Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOregon Wild et al v. Department of Interior et al
DistrictDistrict of Oregon
CityPortland
Case Number3:2016cv00270
Date Filed2016-02-15
Date Closed2016-11-22
JudgeMagistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman
PlaintiffOregon Wild
PlaintiffWaterWatch of Oregon
PlaintiffAudubon Society of Portland
Case DescriptionOregon Wild, Waterwatch of Oregon, and the Audubon Society of Portland submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the delivery of water to Tule Lake National Wildlife Refuge. The organizations also submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Reclamation for similar records. Both agencies provided some records, but withheld others under Exemption 5 (privileges). Oregon Wild filed administrative appeals with both agencies. However, after hearing nothing further from the agencies. Oregon Wild filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Interior a Department of United States Executive Branch
DefendantUnited States Fish and Wildlife Service an Administrative Agency of the United States Department of Interior
DefendantUnited States Bureau of Reclamation an Administrative Agency of the United States Department of Interior
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-02-151Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4484531 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Oregon Wild, Water Watch of Oregon, Audubon Society of Portland against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Proposed Summons). (Fahey, Maura) (Entered: 02/15/2016)
2016-02-162Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 6/15/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/15/2016. Pretrial Order is due by 7/15/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-02-163Summons Issued Electronically as to United States Bureau of Reclamation, United States Department of Interior, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
2016-03-174Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, 1 . Filed by United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Department of Interior, United States Bureau of Reclamation. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-03-175ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 4 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 4/13/2016 for all defendants. (gm) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
2016-04-136Answer to 1 Complaint, . Filed by United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Department of Interior, United States Bureau of Reclamation. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-137SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Thursday, May 12, 2016 at 2:30 PM in Judge Beckerman's chambers on the 9th floor of the Mark O. Hatfield U.S. Courthouse, 1000 S.W. Third Avenue, Portland, Oregon. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon the day before the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-228Affidavit of Service upon All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fahey, Maura) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/25/2016 with case caption document; NEF regenerated to parties) (sm). (Entered: 04/22/2016)
2016-05-119Amended Answer to 1 Complaint, . Filed by United States Fish and Wildlife Service, United States Department of Interior, United States Bureau of Reclamation. (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
2016-05-1210MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman on 5/12/2016. ORDER SETTING the following case management schedule: Defendants to produce any additional responsive documents by 6/13/2016. Discovery deadline of 6/15/2016 is stricken. Parties are to amend pleadings or add any additional parties or claims by 6/20/2016. Pretrial order deadline of 7/15/2016 is stricken. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/22/2016. Consents to Magistrate, if any, are to be filed by 7/22/2016. Signed consent forms must be mailed or delivered to the Clerk's Office, as they cannot be filed electronically. Defendants to file for summary judgment by 7/22/2016. Plaintiffs to respond to summary judgment motion and file optional cross-motion for summary judgment by 8/26/2016. Defendants' reply in support of summary judgment motion and response to cross-motion for summary judgment due by 9/9/2016. Plaintiffs' reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment due by 9/23/2016. Maura C. Fahey present as counsel for plaintiffs. Kevin C. Danielson present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: None. Tape No.: None. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
2016-07-1911SCHEDULING ORDER. Granting the parties' stipulated e-mailed request to extend case management deadlines as follows: Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/5/2016. Consents to Magistrate, if any, are to be filed by 8/5/2016. Signed consent forms must be mailed or delivered to the Clerk's Office, as they cannot be filed electronically. Defendants to file for summary judgment by 8/5/2016. Plaintiffs to respond to summary judgment motion and file optional cross-motion for summary judgment by 9/9/2016. Defendants' reply in support of summary judgment motion and response to cross-motion for summary judgment due by 9/23/2016. Plaintiffs' reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment due by 10/7/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-08-0412SCHEDULING ORDER. Granting the parties' e-mailed request to extend case management deadlines as follows: Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/6/2016. Consents to Magistrate, if any, are to be filed by 9/6/2016. Signed consent forms must be mailed or delivered to the Clerk's Office, as they cannot be filed electronically. Defendants to file for summary judgment by 9/6/2016. Plaintiffs to respond to summary judgment motion and file optional cross-motion for summary judgment by 10/11/2016. Defendants' reply in support of summary judgment motion and response to cross-motion for summary judgment due by 10/24/2016. Plaintiffs' reply in support of cross-motion for summary judgment due by 11/7/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 08/04/2016)
2016-11-0413SCHEDULING ORDER: Granting the parties' e-mailed request for an extension of all case deadlines. Parties are to file a Notice of Dismissal by 11/18/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
2016-11-1814Joint Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Danielson, Kevin) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
2016-11-2215ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 11/22/2016 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff