas Phillip Laurent (originally filed as dkt #11 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17139MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk : Having been determined by the court that reassignment would serve the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned from Judge Eagan as this case is related to case number 15-cv-525-TCK-FHM and other related consolidated cases, reassigning case to Judge Terence Kern, changing case number to 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM (originally filed as dkt #12 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17140MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (originally filed as dkt #13 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) ) , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy) (Re: 128 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order (originally filed as dkt #1 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17141MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (originally filed as dkt #14 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) by BP p.l.c. (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-17142MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern (originally filed as dkt #15 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) , referring motion(s) to Magistrate Judge McCarthy (Re: 141 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (originally filed as dkt #14 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-19143MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2017 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy); granting 141 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: 128 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order (originally filed as dkt #1 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/19/2017)
2017-07-21144OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; denying 76 Motion to Reconsider; granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 80 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Dismiss (Re: 68 Amended Complaint, ) (lmc, Chambers) (Entered: 07/21/2017)
2017-07-27145ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew M Bowman on behalf of Kinder Morgan, Inc. [Note: Attorney Andrew M Bowman added to party Kinder Morgan, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Bowman, Andrew) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
2017-08-01146Supplemental CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-01147ANSWER (Re: 68 Amended Complaint, ) by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-01148SURREPLY to Motion (Re: 128 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order (originally filed as dkt #1 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) ) by Bristow First Assembly of God, Christina J Evans, Mark S Evans ; (With attachments) (DeVore, Allan) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
2017-08-03149ANSWER (Re: 68 Amended Complaint, ) by BP p.l.c. (McDaniel, Archer) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03150ANSWER (Re: 68 Amended Complaint, ) by Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-03151ANSWER (Re: 68 Amended Complaint, ) by Marathon Oil Corporation (Blakley, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
2017-08-08152MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy: Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2017 ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting 128 Motion to Quash; granting 128 Motion for Protective Order (Re: 128 MOTION to Quash MOTION for Protective Order (originally filed as dkt #1 in 17-mc-10-TCK-FHM) ) (Court Reporter: C2) (tjc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-08-10153MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses and Production of Documents and Brief in Support by Kinder Morgan, Inc. (With attachments) (Sherry-Fischer, Amy) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff