Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS v. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00204
Date Filed2016-02-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffHEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS
doing business as NATIONAL IMMIGRANT JUSTICE CENTER
Case DescriptionThe Heartland Alliance for Human Needs & Human Rights submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and the Office of Management and Budget for records concerning policies and procedures for maintaining and/or filling beds at ICE detention facilities. ICE responded to Heartland's request by disclosing 247 pages and 123 Excel spreadsheets. The agency withheld other records under Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy), Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records), and Exemption 7(E) (investigative methods and techniques). Heartland appealed the agency's decision and the agency remanded the case for a more extensive search. OMB responded to Heartland's request by indicating it had found six pages that were being referred to ICE for a determination. Heartland appealed OMB's decision, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Heartland filed suit against both agencies.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Complaint attachment 26
Complaint attachment 27
Complaint attachment 28
Complaint attachment 29
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-02-051COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4403806) filed by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # 3 Summons to United States Department of Homeland Security, # 4 Summons to Office of Management and Budget, # 5 Summons to U.S. Attorney General, # 6 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Exhibit 10, # 17 Exhibit 11, # 18 Exhibit 12, # 19 Exhibit 13, # 20 Exhibit 14, # 21 Exhibit 15, # 22 Exhibit 16, # 23 Exhibit 17, # 24 Exhibit 18, # 25 Exhibit 19, # 26 Exhibit 20, # 27 Exhibit 21, # 28 Exhibit 22, # 29 Exhibit 23)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-052LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
2016-02-05Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sth) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-083SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
2016-02-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/10/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/11/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/10/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 2/9/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 2/9/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-02-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 2/10/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Seth A. Watkins)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
2016-03-099Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
2016-03-09MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before April 11, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/09/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
2016-03-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/11/2016, (tj) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
2016-04-1110ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
2016-04-12MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing scheduling on or before April 26, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/12/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
2016-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/26/2016. (tj) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-2611PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE - Parties' Proposed Production Schedule by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
2016-04-26SCHEDULING MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 11 Parties' Proposed Production Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall produce the first production on or before June 10, 2016 with monthly productions on or before the second Friday of each month thereafter. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before August 22, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/26/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
2016-08-2212Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 12 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear in Courtroom 14 before the Honorable Judge Rudolph Contreras for a status conference on September 14, 2016 at 10:00am. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/24/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/24/2016)
2016-08-26Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/14/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
2016-09-14Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 9/14/2016. Government's Declarations due by 9/28/2016. Status Conference set for 10/5/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (Court Reporter Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller) (hs) (Entered: 09/14/2016)
2016-09-2713MOTION for Extension of Time to File by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-2814RESPONSE re 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Declarations filed by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-28MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file the declaration related to the Office of Management and Budget on or before September 28, 2016, as previously scheduled. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file the remaining declarations on or before October 10, 2016. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear in Courtroom 14 for a status conference on October 5, 2016 at 10:30 AM, as previously scheduled. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/28/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-2815ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Appearance by Giang T. Ton-that on behalf of All Defendants (Ton-that, Giang) Modified on 9/29/2016 (znmw). (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-2816NOTICE of filing Declaration by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 09/28/2016)
2016-09-29Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/5/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-09-29NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Docket Entry 15 Notice of Appearance was entered in error; Attorney Giang T. Ton-that is an active member of the bar of this court, and a motion for pro hac vice appearance has not been filed in this case. (znmw) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
2016-10-0417RESPONSE re 16 Notice (Other) of OMB's Declaration filed by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-0418Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Giang T. Tonthat, :Firm- Adduci, Mastriani & Schaumberg LLP, :Address- 1133 Connecticut Avenue, NW, Washington DC 20036. Phone No. - 202-467-6300. Fax No. - 202-466-2006 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4697995. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Giang T. Tonthat)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-04MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Consent Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2, it is hereby ORDERED that Giang T. Tonthat is admitted to represent Plaintiff pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/4/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
2016-10-05Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 10/5/2016. Scheduling Order to issue via chambers. (Court Reporter Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller) (hs) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-05MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, on or before October 19, 2016, Defendants shall provide the information described by the Court on the record during today's hearing. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an omnibus response on or before October 26, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/5/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
2016-10-1119NOTICE of filing Immigration Customs and Enforcement Declaration by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
2016-10-1920NOTICE of Filing Declaration (OMB) by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-10-2621RESPONSE re 20 Notice (Other), 19 Notice (Other), in Response to Defendants' Declarations filed by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
2016-10-3122RESPONSE re 16 Notice (Other), 20 Notice (Other), 19 Notice (Other), Supplemental Response to Defendants' Declarations filed by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-0823ORDER setting production schedule and requiring additional status reports. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/8/2016. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-2224STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
2017-01-26MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before February 9, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/26/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
2017-02-0925Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
2017-02-10MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 25 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a status report on or before March 8, 2017 and Defendants shall file a response to the status report on or before March 31, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear in Courtroom 14 before the Honorable Judge Rudolph Contreras for a Status Conference on April 6, 2017 at 2:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/10/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-02-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/8/2017; Responses due by 3/31/2017. Status Conference set for 4/6/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
2017-03-0726Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-07MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its status report on or before March 15, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/7/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
2017-03-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/15/2017 (tj) (Entered: 03/08/2017)
2017-03-1527STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
2017-03-3128STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
2017-04-06Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 4/6/2017. Motion to Amend due by 4/10/2017; Status Report due by 5/5/2017. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro Miller.) (tj) (Entered: 04/07/2017)
2017-05-0429Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Amended Complaint, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Amended Complaint, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit 9 to Amended Complaint, # 11 Exhibit 10 to Amended Complaint, # 12 Exhibit 11 to Amended Complaint, # 13 Exhibit 12 to Amended Complaint, # 14 Exhibit 13 to Amended Complaint, # 15 Exhibit 14 to Amended Complaint, # 16 Exhibit 15 to Amended Complaint, # 17 Exhibit 16 to Amended Complaint, # 18 Exhibit 17 to Amended Complaint, # 19 Exhibit 18 to Amended Complaint, # 20 Exhibit 19 to Amended Complaint, # 21 Exhibit 20 to Amended Complaint, # 22 Exhibit 21 to Amended Complaint, # 23 Exhibit 22 to Amended Complaint, # 24 Exhibit 23 to Amended Complaint, # 25 Exhibit 24 to Amended Complaint, # 26 Exhibit 25 to Amended Complaint, # 27 Exhibit 26 to Amended Complaint, # 28 Exhibit 27 to Amended Complaint, # 29 Exhibit 28 to Amended Complaint, # 30 Exhibit 29 to Amended Complaint, # 31 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 05/04/2017)
2017-05-05MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's amended complaint and the exhibits thereto, which are attached to Plaintiff's motion, are DEEMED filed and served. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/5/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-0530Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
2017-05-0531AMENDED COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT filed by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29)(znmw) (Entered: 05/08/2017)
2017-05-2632ANSWER to 31 Amended Complaint,,, by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. Related document: 31 Amended Complaint,,, filed by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS.(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 05/26/2017)
2017-06-0733Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/07/2017)
2017-06-2034NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. Attorney Giang T. Tonthat terminated. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-2735NOTICE of Change of Address by Seth A. Watkins (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 06/27/2017)
2017-07-0636Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 07/06/2017)
2017-08-0837Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 08/08/2017)
2017-09-1138NOTICE of Change of Address by Seth A. Watkins (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
2017-09-1439Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-09-14MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the joint status report currently due on September 15, 2017 shall instead be submitted on or before October 4, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/14/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
2017-10-0340Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before November 8, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/03/2017 (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/8/2017 (tj) (Entered: 10/03/2017)
2017-11-0741Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-07MINUTE ORDER granting 41 Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ordered that the parties's next joint status report shall be filed on or before November 15, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/7/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/15/2017 (tj) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
2017-11-1542Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
2017-12-1443Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
2018-01-1644Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
2018-01-3045Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
2018-02-1346Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
2018-03-1447Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
2018-04-1348Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 04/13/2018)
2018-04-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 48 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report on or before April 30, 2018 setting forth the final issues for briefing, if any, and a proposed schedule to govern this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/16/2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/30/2018. (tj) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
2018-04-3049Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-04-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 49 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment on or before July 23, 2018, Plaintiff shall file any cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition on or before August 22, 2018, Defendants shall file any opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion and reply on or before September 21, 2018, and Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its cross-motion on or before October 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 30, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
2018-05-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 8/22/2018. Response to Cross Motions due by 9/21/2018. Reply to Cross Motions due by 10/22/2018. Summary Judgment motions due by 7/23/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/22/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/21/2018. (tj) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
2018-07-1150Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-11MINUTE ORDER granting 50 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extention of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment on or before August 14, 2018; Plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross-motion for summary judmgent on or before September 14, 2018; Defendants shall file their reply and opposition to Plaintiff's cross-motion on or before October 15, 2018; and Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before November 12, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 11, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
2018-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 9/14/2018. Response to Cross Motions due by 10/15/2018. Reply to Cross Motions due by 11/12/2018. Summary Judgment motions due by 8/14/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/14/2018. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/15/2018. (tj) (Entered: 07/12/2018)
2018-08-0851Unopposed MOTION to Stay (Temporarily) Briefing Schedule by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, Benton) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-09MINUTE ORDER granting 51 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Temporary Stay. It is hereby ORDERED that briefing is stayed through September 14, 2018 to allow Defendant to conduct additional document searches. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 14, 2018 informing the Court of the results of Defendant's additional document searches and proposing a new briefing schedule as necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on August 9, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2018 (hs) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
2018-09-1452Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 52 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before October 5, 2018 containing a proposed briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on September 14, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/5/2018 (tj) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-1653Joint STATUS REPORT by HEARTLAND ALLIANCE FOR HUMAN NEEDS & HUMAN RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watkins, Seth) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 53 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern dispositive motion briefing in this case: Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment on or before December 14, 2018; Plaintiff shall file its opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before January 4, 2019; Defendants shall file their reply and opposition on or before January 23, 2019; and Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before February 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on October 16, 2018. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
2018-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 1/4/2019. Response to Cross Motions due by 1/23/2019. Reply to Cross Motions due by 2/6/2019. Summary Judgment motions due by 12/14/2018. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/4/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/23/2019. (tj) (Entered: 10/19/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar