Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMACLEOD v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01792
Date Filed2015-10-20
Date Closed2017-09-21
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffWILLIAM DALE MACLEOD
Case DescriptionWilliam MacLeod, a Canadian national, filed suit against the Department of Homeland Security, the NSA, and the General Services Administration alleging they had denied access to various records. MacLeod claimed a cause of action under FOIA, but there is no indication that he filed a request with any agency.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantUNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantNATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [19]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-10-201COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY filed by WILLIAM DALE MACLEOD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-10-202MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIAM DALE MACLEOD (zrdj) (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-10-20FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED" Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/16/2015. (zrdj) Modified on 11/20/2015 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/26/2015)
2015-10-273SUMMONS (7) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (md) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
2015-11-124NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Joy Lee on behalf of All Defendants (Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
2015-11-305MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 11/30/2015)
2015-12-02MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 5 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and their Answer or other response to the Complaint is due by March 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/1/15. (ms) Modified on 12/2/2015 (ms). (Entered: 12/02/2015)
2015-12-086RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 12/4/2015 (jf) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
2016-01-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 12/28/2015 (jf) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
2016-03-018MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-9, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lee, Jennifer). Added MOTION for Summary Judgment on 3/2/2016 (jf). (Entered: 03/01/2016)
2016-03-019ERRATA to add Certificate of Service by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Lee, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
2016-03-02NOTICE OF ERROR re 8 Motion to Dismiss; emailed to jennifer.lee@usdoj.gov, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. DO NOT REFILE--Counsel is reminded to docket all parts of their motion (jf, ) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-1110Order advising plaintiff to respond by 4/15/2016 to the defendants' 8 MOTION to Dismiss or for Summary Judgment, or the Court will treat the motion as conceded. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 3/11/16. (ms) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
2016-03-2811NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Jennifer Joy Lee (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
2016-05-0212DISCHARGED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 05/31/2016.....ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE directing the plaintiff show cause by 5/20/2016 why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/29/16. (ms) Modified on 5/31/2016 (jf). (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-2513Memorandum in opposition to re 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by WILLIAM DALE MACLEOD. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/25/2016 (jf) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
2016-05-2614MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Reply by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-05-31MINUTE ORDER: The court construes the plaintiff's 13 Memorandum in Opposition as his opposition to the defendants' dispositive motion and a timely response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. It is hereby ordered that the 12 Order to Show Cause is discharged. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/31/16. (ms) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-05-31MINUTE ORDER: Defendants' 14 Motion for Extension of Time is granted, and its reply is due by June 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 5/31/16. (ms) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 6/22/2016. (gdf) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-2215REPLY to opposition to motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY, UNITED STATES CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF GENERAL SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
2016-07-1116LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Letter by Plaintiff. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/27/2016. (jf) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
2017-01-2317MOTION for Instructions and Order by WILLIAM DALE MACLEOD (jf) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
2017-05-2418NOTICE by WILLIAM DALE MACLEOD. "Leave to file GRANTED" signed by Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/3/2017 (jf) (Entered: 05/24/2017)
2017-09-2119MEMORANDUM AND OPINION GRANTING 8 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/21/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-2120ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/21/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
2017-09-21MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 17 Motion for Instructions and Order. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/21/2017. (lckbj1) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff