Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION et al v. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv01979
Date Filed2015-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Richard J. Leon
PlaintiffDAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION
PlaintiffRICHARD POLLOCK
Case DescriptionThe Daily Caller News Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning security and information technology training for senior officials at the agency. The Foundation also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Daily Caller News Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to Respond

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-11-091COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4309140) filed by THE DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION, RICHARD POLLOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons State, # 3 Summons USADC, # 4 Summons USAG)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
2015-11-09Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (sth) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
2015-11-092SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
2015-11-183STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/18/15. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
2015-11-244RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/16/2015. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/16/2015. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
2015-11-245RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11-16-15. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
2015-12-166ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Lee, Jason) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
2016-01-297MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
2016-02-048ORDER. Defendant to make its first production of records to Plaintiff on 2/19/2016, on that date Defendant will also file a Status Report. If all records are not produced, Defendant will make a second production and file an updated Status Report on 3/21/2016. (See the Order for Complete Details). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/3/2016. (jth) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
2016-02-199STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-05-0210Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-0611ORDER : Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule; it is herby ordered that the DEPARTMENT OF STATE's summary judgment motion due by 6/3/2016; response to motion for summary judgment due by 7/1/2016; reply to motion for summary judgment due by 7/29/2016. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 05/05/16. (tb) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-06-0312MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Jason) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-07-0113Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION, RICHARD POLLOCK. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Moss Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-0114Cross MOTION for Discovery by DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION, RICHARD POLLOCK (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Moss Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-1415Unopposed MOTION Permission to File Combined Reply in Support of Summary Judgment and Opposition to Discovery by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
2016-07-19MINUTE ORDER granting 15 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to File a Combined Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that defendant has up to and including 7/29/2016 to file a combined reply in support of summary judgment and in opposition to discovery. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 7/19/2016. (lcrjl3, ) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Combine reply due by 7/29/2016. (tb) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2916REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Cross-Motion for Discovery filed by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Declaration of Eric F. Stein, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Jason) Modified link on 8/1/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-07-2917Memorandum in opposition to re 14 Cross MOTION for Discovery filed by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (See Docket Entry 16 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
2016-08-0418REPLY to opposition to motion re 14 Cross MOTION for Discovery filed by DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION, RICHARD POLLOCK. (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-08-26NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: A Motions Hearing in this case is scheduled for Wednesday, August 31, 2016, at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon re: Defendant's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiffs' 14 Cross Motion for Discovery . (jth) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-08-31Minute Entry: Motions Hearing held on 8/31/2016 before Judge Richard J. Leon: Motions heard, parties to meet and confer and report status at next hearing. Status Conference set for 9/16/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter William Zaremba) (tb) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
2016-09-0919Unopposed MOTION to Continue / Reschedule Status Conference by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the defendant's 19 Motion to Continue/ Reschedule Status Conference; it is hereby ordered that the motion is GRANTED. Status Hearing is now RESCHEDULED to Thursday, September 15, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. before Judge Richard J. Leon in Courtroom 18. SO ORDERED - Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/13/16. (tb) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-09-13Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 9/15/2016 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (tb) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
2016-09-15Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 9/15/2016 before Judge Richard J. Leon: Defendant shall produce to plaintiff by close of business on 9/15/16 a full report of their supplemental search results so that counsel may be prepared to discuss the production schedule for those documents at the hearing on 9/19/16. Status Conference set for 9/19/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter William Zaremba) (tb) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
2016-09-1620TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on September 15, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-12. Date of Issuance: September 16, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fr om the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 10/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/15/2016.(wz) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
2016-09-19Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference presently set for 9/19/2016 at 11:00 AM is reset for that same date at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (jth) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-19Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 9/19/2016 before Judge Richard J. Leon: Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter William Zaremba) (tb) (Entered: 09/19/2016)
2016-09-2021MEMORANDUM ORDER: It is hereby ordered that defendant's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment and plaintiff's 14 Cross-Motion for Discovery are both DENIED AS MOOT. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 09/191/6. (tb) (Entered: 09/20/2016)
2016-09-2722NOTICE of Defendant's Failure to Produce Documents by DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION, RICHARD POLLOCK (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-2723RESPONSE by DEPARTMENT OF STATE re 22 Notice (Other) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lee, Jason) Modified event title on 9/28/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-2724NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Zaid on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-12-2025TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on September 19, 2016; Page Numbers: 1-12. Date of Issuance: February 20, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order Form For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fro m the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/10/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/20/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2017.(wz) (Entered: 12/20/2016)
2017-01-1226STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
2017-01-2627Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Lee, Jason) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-01-3028ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 27 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ordered that: Defendant U.S. Department of State shall move for summary judgment by March 3, 2017. Plaintiffs The Daily Caller News Foundation and Richard Pollack shall file their opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment by March 31, 2017. Defendant shall file its reply in support of its motion for summary judgment by April 28, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/29/2017. (jth) (Entered: 01/30/2017)
2017-03-0329Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Declaration, # 5 Declaration, # 6 Statement of Facts, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, Jason) (Entered: 03/03/2017)
2017-03-3130NOTICE of Concession by DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION, RICHARD POLLOCK (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff