Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00175
Date Filed2016-02-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffCENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted two FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning the agency's decision to register Enlist Duo, an herbicide used in industrial agriculture. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests. The agency provided some records in interim responses and withheld records under Exemption 5 (privileges). The agency also denied the Center's request for a fee waiver. The Center appealed the agency's decisions, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [26]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Beryl Howell has ruled that the EPA has not yet shown that it conducted an adequate search for records pertaining to its decision finding that Enlist Duo, a herbicide manufactured by Dow AgriSciences, would have no effect on endangered species living in a 16-state area, nor has it provided sufficient support for its exemption claims. In response to two FOIA requests from the Center for Biological Diversity, the agency conducted three searches for electronic and paper records. Its first search focused on the Environmental Fate and Effect Division within the Office of Pesticide Programs and involved seven custodians. The second search included six custodians in the Office of General Counsel, as well as two more custodians in the Office of Pesticide Programs' Registration Division. A year later, a supplemental search was conducted by the four attorneys in OGC and the two OPP Registration Division employees. EPA disclosed at least 138 documents and withheld 150 emails under Exemption 5 (privileges). Howell faulted the EPA's use of the CBD's FOIA requests as the cut-off date for searches. She indicated that "EPA has articulated no compelling justification for using either September 26, 2014, or October 20, 2014, as a cut-off date for searches of records responsive to CBD's requests. Although October 20, 2014 may have been 'convenient' due to a large number of similar FOIA requests, 'convenience' is not a compelling justification. Accordingly, EPA should have used the 'date of the search' as the cut-off date." Further, the email correspondence identified an additional 11 staff members who might have had responsive records. EPA argued those 11 were only copied on emails, but Howell pointed out that "the prudent approach would have been simply to search the files of these remaining possible custodians rather than cavalierly to dismiss them as unlikely to have responsive documents." Howell also found the agency had not explained whether or not it searched for responsive text messages or instant messages. The agency withheld a number of records under Exemption 5. CBD argued that the determination whether to list a chemical as having no effect on endangered species could not be deliberative in nature. Howell noted that "given that the 'no effect' determinations is statutorily required to be based on 'the best scientific and commercial data available,' EPA has generally failed to explain how this determination involves the type of policy judgment protected by Exemption 5." Faulting the EPA for failing to make any segregablity determinations, Howell pointed out that "if EPA intends to withhold any document, in full or in part, and disclaims any segregable information, EPA must provide a particularized explanation of non-segregability for each document." Although she found in favor of CBD as to both the search and the exemption claims, Howell rejected CBD's argument that EPA's processing of their requests showed a pattern or practice of violating FOIA. She noted that "EPA not only disclosed documents, but took steps to communicate with CBD about the pending FOIA requests. CBD does not allege that EPA ever decided to refuse to produce any records. Consequently, the undisputed factual record does not support CBD's pattern and practice claims."
Issues: Adequacy - Search, Exemption 5 - Privileges - Deliberative process privilege - Deliberative
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-02-031COMPLAINT against U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4399430) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Environmental Protection Agency Summons, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney Summons, # 4 Summons U.S. Attorney General Summons)(Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
2016-02-032Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
2016-02-03Case Assigned to Judge Beryl A. Howell. (sth) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
2016-02-033MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Margaret E. Townsend, :Firm- Center for Biological Diversity, :Address- P.O. Box 11374, Portland, OR 97211. Phone No. - (971) 717-6409. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4399607. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Margaret Townsend, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
2016-02-034SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
2016-02-035STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 3, 2016. (lcbah2) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
2016-02-04MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 3 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice . Ms. Margaret E. Townsend, Esq., may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 4, 2016. (lcbah2) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
2016-03-176AFFIDAVIT of mailing re 1 Complaint, Affidavit of Service by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certified Mail Receipts)(Townsend, Margaret) Modified on 3/18/2016 (zrdj). (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-04-137NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-148Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-14MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. The defendant shall, by May 16, 2016, answer or otherwise respond to the 1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 14, 2016. (lcbah2) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 5/16/2016. (tg) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-189NOTICE of Appearance by Tanya Sanerib on behalf of CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Sanerib, Tanya) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-05-1610ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
2016-05-2711Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Status Report by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-05-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for the Parties to File Initial Status Report, and DIRECTING the parties to file, by June 6, 2016, a joint status report, as required by paragraph 3(b)(ii) of the 5 Standing Order. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 31, 2016. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2016. (tg) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
2016-06-0612Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-06MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of proceedings in this matter, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Status Report and Proposed Schedule: The defendant shall, by October 21, 2016, file any motion for summary judgment, along with supporting materials documenting the defendant's basis for any withholdings. The plaintiff shall, by November 21, 2016, file any opposition to the defendant's motion, as well as any cross-motion for summary judgment. The defendant shall, by December 21, 2016, file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, as well as any opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff shall, by January 23, 2017, file any reply in support of any cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 6, 2016. (lcbah2) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 10/21/2016; Cross-Motion/Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 11/21/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion/Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/21/2016; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 1/23/2017. (tg) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
2016-10-1713Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File And Brief Summary Judgment Motions by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
2016-10-20MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties' 13 Joint Motion for Extension of Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines. Accordingly, the Court amends the SCHEDULING ORDER as follows: The defendant shall, by November 21, 2016, file any motion for summary judgment, along with supporting materials documenting the defendant's basis for any withholdings. The plaintiff shall, by December 21, 2016, file any opposition to the defendant's motion, as well as any cross-motion for summary judgment. The defendant shall, by January 23, 2017, file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, as well as any opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff shall, by February 21, 2017, file any reply in support of any cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 20, 2016. (lcbah2) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-10-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion and supporting materials documenting the defendant's basis for any withholdings due by 11/21/2016; Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/21/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/23/2017; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 2/21/2017. (tg) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
2016-11-0414NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. Attorney Tanya Sanerib terminated. (Sanerib, Tanya) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-1715Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and to Adjust Related Briefing Deadline by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
2016-11-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 15 Consent Motion for Extension of Summary Judgment Briefing Deadlines. Accordingly, the Court amends the SCHEDULING ORDER as follows: The defendant shall, by November 23, 2016, file any motion for summary judgment, along with supporting materials documenting the defendant's basis for any withholdings. The plaintiff shall, by December 23, 2016, file any opposition to the defendant's motion, as well as any cross-motion for summary judgment. The defendant shall, by January 23, 2017, file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, as well as any opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff shall, by February 21, 2017, file any reply in support of any cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 18, 2016. (lcbah2) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 11/23/2016; Cross-Motion/Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/23/2016; Opposition to Cross-Motion/Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/23/2017; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 2/21/2017. (tg) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-2316MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Accompanying Memorandum by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Earl G. Ingram, Jr.)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/23/2016)
2016-12-2317Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration Brett Hartl, # 3 Declaration Stephanie M. Parent, # 4 Declaration Margaret E. Townsend, # 5 A, # 6 B, # 7 C, # 8 D, # 9 E, # 10 F, # 11 G, # 12 H, # 13 I, # 14 J, # 15 K, # 16 L, # 17 M, # 18 N, # 19 O, # 20 P, # 21 Q, # 22 R, # 23 S, # 24 T, # 25 U, # 26 V, # 27 W, # 28 X, # 29 Y, # 30 Z, # 31 AA, # 32 BB, # 33 CC, # 34 DD, # 35 EE, # 36 FF)(Townsend, Margaret) . (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2016-12-2318Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Accompanying Memorandum filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Statement of Facts)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 12/23/2016)
2017-01-1819Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Reply and Opposition and to Adjust Remaining Deadline in Briefing Schedule by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/18/2017)
2017-01-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 19 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Combined Reply and Opposition and to Adjust Remaining Deadlines in Briefing Schedule. Accordingly, the Court amends the SCHEDULING ORDER as follows: The defendant shall, by February 14, 2017, file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, as well as any opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff shall, by April 7, 2017, file any reply in support of any cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 23, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-01-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition to Cross Motion/Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/14/2017; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 4/7/2017. (tg) (Entered: 01/23/2017)
2017-02-0920MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to Cross Motion and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-0921RESPONSE re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Opposition to Cross Motion and Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 20 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Combined Reply and Opposition, over the plaintiff's objection, in light of the good cause shown by the defendant for the requested extension. Accordingly, the Court amends the SCHEDULING ORDER as follows: The defendant shall, by February 23, 2017, file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment, as well as any opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment. The plaintiff shall, by April 7, 2017, file any reply in support of any cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 10, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Opposition to Cross Motion/Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/23/2017; Plaintiff's Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 4/7/2017. (tg) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-2322Memorandum in opposition to re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 7(h) Statement filed by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Earl Ingram, # 2 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-02-2323REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Accompanying Memorandum (duplicate to Docket Entry 22) filed by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Earl Ingram, # 2 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
2017-04-0524REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 04/05/2017)
2017-09-2825ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part the defendant's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment, and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part the plaintiff's 17 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 28, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-09-2826MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the defendant's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment and the plaintiff's 17 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 28, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 09/28/2017)
2017-10-1827MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's Order of September 28, 2017 and for Reconsideration in Part by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Supplemental Ingram Declaration)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
2017-10-1928RESPONSE re 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's Order of September 28, 2017 and for Reconsideration in Part filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Email Chain)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-1929MOTION to Amend/Correct Deadlines by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Email Chain, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 10/19/2017)
2017-10-2330ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part the government's 27 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Comply with the Court's September 28, 2017, Order and for Reconsideration in Part and GRANTING in part and DENYING in part the plaintiff's 29 Motion to Amend Deadlines. See order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 23, 2017. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-10-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 12/4/2017; all nonexempt records subject to FOIA due by 3/1/2018. (tg) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
2017-12-0431MOTION for Extension of Time to Produce Vaughn Index by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-04MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 31 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Produce Vaughn Index . Accordingly, the defendant shall, by December 7, 2017, produce the Vaughn Index . Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 4, 2017. (lcbah2) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
2017-12-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Vaughn Index due by 12/7/2017. (tg) (Entered: 12/05/2017)
2017-12-2132Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Atwood, Amy) (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2017-12-2133Exhibit A (Vaughn Index (Dec. 7, 2017) re 32 Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Atwood, Amy) Modified on 12/22/2017 (zrdj). (Entered: 12/21/2017)
2018-01-0534ORDER DENYING, upon consideration of the parties' 32 Joint Status Report, plaintiff's requests for two briefing schedules and a status hearing, and DIRECTING defendant to provide, by January 18, 2018, information regarding the December 4, 2017 released documents. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 5, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
2018-01-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to Order of the Court due by 1/18/2018. (tg) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
2018-03-1535Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties' 35 Joint Status Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of proceedings in this matter: (1) the defendant shall file, by May 17, 2018, any motion for summary judgment; (2) the plaintiff shall file, by June 18, 2018, any consolidated opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) the defendant shall file, by July 17, 2018, any consolidated opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment; and (4) the plaintiff shall file, by August 7, 2018, any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 15, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 03/15/2018)
2018-03-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 5/17/2018; Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/18/2018; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/17/2018; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 8/7/2018. (tg) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
2018-05-1136Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and for Adjustment of Related Deadlines by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-11MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 36 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Its Motion for Summary Judgment and for Adjustment of Related Deadlines, and ISSUING the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control further proceedings in this case: (1) the defendant shall file, by June 6, 2018, any motion for summary judgment; (2) the plaintiff shall file, by by July 16, 2018, any consolidated opposition to the defendant's motion for summary judgment and cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) the defendant shall file, by August 16, 2018, any consolidated opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment; and (4) the plaintiff shall file, by September 17, 2018, any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 11, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 6/6/2018; Cross-Motion and Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/16/2018; Opposition to Cross-Motion and Reply to Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/16/2018; Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion due by 9/17/2018. (tg) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
2018-06-0637MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Third Supplemental Declaration of Earl Ingram, Jr. and Vaughn Index, # 3 Declaration of Sujatha Sankula)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
2018-07-1638MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Declaration Stephanie Parent, # 4 Declaration Margaret Townsend, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10, # 15 Exhibit 11, # 16 Exhibit 12)(Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-07-1639Memorandum in opposition to re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 07/16/2018)
2018-08-0940MOTION for Extension of Time to File Combined Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's 40 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File its Combined Reply and Opposition to Cross-Motion, which the plaintiff does not oppose. Accordingly, the Court amends the SCHEDULING ORDER as follows: (1) the defendant shall file, by September 5, 2018, any consolidated opposition to the plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment; and (2) the plaintiff shall file, by October 4, 2018, any reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 10, 2018. (lcbah2) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's consolidated opposition to plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of its motion for summary judgment due by 9/5/2018; plaintiff's reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 10/4/2018. (tg) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
2018-09-0541Memorandum in opposition to re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed filed by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 7(h) Statement, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Fourth Supplemental Ingram Declaration, # 4 Supplemental Sankula Declaration)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-09-0542REPLY to opposition to motion re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum (duplicate of Docket Entry No. 41) filed by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Response to Plaintiff's Local Rule 7(h) Statement, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Fourth Supplemental Ingram Declaration, # 4 Supplemental Sankula Declaration)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
2018-10-0343ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC. (Townsend, Margaret) Modified on 10/4/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 10/03/2018)
2018-10-04NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 43 Status Report was entered in error (Wrong case number)and counsel is instructed to refile said pleading with correct case number if appropriate. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
2018-10-0444REPLY to opposition to motion re 38 MOTION for Summary Judgment Renewed filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, INC.. (Townsend, Margaret) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar