Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01720
Date Filed2015-10-19
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rosemary M. Collyer
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning former Secretary of State Hillary Clinton's official schedule. The agency granted Citizens United expedited processing, but after waiting more than seven months for a response, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-10-191COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4282245) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Summons Attorney General, # 6 Summons State Department, # 7 Summons US Attorney)(Berg, Ralph) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-192Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITIZENS UNITED. (Berg, Ralph) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
2015-10-19Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (md) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2015-10-213SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2015-11-054NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew D. McGill on behalf of CITIZENS UNITED (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
2015-11-255ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
2015-11-30MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to confer and file a joint proposed dispositive motion briefing schedule no later than December 15, 2015. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 11/30/2015. (KD) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint proposed dispositive motion briefing schedule due by 12/15/2015. (cdw) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
2015-12-156MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
2015-12-30Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/19/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (cdw) (Entered: 12/30/2015)
2016-01-19MINUTE ORDER: Defendant is ORDERED to produce to Plaintiff by January 25, 2016, 1293 pages consisting of an officially archived set of former Secretary Clintons daily calendars during her tenure. Defendant shall produce 2455 files containing final and mini schedules to Plaintiff at the same time that Defendant produces them to the Associated Press. Defendant shall search for the trip books for the 87 trips that Plaintiff has identified. No later than March 4, 2016, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint proposed schedule for production of the trip books. A telephone conference is scheduled for February 9, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. for the purpose of discussing what records can be searched, if any, to determine when former Secretary Clinton attended meetings while she was on the 87 identified trips that were not reflected on the officially archived calendars, the final schedules, or the mini schedules for those trips. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/19/2016. (KD) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Status Conference held on 1/19/2016. (Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim) (cdw) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-02-09Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer: Telephone Conference held on 2/9/2016. (Court Reporter Crystal Pilgrim.) (zmm) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-09MINUTE ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at the telephone conference on February 9, 2016, Defendant is ORDERED to search the emails of schedulers Lona Valmoro and Linda Dewan for the period from November 3, 2012 through December 7, 2012, for references in the body of the emails to meetings and requests to schedule meetings with Secretary Clinton for any time from December 3, 2012 through December 7, 2012 when Secretary Clinton traveled to Ireland, Northern Ireland, Belgium, and the Czech Republic. Defendant shall use all of the dates from December 3 through 7, 2012 as search terms. Defendant shall file a status report regarding this search no later than February 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 2/9/2016. (KD) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/29/2016. (zmm) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-297STATUS REPORT Regarding Search of E-Mail Records by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
2016-03-048Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
2016-03-07MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to file a joint status report no later than June 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/7/2016. (KD) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-07Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2016. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
2016-05-209MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Responsive, Non-Exempt Portions of "Trip Book" by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Eric F. Stein)(Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-2310Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Responsive, Non-Exempt Portions of "Trip Book" filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
2016-05-24MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time for good cause shown. Defendant shall produce all non-exempt portions of the Trip Book (for the December 3-7, 2012 trip to Ireland, N.Ireland, Belgium, and the Czech Republic) by June 10, 2016. The parties shall file a joint status report and proposed schedule by June 27, 2016. The May 20 production deadline and June 27 status report date are vacated. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 5/24/2016. (KD) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-06-2711Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-06-28MINUTE ORDER requiring State to make its first production of documents pursuant to the parties' joint status report 11 no later than August 30, 2016, with subsequent productions to be made every four weeks. The parties shall file a joint status report no later than October 17, 2016. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 6/28/2016. (KD) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-06-28Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 10/17/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
2016-10-1412Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS UNITED. (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
2016-10-17MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to file a joint status report no later than January 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/17/2016. (DAS) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/16/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
2017-01-1313Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS UNITED. (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 01/13/2017)
2017-01-17MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to submit a joint status report no later than April 13, 2017 and every 90 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/17/2017. (DAS) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/13/2017. (cdw) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-04-1014NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Bailey W. Heaps (Borson, Joseph) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-04-1315Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS UNITED. (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
2017-07-1216Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS UNITED. (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 07/12/2017)
2017-10-1017Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS UNITED. (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
2018-01-0818Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS UNITED. (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-04-0919Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS UNITED. (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
2018-07-0920Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS UNITED. (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-10-0921Joint STATUS REPORT by CITIZENS UNITED. (McGill, Matthew) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar