Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION v. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00221
Date Filed2016-02-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
PlaintiffAMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionThe ACLU submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Justice, and several other agencies for records concerning the government's "Countering Violent Extremism" program. The ACLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. Most of the agencies had not responded to the ACLU's request, while others like the Department of Health and Human Services, had disclosed a handful of records. The Office of the Director of National Intelligence denied the request, which the ACLU appealed. Several other agencies indicated that they had found no records, which the ACLU also appealed. None of the requests were resolved by the time the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-02-101COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4408381) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Department of Homeland Security, # 3 Summons for Department of Justice, # 4 Summons for Federal Bureau of Investigation, # 5 Summons for Office of the Director of National Intelligence, # 6 Summons for Department of State, # 7 Summons for Department of Health and Human Services, # 8 Summons for Department of Education, # 9 Summons for U.S. Attorney General, # 10 Summons for U.S. Attorney for D.C.)(Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-10Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (sth) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-102SUMMONS (9) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-02-103ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on February 10, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
2016-03-084NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION, AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
2016-03-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 2/17/2016. (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-106RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/17/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/18/2016. (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 3/7/2016 (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-108RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 2/16/2016 (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-109RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 2/16/2016 (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-1010RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/17/2016 (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-1011RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 2/17/2016 (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-1012RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 2/17/2016 (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-1013RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE served on 2/29/2016 (Shamsi, Hina) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-1714NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Matthew Snell on behalf of All Defendants (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-1715ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-1816ORDER. It is this 18th day of March, 2016, hereby ORDERED that the parties shall MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiffs, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, etc. The parties shall file the schedule not later than April 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/18/2016. (lcckk1) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
2016-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter due by 4/22/2016. (dot) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
2016-04-2217Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-04-25MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The Court is in receipt of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, filed on April 22, 2016. Upon review of the parties' report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a Joint Status Report on or before JUNE 3, 2016. The Joint Status Report shall provide a proposed production schedule as to the agencies where searches for responsive documents have been completed. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/25/2016. (lcckk1) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2016. (dot) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
2016-06-0318Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-06MINUTE ORDER (Paperless). The Court is in receipt of the parties' 18 Second Joint Status Report, filed on June 3, 2016. Upon review of the parties' report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a Joint Status Report on or before JULY 22, 2016, indicating the status of Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' Request. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/6/2016. (lcckk1) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/22/2016. (dot) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
2016-06-1419Supplemental STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
2016-07-2120Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
2016-07-22MINUTE ORDER(Paperless). The Court is in receipt of the parties' 20 Third Joint Status Report, filed on July 21, 2016. Upon review of the parties' report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a Joint Status Report on or before SEPTEMBER 23, 2016, indicating the status of Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' FOIA Request. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 7/22/2016. (lcckk1) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-07-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2016. (dot) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
2016-09-2321Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
2016-09-27MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 21 Fourth Joint Status Report, filed on September 23, 2016. Upon review of the parties' report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a Joint Status Report on or before DECEMBER 21, 2016, indicating the status of Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' FOIA Request. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/27/2016. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/21/2016. (dot) (Entered: 09/27/2016)
2016-10-1922AFFIDAVIT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
2016-12-2123Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-21MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 23 Fifth Joint Status Report, filed on December 21, 2016. Upon review of the parties' report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a Joint Status Report on or before March 21, 2017, indicating the status of Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' FOIA Request. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/21/2016. (lcckk3) (Entered: 12/21/2016)
2016-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2017. (dot) (Entered: 12/29/2016)
2017-03-2024Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 03/20/2017)
2017-03-21MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 24 Sixth Joint Status Report, filed on March 20, 2017. The parties represent that Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence have made several productions to Plaintiffs since the parties filed their last Joint Status Report and will continue to make rolling productions in the coming months. Upon review of the parties' report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a Joint Status Report on or before JUNE 21, 2017, indicating the status of Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' FOIA Request. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/21/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-03-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2017. (dot) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
2017-06-2025Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
2017-06-21MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 25 Seventh Joint Status Report, filed on June 20, 2017. The parties represent that Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, Department of Education and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence have made several productions to Plaintiffs since the parties filed their last Joint Status Report and will continue to make rolling productions. Upon review of the parties' report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a Joint Status Report on or before SEPTEMBER 21, 2017, indicating the status of Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' FOIA Request. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/21/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
2017-06-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2017. (dot) (Entered: 06/23/2017)
2017-09-1926Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 09/19/2017)
2017-09-20MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' 26 Eighth Joint Status Report, filed on September 19, 2017. The parties represent that Defendants Department of Homeland Security and Department of State have made several productions to Plaintiffs since the parties filed their last Joint Status Report and will continue to make rolling productions. Upon review of the parties' report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties file a Joint Status Report on or before JANUARY 19, 2018, indicating the status of Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs' FOIA Request. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/20/2017. (lcckk3) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff