Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleA Better Way for BPA vs. United States Department of Energy Bonneville Power Administration
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CityTacoma
Case Number3:2015cv05896
Date Filed2015-12-09
Date Closed2016-03-24
JudgeJudge Ronald B. Leighton
PlaintiffA Better Way for BPA
Case DescriptionA Better Way for BPA submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy's Bonneville Power Administration for records concerning its plans to build a transmission line from Castle Rock, Washington, to Troutdale, Oregon. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after the agency failed to respond within ten months, the organization filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Energy Bonneville Power Administration
DefendantBonneville Power Administration
AppealNinth Circuit 16-35414
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [19]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-12-091COMPLAINT against defendant(s) A Better Way for BPA (Receipt # 0981-4261128), filed by A Better Way for BPA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Bricklin, David) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
2015-12-10Judge Ronald B. Leighton added. (MET) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-10NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 12/17/2015. (MET) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-102ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-103ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 3/9/2016, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 2/24/2016, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/2/2016, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-104Summons Issued as to defendant(s) United States Department of Energy Bonneville Power Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(MET) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2015-12-105CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by A Better Way for BPA (Brooks, Jacob) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
2016-01-196NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Peter Angus Winn on behalf of Defendant United States Department of Energy Bonneville Power Administration. (Winn, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-197MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Department of Energy Bonneville Power Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/12/2016, (Winn, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-198DECLARATION of Sarah Westenberg filed by Defendant United States Department of Energy Bonneville Power Administration re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Winn, Peter) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-02-089STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Re-Noting Motion to Dismiss by parties re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Bricklin, David) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-0810ORDER on STIPULATION 9 re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction : Noting Date is reset to 2/19/2016; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-1111RESPONSE, by Plaintiff A Better Way for BPA, to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction . (Bricklin, David) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-1112DECLARATION of Cheryl Brantley filed by Plaintiff A Better Way for BPA re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Bricklin, David) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-1113DECLARATION of Jacob Brooks filed by Plaintiff A Better Way for BPA re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Bricklin, David) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-1914REPLY, filed by Defendant United States Department of Energy Bonneville Power Administration, TO RESPONSE to 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Winn, Peter) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-02-1915DECLARATION of Christopher Frost filed by Defendant United States Department of Energy Bonneville Power Administration re 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Winn, Peter) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-02-1916PRAECIPE to attach document re 14 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant United States Department of Energy Bonneville Power Administration (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Reply Brief)(Winn, Peter) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-02-2317STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Vacating Order on Initial Disclosures by parties (Bricklin, David) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
2016-02-2318ORDER on STIPULATION 17 Vacating Initial Scheduling Order 3 ; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
2016-03-2119ORDER granting 7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
2016-03-2420JUDGMENT BY COURT (JAB) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar