Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCenter For Human Rights and Constitutional Law et al v. United States Department of State
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2016cv00899
Date Filed2016-02-09
Date Closed2016-07-26
JudgeJudge Stephen V. Wilson
PlaintiffCenter For Human Rights and Constitutional Law
PlaintiffHuman Rights Watch
PlaintiffMovimiento Migrante Mesoamericano
PlaintiffRed Mexicana de Lideres y Organizations Migrantes
PlaintiffRight Rev. J. Jon Bruno
PlaintiffRed de Pastores y Lderes Latinos del Sur de California
Case DescriptionThe Center for Human Rights and Constitutional Law and a coalition of similar public interest organizations submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning aid provided to Mexico's Instituto Nacional de Migracion. The coalition asked for a fee waiver and expedited processing. The agency denied the coalition's request for expedited processing and a fee waiver. The coalition appealed the agency's decision, which was upheld. The coalition then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver

DefendantUnited States Department of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-02-091COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-17252307 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Red Mexicana de Lideres y Organizations Migrantes, Center For Human Rights and Constitutional Law, Movimiento Migrante Mesoamericano, Red de Pastores y Lderes Latinos del Sur de California, Human Rights Watch, J. Jon Bruno. (Attorney Carlos Holguin added to party J. Jon Bruno(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Holguin added to party Center For Human Rights and Constitutional Law(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Holguin added to party Human Rights Watch(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Holguin added to party Movimiento Migrante Mesoamericano(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Holguin added to party Red Mexicana de Lideres y Organizations Migrantes(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Holguin added to party Red de Pastores y Lderes Latinos del Sur de California(pty:pla))(Holguin, Carlos) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-092CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs J. Jon Bruno, Center For Human Rights and Constitutional Law, Human Rights Watch, Movimiento Migrante Mesoamericano, Red Mexicana de Lideres y Organizations Migrantes, Red de Pastores y Lderes Latinos del Sur de California. (Holguin, Carlos) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-093CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying none. (Holguin, Carlos) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-094Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by plaintiffs J. Jon Bruno, Center For Human Rights and Constitutional Law, Human Rights Watch, Movimiento Migrante Mesoamericano, Red Mexicana de Lideres y Organizations Migrantes, Red de Pastores y Lderes Latinos del Sur de California. (Holguin, Carlos) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-095NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-09660 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant United States Department of State. (et) (Entered: 02/09/2016)
2016-02-107NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (cr) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-248PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Red Mexicana de Lideres y Organizations Migrantes, Center For Human Rights and Constitutional Law, Movimiento Migrante Mesoamericano, Red de Pastores y Lderes Latinos del Sur de California, Human Rights Watch, J. Jon Bruno, upon Defendant United States Department of State served on 2/16/2016, answer due 4/18/2016. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to F. De la Rosa. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to illegible. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to U.S. Dept. of State. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons returned. (Holguin, Carlos) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
2016-03-049STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States Department of State answer now due 4/16/2016, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of State.(Attorney Alarice M Medrano added to party United States Department of State(pty:dft))(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
2016-04-1510STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 06/14/2016 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
2016-04-1811ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant, United States Department of State shall have to and including June 14, 2016 to answer, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (cr) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-06-1312STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 07/14/2016 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, 1 filed by Defendant United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-1513ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant, United States Department of State Shall have to and including July 14, 2016 to answer, plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. (cr) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
2016-07-1414Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by Defendant United States Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Proposed Order)(Medrano, Alarice) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
2016-07-2115ORDER STAYING THIS ACTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Stay Case 14 , Case stayed. On or before January 16, 2017, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report and Stipulation regarding any further litigation in the case. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-2616MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDARPENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff