Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE v. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00231
Date Filed2016-02-12
Date Closed2016-08-12
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffCAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionCause of Action submitted a FOIA request to the Clinton Presidential Library for records of communications between the library director and Hillary Clinton or any of her representatives pertaining to her records when she was Secretary of State. Cause of Action requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency granted Cause of Action expedited processing, but when Cause of Action realized its request had not been expedited, it appealed. The Clinton Library told Cause of Action that there were two older expedited requests still being processed. Cause of Action submitted another FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning communications between NARA and the Department of State pertaining to recovery of federal records improperly taken by Hillary Clinton. Cause of Action requested expedited processing and inclusion in the media fee category. The agency granted expedited processing. NARA told Cause of Action it was still processing the request. After hearing further concerning either request, Cause of Action filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantNATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION
DefendantTHE WILLIAM J. CLINTON PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-02-121COMPLAINT against NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, THE WILLIAM J. CLINTON PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4411280) filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 1-12, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons FOIA to NARA, # 4 Summons FOIA to Clinton Library, # 5 Summons FOIA to US Attorney General, # 6 Summons FOIA to Civil Process Clerk US Attorney's Office)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-122Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-12Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (sth) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-123SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, THE WILLIAM J. CLINTON PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-124CIVIL COVER SHEET Corrected by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE re 1 Complaint, filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Notice of Corrected Civil Cover Sheet)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
2016-02-225NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE re 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shannon Thrash, # 2 Exhibit to Decl. of Shannon Thrash)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 02/22/2016)
2016-02-23NOTICE OF ERROR re 5 Notice (Other); emailed to james.valvo@causeofaction.org, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect event used, 2. Please refile document, 3. Refile using appropriate Summons Returned Executed events found under Service of Process. (znmw, ) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
2016-02-236RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION served on 2/18/2016; THE WILLIAM J. CLINTON PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY served on 2/20/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/22/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/23/2016.) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit to Declaration)(Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
2016-03-217NOTICE of Change of Address by Russel James Valvo, III (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
2016-03-228ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, THE WILLIAM J. CLINTON PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY.(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
2016-03-23MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before April 6, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/23/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
2016-03-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/6/2016 (tj) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
2016-04-069Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Schedule by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, THE WILLIAM J. CLINTON PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-06MINUTE ORDER concerning 9 Joint Status Report Regarding Schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall produce to Plaintiff all non-exempt records responsive to FOIA Request No. NGC15-364 on or before May 18, 2016. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 23, 2016, reporting on the May 18, 2016 production and detailing a proposed schedule for the release to Plaintiff of any non-exempt records responsive to FOIA Request No. NGC16-001. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/06/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
2016-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Production of all non-exempt records responsive to FOIA Request No. NGC15-364 due by 5/18/2016. Status Report due by 5/23/2016 (tj) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-05-2310STATUS REPORT by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
2016-05-23MINUTE ORDER concerning 10 the Parties' Second Joint Status Report: It is hereby ORDERED that on or before June 29, 2016 the parties shall file a joint status report detailing the status of the release to Plaintiff of any non-exempt records responsive to FOIA Request No. NGC16-001 and, if necessary, proposing a briefing schedule for the resolution of dispositive motions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/23/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
2016-06-2911Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ARCHIVES AND RECORDS ADMINISTRATION, THE WILLIAM J. CLINTON PRESIDENTIAL LIBRARY. (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
2016-06-30MINUTE ORDER concerning 11 the Parties' Third Joint Status Report: It is hereby ORDERED that on or before July 29, 2016 the parties shall file a joint status report or stipulation of dismissal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/30/2016. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
2016-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/29/2016 (tj) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
2016-07-2912STIPULATION of Dismissal , joint, with prejudice by CAUSE OF ACTION INSTITUTE. (Valvo, Russel) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff