Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00001
Date Filed2016-01-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for emails sent to or from three former officials at the Office of Legal Counsel. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests and told Leopold that the numbers of potentially responsive records was quite large. He narrowed the scope of his request for David Barron, who had recently been nominated to the First Circuit Court of Appeals. As to all three requests, Leopold heard nothing further from the agency and then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-01-011COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4365032) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attorney General, # 2 Summons Department of Justice, # 3 Summons US Attorney's Office, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/01/2016)
2016-01-01Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (sth) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-01-042SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-01-133RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/5/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/4/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/5/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/5/2016 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
2016-02-044ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
2016-02-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that by February 19, 2016, the parties shall confer and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/5/16. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-05Set/Reset Deadline: By 2/19/2016, the parties shall confer and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule. (ad) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-195NOTICE of Filing Joint Proposed Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-02-19MINUTE ORDER: Per the parties' 5 Notice, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by May 19, 2016, and every 90 days thereafter until further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/19/16. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
2016-02-22Set/Reset Deadline: Parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by 5/19/2016, and every 90 days thereafter until further Order of the Court. (ad) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
2016-05-196Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
2016-08-177Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 08/17/2016)
2016-11-158Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
2017-02-109Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete the Interim Release by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-10MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall complete its interim release of any responsive, non-exempt records to Plaintiff on or before February 27, 2017, and that the parties shall file their joint status report on or before February 27, 2017. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/10/17. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/27/2017 (gdf) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-2710Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
2017-05-3011Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 05/30/2017)
2017-08-2812Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Elliott, Stephen) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff