Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01776
Date Filed2015-10-21
Date Closed2017-03-31
JudgeJudge Rosemary M. Collyer
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Treasury for records concerning email communications between the agency and clintonemail.com. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
AppealD.C. Circuit 17-5064
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [14]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-10-211COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4286528) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Treasury, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2015-10-212LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
2015-10-21Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (md) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
2015-10-223SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms.pdf)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
2015-11-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/2/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/2/2015.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/2/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY served on 10/30/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
2015-12-025ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-02MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall meet, confer, and file by January 8, 2016 a proposed briefing schedule for this case. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 12/2/2015. (lcrmc3) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/8/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
2016-01-086PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE On Behalf of Both Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
2016-01-11MINUTE ORDER adopting 6 Proposed Schedule. Defendant shall provide a search declaration by January 29, 2016. Plaintiff shall decide whether to proceed by February 5, 2016. If necessary, Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due March 4, 2016. Plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion, if any, is due April 1, 2016. Defendant's reply and opposition to cross-motion are due April 15, 2016. Plaintiffs reply in support of cross-motion is due April 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 1/11/2016. (lcrmc3, ) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
2016-01-11Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 3/4/2016. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/1/2016. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/15/2016. Plaintiff's Cross Motion due by 4/1/2016. Response to Cross Motion due by 4/15/2016. Reply to Cross Motion due by 4/29/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
2016-03-047MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan Law, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
2016-04-018MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
2016-04-159Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-2510REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION for Discovery Under Rule 56(d) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-04-2911ORDER denying 8 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff shall file by May 17, 2016 any opposition to Defendant's 7 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 4/29/2016. (lcrmc3) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-04-29Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff' response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/17/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-1712Memorandum in opposition to re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment (with response to statement of material facts attached) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
2016-05-2613REPLY to opposition to motion re 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2017-03-3114MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/31/2017. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-03-3115ORDER granting 7 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. This case is closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 3/31/2017. (lcrmc1) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff