Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFreedom of the Press Foundation v. Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2015cv05709
Date Filed2015-12-14
Date Closed2016-03-25
JudgeMagistrate Judge Maria-Elena James
PlaintiffFreedom of the Press Foundation
Case DescriptionThe Freedom of the Press Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records from January " July 2014 concerning communications between the agency and Congress pertaining to proposed FOIA legislation. The Foundation requested expedited processing, which was granted. After DOJ failed to respond by the end of 2014, the Foundation updated its request to include the same kinds of communications up through April 2015. The agency again granted the Foundation expedited processing, but after the agency failed to provide any substantive response, the Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-12-141COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Department of Justice ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10061700.). Filed byFreedom of the Press Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 12/14/2015) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
2015-12-142Proposed Summons. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 12/14/2015) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
2015-12-143Certificate of Interested Entities by Freedom of the Press Foundation (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 12/14/2015) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
2015-12-144Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 12/28/2015. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
2015-12-145MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10064162.) filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Exhibit New Jersey Certificate of Good Standing)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/14/2015) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
2015-12-146Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2016. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2016 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
2015-12-157Summons Issued as to Department of Justice, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
2015-12-158CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Freedom of the Press Foundation (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/15/2015) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
2015-12-169ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
2016-01-1410CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Justice.. (Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 1/14/2016) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
2016-01-1911CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Freedom of the Press Foundation.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 1/19/2016) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
2016-01-2012Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint For Injunctive Relief byDepartment of Justice. (Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 1/20/2016) (Entered: 01/20/2016)
2016-01-2813NOTICE by Freedom of the Press Foundation of Change of Law Practice Name (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 1/28/2016) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
2016-02-2214STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Continuing CMC and Extending Deadlines filed by Department of Justice. (Bryce, Peter) (Filed on 2/22/2016) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
2016-02-2215ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 14 Stipulation continuing Case Management Conference and Extending Deadlines. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
2016-02-22Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
2016-03-2516STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Freedom of the Press Foundation. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 3/25/2016) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar