Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00227
Date Filed2016-02-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffKEN DILANIAN
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and investigative reporter Ken Dilanian submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the CIA for records concerning Mr. Kiriakou, a CIA officer who had publicly commented on waterboarding. He was prosecuted for disclosing information about a covert operative and pled guilty. All the requests asked for records concerning Kiriakou. At least one of JMP's requests was administratively closed because it was considered duplicative, but after both agencies failed to respond, JMP and Dilanian filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-02-111COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4409909) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KEN DILANIAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit LCvr 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-11Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (md) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
2016-02-122SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-03-023RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/18/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/19/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - USADC)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-024RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 2/18/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - DOJ)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/02/2016)
2016-03-105MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KEN DILANIAN (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 03/10/2016)
2016-03-146ORDER; granting 5 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/10/2016. (hs) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
2016-03-147First AMENDED COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, KEN DILANIAN.(zrdj) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
2016-03-148NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Celia Davis on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
2016-03-219Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
2016-03-2410ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on March 24, 2016.(lcrcl3) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
2016-04-0811ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Related document: 7 Amended Complaint filed by KEN DILANIAN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
2016-04-1812ORDER: An answer having been filed herein in this case brought under the Freedom of Information Act, the defendants shall file any dispositive motions within 10 days of this date, or such time as the Court allows upon proper motion. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/15/2016. (ad) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
2016-04-2613Unopposed MOTION to Stay Deadline to File Dispositive Motion and Consent Motion to Set Deadline for Submission of Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
2016-04-2814ORDER granting 13 Unopposed Motion to Stay: Defendants' deadline to file any dispositive motion is stayed until such time as the Court enters a scheduling order governing the proceedings in this matter, including deadlines for briefing any dispositive motions. It is further ORDERED that the parties must file no later than 30 days from the date of this order, a joint proposed scheduling order, including deadlines for briefing any dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/27/2016. (ad) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
2016-05-2715Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
2016-06-0316ORDER granting 15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order; it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' deadline to file a joint proposed scheduling order, including deadlines for briefing any dispositive motions, is extended by 30 days until June 30, 2016. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/1/2016. (tg) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
2016-06-3017Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-06-3018Memorandum in opposition to re 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order filed by KEN DILANIAN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-0119REPLY to opposition to motion re 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-0520ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order. The parties' deadline to file a joint if possible, separately if no agreement can be reached, proposed scheduling order, including deadlines for briefing any dispositive motions, is extended by 60 days until August 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/5/2016. (tg) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
2016-08-2921NOTICE of Filing Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davis, Kathryn) (Entered: 08/29/2016)
2016-09-0922ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceedings in this matter shall be governed by the following schedule: Defendant EOUSA will produce to Plaintiffs all responsive, non-exempt records that originated with EOUSA by October 31, 2016; Defendant CIA will produce to Plaintiffs all responsive, non-exempt records by February 28, 2017; Defendant FBI will produce to Plaintiffs all responsive, non-exempt records by February 28, 2017; Defendants will make rolling productions of documents on a monthly basis, beginning for Defendant EOUSA on September 29, 2016 and for Defendants CIA and FBI on November 15, 2016; and the parties will file a Joint Status Report no later than 60 days from the date of this order to update the Court about the production of records in this case, and to submit any other further recommendations regarding the schedule in this matter, if appropriate. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/08/2016. (ad) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-09-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant EOUSA will produce to Plaintiffs all responsive, non-exempt records that originated with EOUSA by 10/31/2016; Defendant CIA will produce to Plaintiffs all responsive, non-exempt records by 2/28/2017; Defendant FBI will produce to Plaintiffs all responsive, non-exempt records by 2/28/2017; Defendants will make rolling productions of documents on a monthly basis, beginning for Defendant EOUSA on 9/29/2016 and for Defendants CIA and FBI on 11/15/2016. (ad) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
2016-11-0823NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Adam Christopher Siple on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kathryn C. Davis (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
2016-11-0824Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Siple, Adam) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff