Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCITIZENS UNITED v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2016cv00423
Date Filed2016-03-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffCITIZENS UNITED
Case DescriptionCitizens United submitted three FOIA requests to the Department of State for records discussing the Clinton Executive Services Corp., emails between former Chief of Staff David Wade and Cheryl Mills or Heather Samuelson concerning the review of Hillary Clinton's emails, and all emails from Heather Samuelson to Cheryl Mills or Huma Abedin. Citizens United requested expedited processing for all three requests, which was granted by the State Department. However, after hearing nothing further about any of the requests, Citizens United filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2016-03-031COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4434344) filed by CITIZENS UNITED. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to the Attorney General, # 3 Summons to Defendant Department of State, # 4 Summons to the US Attorney, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-032LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED (Morgan, Jeremiah) Modified on 3/4/2016 (zrdj). (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-03Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (sth) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-033SUMMONS (3)Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(sth) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
2016-03-164RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/14/2016. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/13/2016.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 3/14/2016, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/14/16. (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
2016-04-135ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-136ORDER. Both a complaint and an answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. The parties are directed to meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before April 29, 2016, which addresses, among other things: (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Amit P. Mehta on 04/13/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
2016-04-13Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/29/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
2016-04-297Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
2016-05-028ORDER. Defendant shall complete its searches no later than May 20, 2016. Further, on that date, the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report that contains: (1) Defendant's estimate of the volume of potentially responsive records; (2) a proposed schedule for Defendant's completion of its production of responsive, non-exempt records to Plaintiff; and (3) a proposed schedule, if needed, for the parties' briefing of summary judgment. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/02/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-02Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/20/2016. (cdw) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
2016-05-209Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
2016-05-24Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/26/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
2016-05-26Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 5/26/2016. A further Status Conference set for 6/9/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (Court Reporter: Bryan Wayne) (cdw) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
2016-06-09Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Status Conference held on 6/9/2016. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (cdw) (Entered: 06/13/2016)
2016-06-1010ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings: Defendant shall produce, absent good cause, all records responsive to Plaintiff's Second FOIA Request on or before July 8, 2016; Defendant shall immediately commence processing and reviewing records responsive to Plaintiff's Third FOIA Request. Defendant shall process, review, and produce those records in reverse chronological order by year. Defendant shall endeavor to produce 650 pages per month, with the first production occurring no later than July 15, 2016; The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report on or before July 19, 2016, which updates the court on the status of Defendant's review and production efforts. Please see the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/10/2016. (lcapm2) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
2016-07-1911Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Heaps, Bailey) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
2016-07-27MINUTE ORDER modifying the Minute Order entered on June 10, 2016. The court substitutes the word "process" for the word "produce" such that "Defendant shall endeavor to process 650 pages per month." Consistent with its production on July 15, 2016, on each subsequent production date, Defendant shall identify to Plaintiff (1) the number of documents and pages it has reviewed since the last production; (2) the number of documents released in full; (3) the number of documents released in part; and (4) the number of documents withheld in full. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/27/2016. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
2017-04-1312NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kevin Matthew Snell on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Bailey Heaps (Snell, Kevin) (Entered: 04/13/2017)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff