Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe New York Times Company et al v. United States Department of State
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2015cv08807
Date Filed2015-11-09
Date Closed2016-03-22
JudgeJudge Denise L. Cote
PlaintiffThe New York Times Company
PlaintiffEric Lipton
Case DescriptionNew York Times reporter Eric Lipton submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning emails sent to or from several senior officials and five specific non-governmental email addresses. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. After a year, Lipton inquired about the status of the request. He was told that the estimated date of completion was February 2016. He then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-11-091COMPLAINT against United States Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11605365)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Eric Lipton.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
2015-11-092CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
2015-11-093RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
2015-11-094REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of State, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
2015-11-10CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-10Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (pc) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-10Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-105ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of State. (pc) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
2015-11-126NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice): Initial Conference set for 2/5/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. -Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 11/12/2015) (gr) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
2015-11-167CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of of Notice of Conference served on United States Department of State on 11/16/2015. Document filed by Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
2015-12-118NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christine Schessler Poscablo on behalf of United States Department of State. (Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
2015-12-169ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of State.(Poscablo, Christine) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
2016-01-2810CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for February 5, 2016 addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David E. McCraw dated 01/28/2016. Document filed by Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-01-2811MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is adjourned to 3/11/2016 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 15B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 1/28/2016) (gr) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-03-0712CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for March 8, 2016 addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David E. McCraw dated 03/07/2016. Document filed by Eric Lipton, The New York Times Company.(McCraw, David) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-0713ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from David E. McCraw dated 03/07/2016. Consent letter requesting adjournment of the 3/8/2016 conference. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to 4/15 at 11 a.m. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/7/2016) (gr) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
2016-03-2214STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii)....with prejudice and without costs... (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 3/22/2016) (gr) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff