Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00406
Date Filed2016-02-29
Date Closed2017-03-28
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for communications between the agency and Natalio Alberto Nisman, an Argentine prosecutor who was shot to death in January 2015, from 2006-2015. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-02-291COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4430442) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of State)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
2016-02-292LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
2016-02-29Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (md) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
2016-03-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
2016-03-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/7/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/6/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/7/2016., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/7/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of C. Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
2016-04-055NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Daniel Shoaibi on behalf of All Defendants (Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-056Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-05MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, and in light of the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before May 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 5, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to the Complaint due by 5/6/2016, (hs) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
2016-05-067Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-06MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time. Upon consideration of the Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, and despite no consent from the plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before June 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 6, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-05-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's answer to the Complaint due by 6/6/2016. (hs) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
2016-06-068ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Shoaibi, Alexander) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
2016-06-089GENERAL ORDER GOVERNING CIVIL CASES. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 8, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
2016-06-2310STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
2016-06-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report, and in light of the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before August 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 27, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/21/2016 (hs) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
2016-08-2211Joint STATUS REPORT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
2016-08-23MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Joint Status Report in response to the Court's June 27, 2016 Minute Order, and in light of the parties' consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 31, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 23, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2016 (hs) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
2016-10-3112Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 10/31/2016)
2016-11-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report in response to the Court's August 23, 2016 Minute Order, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before December 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on November 1, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/9/2016 (hs) (Entered: 11/01/2016)
2016-12-0913Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
2016-12-12MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report in response to the Court's November 1, 2016 Minute Order, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before December 30, 2016, providing the Court with a briefing schedule for further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 12, 2016. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/30/2016 (hs) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
2016-12-3014STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 12/30/2016)
2017-01-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report in response to the Court's December 12, 2016 Minute Order, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file an additional joint status report on or before February 24, 2017, providing the Court with a briefing schedule for further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 2, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/02/2017)
2017-01-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/24/2017. (hs) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
2017-02-2415Joint STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
2017-03-1716STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
2017-03-2717STIPULATION of Dismissal by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
2017-03-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 28, 2017. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/28/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff