Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLONG et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01734
Date Filed2015-10-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tanya S. Chutkan
PlaintiffSUSAN B. LONG Transactional Records Access Clearinghouse
PlaintiffDAVID BURNHAM Transactional Records Access Clearinghouse
Case DescriptionSusan Long and David Burnham, co-directors of TRAC, submitted three FOIA requests to the CIA for records concerning its processing of FOIA requests. TRAC also requested inclusion in the news media fee category as well as a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but denied the request on the basis that its records systems were not configured in a way in which a search could be conducted. TRAC appealed the denial, but the agency told TRAC that since its request was denied because of processing problems the right to appeal administratively did not apply. TRAC's second FOIA request was largely the same as the first. The agency rejected that request on the same basis as the first request. TRAC's third request was much more detailed and focused on records pertaining to FOIA processing that could be searched. This time, the CIA told TRAC that one item was being rejected because a search would be unduly burdensome, and that while TRAC could appeal that decision, the agency recommended it be allowed to continue to process the other items in the request. TRAC then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Choice of format - Burdensome, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [39]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Tanya Chutkan has ruled that the CIA must conduct an electronic search of its FOIA database to extract data elements requested by TRAC after finding that doing so would not require the creation of a record. The CIA rejected six requests from TRAC for information from its FOIA database, including the date a request was closed, arguing that to provide the information would require writing new computer code that was not required under FOIA. Chutkan noted that "the court is unconvinced by the CIA's argument that writing new computer code to locate responsive records in its database or compiling the resulting records constitute the creation of a new record." She pointed out that "although Plaintiffs phrased their Processing Data Requests as seeking a 'case-by-case listing,' the information they seek is neither a listing nor an index of the database contents. Instead, they seek certain data fields that the CIA concedes exist within the database. Thus, compiling these records does not constitute the creation of a new record." The CIA also argued that fulfilling TRAC's requests would be unduly burdensome. Chutkan found the agency had not yet justified the claim and noted that "while the court affords agency affidavits substantial weight in FOIA litigation, it cannot rely solely on conclusory statements that a search process 'would be extremely burdensome.'" TRAC requested data reflecting the database's capabilities over the past 18 months. The agency argued that such a search would also be unduly burdensome. Chutkan ordered the agency to search for the records. She noted that "even taking as true the CIA's assertion that user-generated reports are not tracked, it is not clear from the [affidavit] whether such user-generated reports are stored anywhere in the CIA's systems. The declaration also does not explain whether user-generated reports are the only type of reports generated by the FOIA database management system. To the extent some responsive records do exist, the CIA is obligated to perform a reasonable search to locate and produce them."
Issues: Choice of format - Burdensome
User-contributed Documents
 Cover Letter
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-10-201COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4284315) filed by SUSAN B. LONG, DAVID BURNHAM. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons CIA)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 10/20/2015)
2015-10-20Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md) (Entered: 10/23/2015)
2015-10-272SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
2015-11-253NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
2015-12-024ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-03MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and order not later than 12/17/15. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/3/15. (DJS) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
2015-12-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/17/2015 (zsm) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
2015-12-175Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG (Sobel, David) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
2015-12-18MINUTE ORDER: Granting 5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Jointly Proposed Schedule. Not later than February 17, 2016, the parties shall jointly comply with the court's December 3, 2015 Minute Order (including a jointly proposed order). The parties are reminded of their obligation to comply with Local Civil Rule 7(c) which requires that a proposed order accompany all motions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/18/15. (DJS) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
2015-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/17/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2016-02-176NOTICE - Joint Proposed Schedule for Further Proceedings by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
2016-02-18MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the Joint Status Report 6 filed by the parties, it is hereby ordered that the parties comply with the following deadlines: By March 16, 2016, the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule and proposed order for the processing of plaintiff's FOIA request or, in the absence of reaching an agreement on a processing schedule, defendant shall file a motion to stay this action, along with a proposed schedule and order, to which motion plaintiffs may respond. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/18/16. (DJS) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/16/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-03-167Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Schedule or Motion to Stay by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
2016-03-17MINUTE ORDER: Granting 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Briefing Schedule. On or before March 23, 2016, the parties will file a joint proposal and order for processing Plaintiff's FOIA request or, in the absence of an agreement, Defendant will file a motion to stay with a proposed schedule, to which Plaintiff may respond. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/17/16. (DJS) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/23/2016 (zsm) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-238MOTION to Stay by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Shiner Declaration, # 2 Shiner Declaration Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit 1)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
2016-04-069Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Stay filed by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan B. Long, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-1410Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 8 MOTION to Stay by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-15MINUTE ORDER: Granting 10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's reply due April 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/15/16. (DJS) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 4/25/2016. (zsm) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-2511REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Stay filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-10-0412ORDER granting in part 8 Motion to Stay. Defendant's status reports due by 10/13/2016 and 1/30/2017. Dispositive motions for remaining claims--"processing data requests" and sub-parts 1,4,5,7, and 9(b) of technical data request--due 11/14/2016. Case is to remain stayed until 3/23/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/4/2016. (lctsc3) Modified on 10/5/2016 (zsm). (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/13/2016. Motion due by 11/14/2016. (zsm) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-05MINUTE ORDER: it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file a joint status report and joint proposed order on or before 4/6/2017 after termination of the stay. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/5/2016. (lctsc3) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Case Stayed until 3/23/2017. (zsm) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/6/2017 (zsm) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-1313STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
2016-11-0914Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/09/2016)
2016-11-10MINUTE ORDER: Granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 11/22/2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/10/16. (DJS) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-1815Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-18MINUTE ORDER: Granting 15 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion. Defendant's Dispositive motion due by 11/30/2016. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/18/16. (DJS) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-3016MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in Part by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Shiner Declaration, # 2 Shiner Declaration Exhibits)(Braswell, Marina) Modified event title on 12/1/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 11/30/2016)
2016-12-0717Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 12/07/2016)
2016-12-08MINUTE ORDER: Granting 17 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs shall have until January 17, 2017, in which to file their response to defendants motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/8/16. (DJS) (Entered: 12/08/2016)
2016-12-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 1/17/2017 (zsm) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2017-01-1718Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in Part filed by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Long, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-1719Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Susan Long, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 01/17/2017)
2017-01-3020Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition/Reply brief and status report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-02-01MINUTE ORDER: Granting 20 Consent Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendant may have until February 3, 2017, in which to file its status report. Defendant may have until February 15, 2017, to file its combined reply/response to Plaintiffs' cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/1/17. (DJS) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
2017-02-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Response to Cross Motions due by 2/15/2017. Defendant Status Report due by 2/3/2017 Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/15/2017. (tb) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
2017-02-0321STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
2017-02-1422Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 19 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
2017-02-16MINUTE ORDER: Granting 22 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's brief due February 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/16/17. (DJS) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
2017-02-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply and Cross Opposition is due by 2/21/2017. (jth) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2123Memorandum in opposition to re 19 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Second Supplemental Shiner Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2124REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Second Supplemental Shiner Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
2017-02-2725Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 19 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-02-28MINUTE ORDER: Granting 25 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs' brief due March 7, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/28/17. (DJS) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
2017-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's brief due by 3/7/2017. (tb) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
2017-03-0726REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-2327MOTION to Stay by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Third Supplemental Shiner Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
2017-03-2928RESPONSE re 27 MOTION to Stay filed by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
2017-04-03MINUTE ORDER: Granting 27 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay. This action is hereby STAYED until July 31, 2017. Defendant shall make an interim release of information on May 31, 2017, file status report on June 30,2017, and make a final release of information on or before July31, 2017. Additionally, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report, along with a proposed order by September 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 4/3/17. (DJS) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/30/2017. Joint Status Report with Proposed Order due by 9/1/2017. (tb) (Entered: 04/03/2017)
2017-06-2929Consent MOTION to Stay (Extend Stay) and Status Report by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
2017-06-2930STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (See docket entry no. 29 to view document.) (td) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-30MINUTE ORDER: Granting 29 Defendant's Consent Motion to Stay. The STAY in this action shall continue until August 31, 2017. Defendant shall make an interim release of information on July 31, 2017, and make a final release of information by August 31, 2017. The parties shall file a Joint Status report and proposed order by September 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/30/17. (DJS) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-06-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report and Proposed Order are due by 9/15/2017. (jth) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
2017-07-06MINUTE ORDER: In light of the 10/04/2016 Stay entered in this case, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to Administratively Close this case. However, the parties shall continue to file their Status Reports as required by the 04/03/2017 Minute Order. Upon resolution of the administrative proceedings, the parties may file a motion to return this case to the court's active docket. Any such motion shall contain a proposed order for moving forward with this case. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/6/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-07-1331Unopposed MOTION to Clarify the Court's Minute Order of July 6, 2017 by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 07/13/2017)
2017-07-14MINUTE ORDER: Granting 31 Motion to Clarify. The Court's minute order ofJuly 6, 2017, is HEREBY CLARIFIED to provide that the case is stayed only with respect to the technical data request submitted on June 24, 2015, in conformance with the court's initial stay order at ECF No. 12 . The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to REOPEN this case and return it to the court's active docket. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/14/17. (DJS) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-09-1532Joint STATUS REPORT by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
2017-09-19MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report and PROPOSED ORDER by September 25, 2017, and every 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/19/17. (DJS) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/25/2017. (tb) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
2017-09-2533Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 09/25/2017)
2017-10-03MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report 33 , the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: By November 20, 2017, Defendant will file its motion for summary judgment. By December 21, 2017, Plaintiffs will file their combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment. By January 22, 2018, Defendant will file its combined opposition/reply memorandum. By February 9, 2018, Plaintiffs will file their reply memorandum. It is further ORDERED that the parties are herby relieved of their obligation to file status reports. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/3/17. (DJS) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 12/21/2017. Response to Cross Motion due by 1/22/2018. Reply to Cross Motion due by 2/9/2018. Summary Judgment motion due by 11/20/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/21/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/22/2018. (tb) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
2017-11-1634Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
2017-11-17MINUTE ORDER: Granting Defendant's Consent motion for extension of deadlines: Defendants motion for summary judgment due November 30, 2017. Plaintiff's response/combined cross-motion due January 12, 2018. Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/17/17. (DJS) (Entered: 11/17/2017)
2017-11-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants motion for summary judgment due 11/30/2017; Plaintiff's response/combined cross-motion due 1/12/2018. (jth) (Entered: 11/19/2017)
2017-11-3035Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file defendant's dispositive motion by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Granting 35 Consent Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. Defendant's motion for summary judgment due December 4, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/30/17. (DJS) (Entered: 11/30/2017)
2017-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 12/4/2017. (tb) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
2017-12-0436MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Fourth Supplemental Shiner Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) Modified event title on 12/5/2017 (znmw). (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-0537NOTICE (Notice of Filing of Vaughn Index In Support of Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment) by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY re 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Vaughn Index)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-1938RESPONSE re 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG. (Sobel, David) (Entered: 12/19/2017)
2019-09-1039MEMORANDUM OPINION: Regarding the CIA's First Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 16 , Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 19 , and the CIA's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 36 . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/10/19. (lctsc3) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-1040ORDER granting in part and denying without prejudice in part the CIA's First Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 16 ; denying without prejudice Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 19 ; and granting the CIA's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 36 . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/10/19. (lctsc3) (Entered: 09/10/2019)
2019-09-23MINUTE ORDER: By 10/4/19 the parties shall file a joint status report proposing a schedule for moving forward with this case. The report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 9/23/19. (DJS) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-09-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/4/2019. (tb) (Entered: 09/23/2019)
2019-10-0341PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Joint) by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-08MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 41 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall adhere to the following deadlines: Defendant will file its renewed motion for summary judgment by November 19, 2019. Plaintiffs will file their combined renewed cross- motion for summary judgment and opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment by December 19, 2019. Defendant's combined opposition/reply memorandum due January 17, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply due February 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/8/19. (DJS) (Entered: 10/08/2019)
2019-10-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motion due by 12/19/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 1/17/2020. Reply to Cross Motion due by 2/7/2020. Summary Judgment motion due by 11/19/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/19/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/17/2020. (tb) (Entered: 10/10/2019)
2019-11-1942Unopposed MOTION to Vacate Order,, With Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Shiner Declaration)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-20MINUTE ORDER: Granting 42 Motion to Vacate. The briefing schedule is hereby VACATED. The parties shall file a joint status report, along with proposed order, by December 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/20/19. (DJS) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/19/2019. (tb) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-12-1943Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2019-12-20MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 43 , it is hereby ordered that the CIA will begin processing the potentially responsive records located and make an interim release of any nonexempt responsive information on or before March 16, 2020. The CIA will complete processing all potentially responsive records by May 29, 2020. The parties shall file another joint status report and proposed order on or before June 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/20/19. (DJS) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/7/2020. (tb) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2020-01-1644NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/16/2020)
2020-05-2945MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete FOIA Obligations by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-06-0146Memorandum in opposition to re 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete FOIA Obligations filed by DAVID BURNHAM, SUSAN B. LONG. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Sobel, David) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-0547Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-0548NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-0849REPLY to opposition to motion re 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete FOIA Obligations filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-24MINUTE ORDER: Granting Defendant's Motion 45 for Extension of Time to Complete FOIA Obligations, EXCEPT that Defendant shall make an interim production by July 31, 2020 and the parties shall file a joint status report by August 7, 2020, along with a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/24/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2020. (tb) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-08-0750Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-10MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report 50 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint report by October 9, 2020 and every 30 days thereafter. To the extent the report contains a production or briefing schedule, the report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/10/2020. (DJS) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Report due by 10/9/2020. (tb) Modified on 8/12/2020 (tb). (Entered: 08/11/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar