Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2015cv02204
Date Filed2015-12-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
Case DescriptionJournalist Jason Leopold submitted five FOIA requests to the CIA for various Inspector General Reports. The agency acknowledged receipt of at least four of his requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2015-12-181COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4354666) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/18/2015)
2015-12-18Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (md) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2015-12-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
2016-01-133RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/23/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/22/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/23/2015. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
2016-01-224ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Newton, Emily) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
2016-01-275STANDING ORDER. The parties are directed to read this Order in its entirety upon receipt. The parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for future proceedings by no later than February 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 27, 2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
2016-01-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Schedule For Future Proceedings due by 2/12/2016. (mac) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
2016-02-126PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 5 Order, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Order)(Newton, Emily) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-127SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties are directed to read this Order in its entirety upon receipt. The parties shall file their first joint status report by no later than April 8, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 12, 2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/8/2016. (mac) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-04-088Interim STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Newton, Emily) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-05-279NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Davis on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-05-2710Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-06-02MINUTE ORDER granting 10 defendant's unopposed motion for a partial extension of time to produce documents. Defendants shall produce any non-exempt information in the two outstanding documents responsive to request F-2015-1568 by no later than June 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 2, 2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
2016-06-0311Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-2712Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-06-29MINUTE ORDER granting 12 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall produce any non-exempt information in the outstanding documents responsive to to request F-2015-2014 by no later than October 10, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 29, 2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-07-2913Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
2016-08-2914Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-08-29MINUTE ORDER granting 14 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall produce any non-exempt information in the outstanding documents responsive to request F-2015-1333 by no later than October 31, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/29/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-09-2315Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-10-0516Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-05MINUTE ORDER granting 16 defendant's unopposed second motion for a partial extension of time to produce documents. Defendant shall produce any non-exempt information in the outstanding documents responsive to request F-2015-2104 by no later than October 31, 2016, and defendant shall produce any non-exempt information in the outstanding documents responsive to request F-2015-1333 by no later than November 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/5/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-11-1017NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Christopher Siple on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-1018Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Documents by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siple, Adam) (Entered: 11/10/2016)
2016-11-11MINUTE ORDER granting 18 defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to produce documents. Defendant shall produce any non-exempt information in the outstanding documents responsive to request F-2015-1333 by no later than December 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/11/2016. (lcegs3) (Entered: 11/11/2016)
2016-11-1719Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2017-02-1320Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
2017-04-0421Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete FOIA Production by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Siple, Adam) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
2017-04-05MINUTE ORDER granting 21 defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to produce documents. Defendant's deadline to produce all non-exempt information in the outstanding documents responsive to Request F-2015-0474 is extended to June 30, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall complete two interim productions of non-exempt records responsive to Request F-2015-0474 on April 28, 2017 and May 26, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 04/5/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-04-1022Joint STATUS REPORT by JASON LEOPOLD. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/10/2017)
2017-06-0723Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-08MINUTE ORDER. In view of 23 the parties' joint status report, the parties are ORDERED to confer following the final production deadline on June 30, 2017 and to file a joint status report by no later than July 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 06/8/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/14/2017. (mac) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
2017-07-1424Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
2017-07-15MINUTE ORDER. In view of 24 the parties' joint status report, the parties are ORDERED to file another joint status report by no later than August 25, 2017 informing the Court whether they have any issues that they intend to submit to the Court for resolution. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 07/15/2017. (lcegs3) (Entered: 07/15/2017)
2017-07-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2017. (mac) (Entered: 07/16/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff