Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00002
Date Filed2016-01-01
Date Closed2016-05-24
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for emails sent by the current or former Solicitor General to any member of the Supreme Court. Leopold also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of his request and indicated that it would be transferred to the Office of the Solicitor General. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-01-011COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4365034) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attorney General, # 2 Summons Department of Justice, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/01/2016)
2016-01-01Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sth) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-01-042SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-01-043ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 4, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 01/04/2016)
2016-01-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/5/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/4/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/5/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/5/2016 (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
2016-02-045ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(LaCour, Alice) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
2016-02-086ORDER requiring parties to meet and confer and propose schedule by March 1, 2016 (further details in document). Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/8/2016. (lcckk2) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 3/1/2016. (dot) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-03-017Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Jason Leopold and by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (LaCour, Alice) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
2016-03-03MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report no later than APRIL 7, 2016, indicating the status of the productions and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Defendant is expected to produce all non-exempt, responsive documents by MARCH 31, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/3/2016. (lcckk2) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's to produce all non-exempt, responsive documents by 3/31/2016. Joint Status Report due by 4/7/2016. (dot) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
2016-04-078Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (LaCour, Alice) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
2016-04-11MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 8 Second Joint Status Report, the parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report no later than MAY 9, 2016, indicating the status of the parties' attempts to jointly resolve any issues regarding the agency's production and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/11/2016. (lcckk2) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/9/2016. (dot) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-05-099Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (LaCour, Alice) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
2016-05-11MINUTE ORDER re the parties' 9 Third Joint Status Report: by no later than MAY 24, 2016, the parties shall file either a Stipulation of Dismissal or an additional Joint Status Report, indicating the status of the parties' attempts to jointly resolve any issues regarding the agency's production and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/11/2016. (lcckk2) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-05-11Set/Reset Deadlines: By no later than 5/24/2016, the parties shall file either a Stipulation of Dismissal or an additional Joint Status Report. (kt) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-05-2410STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Jason Leopold and by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (LaCour, Alice) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff